Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Baldner, Victoria | ||
Randy Steven Kaas - (2) |
Defendant | M | Jones, Richard | Master Calendar | CR2023-006287-001 |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Randy Steven Kaas | 13-2310 (F2) | FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES | 6/2/2020 | |||
Randy Steven Kaas | 13-2310 (F2) | FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES | 7/8/2020 | |||
Randy Steven Kaas | 13-2310 (F2) | FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES | 7/13/2020 | |||
Randy Steven Kaas | 13-2310 (F2) | FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES | 4/6/2021 | |||
Randy Steven Kaas | 13-2310 (F2) | FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES | 5/17/2021 | |||
Randy Steven Kaas | 13-2002A3 (F4) | FORGERY-OFFERS FORGED INSTRUM | 6/30/2020 | |||
Randy Steven Kaas | 13-2002A3 (F4) | FORGERY-OFFERS FORGED INSTRUM | 6/30/2020 | |||
Randy Steven Kaas | 13-2002A3 (F4) | FORGERY-OFFERS FORGED INSTRUM | 3/23/2021 | |||
Randy Steven Kaas | 13-2002A3 (F4) | FORGERY-OFFERS FORGED INSTRUM | 5/1/2021 | |||
Randy Steven Kaas | 13-1802 (F2) | THEFT | 6/2/2020 | |||
Randy Steven Kaas | 13-1802 (F2) | THEFT | 7/8/2020 | |||
Randy Steven Kaas | 13-1802 (F2) | THEFT | 7/13/2020 | |||
Randy Steven Kaas | 13-1802 (F2) | THEFT | 4/6/2021 | |||
Randy Steven Kaas | 13-1802 (F2) | THEFT | 5/17/2021 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
4/24/2023 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 4/28/2023 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-701 (D) | |||
4/21/2023 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 4/21/2023 | |
4/17/2023 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 4/21/2023 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
4/17/2023 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001) | 4/20/2023 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES | |||
4/17/2023 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 4/20/2023 | |
NOTE: STATE'S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
4/3/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 4/5/2023 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
4/3/2023 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 4/6/2023 | |
NOTE: INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS | |||
3/7/2023 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 3/20/2023 | |
3/6/2023 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 3/23/2023 | |
3/6/2023 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 3/23/2023 | |
3/6/2023 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 3/28/2023 | |
3/6/2023 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 3/8/2023 | |
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF THEFT AND FRAUDULENT SCHEME OF $100,000 OR MORE PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-1802(H) AND A.R.S. §13- 2310(C) | |||
3/3/2023 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 3/3/2023 | |
3/1/2023 | ROR - Release Order - Party (001) | 3/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
2/10/2023 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 2/10/2023 | |
2/9/2023 | SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 2/9/2023 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: 02/03/2023 | |||
1/30/2023 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 2/9/2023 | Plaintiff (1) |
1/30/2023 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 2/9/2023 | Plaintiff (1) |
1/30/2023 | 600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001) | 2/9/2023 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
3/1/2023 | 9:00 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
4/18/2023 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
5/22/2023 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
7/20/2023 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
7/27/2023 | 9:00 | Trial |