« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR0000-193062
Judge:
Woo, Cassie
File Date:
9/9/1983
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Patricia Jane Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Gregory Gene Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
(3)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Attorney
Dana Rocker-Sobrado
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2000
Description
255 - ME: Contempt Hearing
Docket Date
6/2/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2000
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment
Docket Date
6/2/2000
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
STIPULATED
Filing Date
5/26/2000
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
8/7/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2000 4:30:00 PM
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order
Docket Date
5/12/2000 4:30:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
3/22/2000
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/24/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/13/00
Filing Date
3/8/2000
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/10/2000
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO APPEAR
Filing Date
2/28/2000
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/1/2000
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/25/2000
Description
CCS - Petition For Contempt - Child Support
Docket Date
2/29/2000
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file