Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Rooper, Elaina | ||
Richard Carlos RomoJr. - (2) |
Defendant | M | FORCE, JEFF | Giaquinto | CR2018-135293-001 |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Richard Carlos Romo Jr. | 28-1383A1 (F4) | AGG DUI-LIC SUSP/REV FOR DUI | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 6/12/2019 |
Richard Carlos Romo Jr. | 28-1383A1 (F4) | AGG DUI-LIC SUSP/REV FOR DUI | 9/1/2017 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 6/12/2019 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
5/16/2023 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001) | 5/17/2023 | |
5/11/2023 | DHI - Dispo: Revoke/prison - Party (001) | 5/11/2023 | |
NOTE: DHI - Disposition Order - Imprisonment | |||
5/10/2023 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 5/10/2023 | |
NOTE: Presentence Report | |||
5/10/2023 | OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001) | 5/10/2023 | |
NOTE: Monetary Orders | |||
5/10/2023 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 5/10/2023 | |
NOTE: | |||
5/10/2023 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 5/10/2023 | |
NOTE: Order of Confinement | |||
3/6/2023 | 117 - ME: Guilt New Chg/Prob Violation - Party (001) | 3/6/2023 | |
2/22/2023 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 2/22/2023 | |
1/4/2023 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 1/4/2023 | |
10/25/2022 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 10/25/2022 | |
8/2/2022 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 8/2/2022 | |
7/6/2022 | 004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001) | 7/6/2022 | |
6/27/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 6/27/2022 | |
6/10/2022 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001) | 6/13/2022 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DENIAL OF PETITION FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION | |||
5/18/2022 | 112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001) | 5/18/2022 | |
5/6/2022 | PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001) | 5/6/2022 | |
NOTE: COUNT 1 | |||
5/6/2022 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 5/6/2022 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
5/6/2022 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 5/6/2022 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
5/3/2022 | PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001) | 5/3/2022 | |
NOTE: COUNT 1 | |||
5/2/2022 | PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001) | 5/2/2022 | |
NOTE: COUNT 1 | |||
5/2/2022 | ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001) | 5/3/2022 | |
NOTE: DENIED COUNT 1 | |||
5/2/2022 | PDO - Proposed Order Denied - Party (001) | 5/3/2022 | |
NOTE: APD Forms | |||
5/2/2022 | MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001) | 5/3/2022 | |
NOTE: COUNT 1 | |||
3/23/2022 | PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001) | 3/23/2022 | |
NOTE: APD Forms | |||
12/20/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 12/20/2019 | |
12/6/2019 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 12/9/2019 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: MOTION TO QUASH WARRANTS, SUSPEND FINE BALANCES AND GRANT DEFENDANT CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED | |||
11/27/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 11/27/2019 | |
11/15/2019 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 11/18/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO QUASH WARRANTS ETC | |||
10/21/2019 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 10/22/2019 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: MOTION TO QUASH WARRANTS SUSPEND FINE BALANCES AND GRANT DEFENDANT CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED | |||
9/17/2019 | ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001) | 9/18/2019 | |
9/16/2019 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 9/17/2019 | |
9/9/2019 | SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001) | 9/9/2019 | |
NOTE: SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation | |||
9/5/2019 | PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001) | 9/9/2019 | |
9/5/2019 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 9/5/2019 | |
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered | |||
9/5/2019 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 9/5/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review | |||
9/5/2019 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 9/5/2019 | |
NOTE: Order of Confinement | |||
8/8/2019 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 8/8/2019 | |
8/7/2019 | OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001) | 8/9/2019 | |
8/2/2019 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 8/5/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTON TO CONTINUE SENTENCING | |||
6/18/2019 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 6/18/2019 | |
6/13/2019 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 6/13/2019 | |
6/12/2019 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 6/14/2019 | |
6/5/2019 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001) | 6/5/2019 | |
5/15/2019 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 5/15/2019 | |
5/14/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 5/15/2019 | |
NOTE: CONTINUING THE TRIAL IN THE ABOVE MATTER TO 7/18/2019 | |||
5/8/2019 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 5/9/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE 06/06/19 JURY TRIAL | |||
3/21/2019 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 3/21/2019 | |
3/20/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 3/22/2019 | |
NOTE: CONTINUING TRIAL IN THE ABOVE MATTER TO 06/06/19. | |||
3/15/2019 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 3/18/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue Trial | |||
2/27/2019 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 2/27/2019 | |
2/19/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/21/2019 | |
NOTE: FOR RELEASE OF BLOOD SAMPLE AND URINE SAMPLE FOR INDEPENDENT TESTING | |||
1/9/2019 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 1/9/2019 | |
1/8/2019 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 1/9/2019 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFEFERENCE | |||
12/7/2018 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 12/7/2018 | |
12/4/2018 | ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001) | 12/4/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS | |||
12/4/2018 | AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (001) | 12/4/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-708(C) | |||
12/4/2018 | RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001) | 12/4/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING | |||
12/4/2018 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 12/5/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/4/2018 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001) | 12/5/2018 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR REBUTTAL WITNESSES | |||
11/6/2018 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 11/6/2018 | |
11/1/2018 | INF - Information - Party (001) | 11/6/2018 | |
10/19/2018 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 10/19/2018 | |
10/18/2018 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 10/19/2018 | |
NOTE: TO RELEASE BLOOD SAMPLE | |||
10/16/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 10/17/2018 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION AND ORDER FOR RELEASE OF BLOOD SAMPLE FOR INDEPENDENT TESTING | |||
10/4/2018 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 10/4/2018 | |
9/18/2018 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 9/18/2018 | |
9/4/2018 | WAV - Waiver - Party (001) | 9/7/2018 | |
NOTE: OF PROBABLE CAUSE HEARING CONTINUANCE AND ORDER | |||
8/28/2018 | OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001) | 8/29/2018 | |
8/15/2018 | 179 - ME: Initial Appearance - Party (001) | 8/15/2018 | |
8/14/2018 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 8/15/2018 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
8/14/2018 | FIN - Financial Information - Party (001) | 8/14/2018 | |
NOTE: Financial | |||
7/26/2018 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/26/2018 | |
7/19/2018 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 7/19/2018 | |
7/19/2018 | SUM - Summons - Party (001) | 7/20/2018 | |
7/19/2018 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 7/20/2018 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
8/14/2018 | 8:28 | Initial Appearance |
8/28/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
9/4/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
9/4/2018 | 8:45 | Preliminary Hearing |
9/10/2018 | 8:45 | Preliminary Hearing |
9/24/2018 | 8:25 | Status Conference |
11/1/2018 | 8:15 | Arraignment Hearing |
12/4/2018 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
1/8/2019 | 8:30 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
2/20/2019 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
3/26/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/28/2019 | 9:00 | Trial |
5/31/2019 | 7:59 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/31/2019 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
5/31/2019 | 8:32 | Status Conference |
6/6/2019 | 8:30 | Change Of Plea |
6/6/2019 | 8:30 | Change Of Plea |
6/6/2019 | 10:30 | Trial |
6/12/2019 | 8:32 | Status Conference |
7/12/2019 | 8:29 | Pre-Trial Conference |
7/18/2019 | 10:30 | Trial |
8/12/2019 | 8:28 | Sentencing |
9/5/2019 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
5/6/2022 | 20:00 | Initial Appearance |
5/13/2022 | 8:30 | Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing |
5/13/2022 | 8:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
5/13/2022 | 8:31 | Disposition Hearing |
6/29/2022 | 8:15 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
8/1/2022 | 8:31 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
8/25/2022 | 8:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
9/8/2022 | 9:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
10/24/2022 | 8:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
11/8/2022 | 9:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
1/3/2023 | 8:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
1/10/2023 | 9:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
2/21/2023 | 8:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
2/28/2023 | 9:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
3/2/2023 | 11:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
4/20/2023 | 8:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
4/27/2023 | 9:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
5/10/2023 | 9:30 | Disposition Hearing |