Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Brady, Tiffany | ||
Michael Riyadh Lanouar - (2) |
Defendant | M | Green, Benjamin | Davison | CR2023-006473-001 |
B Victim - (3) |
Victim | N/A | Tinoco, Jessica | ||
B Victim - (4) |
Victim | N/A | Tinoco, Jessica |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Michael Riyadh Lanouar | 13-1201A (F6) | ENDANGERMENT | 11/4/2022 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 8/15/2023 |
Michael Riyadh Lanouar | 13-1201A (F6) | ENDANGERMENT | 11/4/2022 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 8/15/2023 |
Michael Riyadh Lanouar | 28-1381A1 (M1) | DUI-LIQUOR/DRUGS/VAPORS/COMBO | 11/4/2022 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 8/15/2023 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
9/15/2023 | SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001) | 9/15/2023 | |
NOTE: SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation | |||
9/14/2023 | NLB - Notice to Licensing Board - Party (001) | 9/18/2023 | |
NOTE: Licensing Board Notification (Restricted) | |||
9/14/2023 | LET - Letter - Party (001) | 9/21/2023 | |
9/14/2023 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 9/14/2023 | |
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered | |||
9/14/2023 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 9/14/2023 | |
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered | |||
9/14/2023 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 9/14/2023 | |
NOTE: Presentence Report | |||
9/14/2023 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 9/14/2023 | |
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered | |||
9/14/2023 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 9/14/2023 | |
NOTE: | |||
9/12/2023 | SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001) | 9/14/2023 | |
NOTE: Defense Sentencing memorandum | |||
9/12/2023 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 9/19/2023 | |
NOTE: PRETRIAL | |||
8/31/2023 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 8/31/2023 | |
8/22/2023 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 8/31/2023 | |
NOTE: GRANTING RE: EXPEDITED MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING DEFENDANT TO LEAVE THE STATE OF ARIZONA | |||
8/22/2023 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 8/24/2023 | |
NOTE: EXPEDITED MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING DEFENDANT TO LEAVE THE STATE OF ARIZONA | |||
8/17/2023 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 8/17/2023 | |
8/15/2023 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 8/16/2023 | |
8/1/2023 | 331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001) | 8/1/2023 | |
7/27/2023 | MEM - Memorandum - Party (001) | 7/31/2023 | |
NOTE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM | |||
7/26/2023 | SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001) | 7/28/2023 | |
NOTE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM | |||
7/19/2023 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 7/24/2023 | |
NOTE: FIRST SUPPLEMENT TO DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO 15.2 AND REQUEST FOR STATE’S DISCOVERY, DISCLOSURE AND PRESERVATION OF EVIDENCE | |||
7/10/2023 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 7/10/2023 | |
6/14/2023 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 6/15/2023 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
6/7/2023 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 6/8/2023 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 16.4 OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REMAND PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9 | |||
5/25/2023 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001) | 5/25/2023 | |
5/25/2023 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 5/31/2023 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 16.4 OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REMAND PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9 | |||
5/24/2023 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 6/5/2023 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
5/19/2023 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 5/23/2023 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 16.4 OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REMAND PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9 | |||
5/18/2023 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 5/18/2023 | |
5/18/2023 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 5/18/2023 | |
5/17/2023 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 5/17/2023 | |
5/16/2023 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 5/26/2023 | |
NOTE: Release portions of medical records | |||
5/15/2023 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 5/30/2023 | |
5/12/2023 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001) | 5/17/2023 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 16.4 OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REMAND PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9 | |||
5/10/2023 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 5/12/2023 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
5/10/2023 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 5/12/2023 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
5/10/2023 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 5/12/2023 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
5/9/2023 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 5/15/2023 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
5/9/2023 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 5/9/2023 | |
5/9/2023 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 5/12/2023 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO 15.2 AND REQUEST FOR STATE’S DISCOVERY, DISCLOSURE AND PRESERVATION OF EVIDENCE | |||
5/8/2023 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 5/22/2023 | |
NOTE: GRANTING THIS MOTION AND ALLOWING MR. LANOUAR TO LEAVE THE STATE OF ARIZONA. | |||
5/5/2023 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 5/10/2023 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S EXPEDITED MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING DEFENDANT TO LEAVE THE STATE OF ARIZONA | |||
5/5/2023 | ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001) | 5/5/2023 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
5/4/2023 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 5/10/2023 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR RELEASE OF VICTIM’S MEDICAL RECORDS | |||
5/4/2023 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 5/11/2023 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR RELEASE OF VICTIM’S MEDICAL RECORDS | |||
5/4/2023 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 5/11/2023 | |
NOTE: EXPEDITED MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING DEFENDANT TO LEAVE THE STATE OF ARIZONA | |||
5/2/2023 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 5/2/2023 | |
4/28/2023 | ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001) | 4/28/2023 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
4/27/2023 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001) | 4/27/2023 | |
4/24/2023 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 5/5/2023 | |
4/21/2023 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/27/2023 | |
NOTE: EXPEDITED SUPPLEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS #9 AND ALLOW DEFENDANT TO POSSESS WEAPONS | |||
4/13/2023 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/18/2023 | |
NOTE: EXPEDITED MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS (#9) AND ALLOW DEFENDANT TO POSSESS WEAPONS | |||
4/12/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 4/18/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Victims Danny and Jessica Stites | |||
4/7/2023 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 4/27/2023 | |
4/6/2023 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 5/1/2023 | |
4/6/2023 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 5/2/2023 | |
3/31/2023 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 3/31/2023 | |
3/30/2023 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 4/4/2023 | |
NOTE: Motion for Temporary removal of Grand Jury Transcript | |||
3/29/2023 | ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001) | 3/29/2023 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
3/23/2023 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 3/24/2023 | |
3/14/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 3/16/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
3/10/2023 | SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 3/10/2023 | |
3/1/2023 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 3/10/2023 | |
3/1/2023 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 3/10/2023 | |
3/1/2023 | 600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001) | 3/10/2023 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
3/29/2023 | 9:00 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
4/28/2023 | 11:40 | Oral Argument |
5/16/2023 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
6/20/2023 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
7/21/2023 | 13:30 | Oral Argument |
7/28/2023 | 13:30 | Settlement Conference |
8/15/2023 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
8/17/2023 | 8:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/23/2023 | 9:25 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/24/2023 | 9:00 | Trial |
8/31/2023 | 9:00 | Trial |
9/14/2023 | 10:00 | Sentencing |