« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Pedicone, Erin
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Sergio Armondo Celaya - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Starr
Case #
CR2023-105466-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Sergio Armondo Celaya
Crime Date
2/6/2023
Date
2/16/2023
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Sergio Armondo Celaya
Crime Date
2/6/2023
Date
2/16/2023
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Sergio Armondo Celaya
Crime Date
2/6/2023
Date
2/11/2025
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Sergio Armondo Celaya
Crime Date
2/6/2023
Date
2/11/2025
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Sergio Armondo Celaya
Crime Date
2/6/2023
Date
2/11/2025
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Sergio Armondo Celaya
Crime Date
2/6/2023
Date
2/11/2025
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Sergio Armondo Celaya
Crime Date
2/6/2023
Date
2/11/2025
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Sergio Armondo Celaya
Crime Date
2/6/2023
Date
2/11/2025
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Sergio Armondo Celaya
Crime Date
2/6/2023
Date
2/11/2025
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Sergio Armondo Celaya
Crime Date
2/6/2023
Date
2/11/2025
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Sergio Armondo Celaya
Crime Date
2/6/2023
Date
2/11/2025
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Sergio Armondo Celaya
Crime Date
2/6/2023
Date
2/11/2025
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2025
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2
Filing Date
4/8/2025
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2025
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2025
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2025
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RISK ASSESMENT
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEX OFFENDER REGISTRATION ADDENDUM
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
2/14/2025
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2025
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
2/11/2025
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2024
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2024
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Scheduled Settlement Conference
Filing Date
12/2/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
12/2/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Joint Case Management Report
Filing Date
9/25/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL
CONFERENCE
Filing Date
7/30/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL
CONFERENCE
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
3/14/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S
FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
1/9/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT
HEARING DATE: January 9, 2024
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
8/1/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
6/16/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2023
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2023
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2023
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
5/24/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
5/24/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
4/20/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Modify Release and Request for Hearing on 5/10/2023
Filing Date
4/17/2023
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2023
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/6/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO APPROVE COSTS FOR RISK ASSESSMENT
Filing Date
3/19/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to States Motion to Designate Matter Complex
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF OPPORTUNITY TO
INSPECT CONTRABAND EVIDENCE
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE
DESIGNATION
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2023
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
$100,000 Secured Appearance Bond
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/13/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/16/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
2/22/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/11/2023
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/10/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
5/25/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/31/2023
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/1/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/15/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/22/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/24/2023
Time
9:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/11/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/11/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/18/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/9/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/9/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/17/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/12/2024
Time
8:40
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/12/2024
Time
8:40
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/19/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/7/2024
Time
9:10
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/7/2024
Time
9:10
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/14/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/22/2024
Time
8:40
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/29/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/23/2024
Time
8:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/23/2024
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/30/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/3/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/3/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/9/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/18/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
12/18/2024
Time
14:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
2/11/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/18/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/17/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing