« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Bhatia, Neha
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Kaylon Craig Hall - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Kavanagh, Robert
Judge
Edelstein
Case #
CR2023-006345-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Kaylon Craig Hall
Crime Date
7/2/2022
Date
5/17/2023
Description
ENDANGERMENT
ARSCode
13-1201A (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Kaylon Craig Hall
Crime Date
7/2/2022
Date
5/17/2023
Description
ENDANGERMENT
ARSCode
13-1201A (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2024
Description
ODM - Order of Discharge from Probation - Misdemeanor Designation - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
count 1
Filing Date
9/24/2024
Description
MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
8/7/2024
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
6/30/2023
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RSD - 06/19/2023
Filing Date
6/29/2023
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2023
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
NLB - Notice to Licensing Board - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Licensing Board Notification (Restricted)
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SENTENCING
MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
5/17/2023
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2023
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2023
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2023
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
4/11/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/6/2023
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCESS
Filing Date
4/6/2023
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND WITNESSES; REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
4/6/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.1 REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
4/3/2023
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2023
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2023
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2023
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2023
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/7/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/18/2023
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/17/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
6/19/2023
Time
10:15
Event
Acceptance Of Plea/Snt
Date
7/27/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/3/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial