« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, T P C Appeals
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Paul Kimball Nelson - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Bain, Amy
Judge
Brain
Case #
CR2023-006210-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Paul Kimball Nelson 
Crime Date
1/1/2015
Date
11/15/2023
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410A (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Paul Kimball Nelson 
Crime Date
2/16/2018
Date
11/15/2023
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410A (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Paul Kimball Nelson 
Crime Date
2/16/2018
Date
11/15/2023
Description
SEXUAL ABUSE
ARSCode
13-1404A (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Paul Kimball Nelson 
Crime Date
2/16/2016
Date
11/15/2023
Description
INDECENT EXPOSURE
ARSCode
13-1402A (F6)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Paul Kimball Nelson 
Crime Date
2/16/2017
Date
11/15/2023
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL COUNSEL’S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
4/28/2025
Description
596 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2025
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Requesting Post-Conviction Relief
Filing Date
11/25/2024
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COMPLETION OF RECORD
Filing Date
9/17/2024
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
9/13/2024
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUBLIC DEFENDER
Filing Date
9/10/2024
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2024
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2024
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF APPOINTMENT
Filing Date
8/15/2024
Description
DOR - Designation Of Record On Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DESIGNATION OF RECORD FOR APPEAL
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2024
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM SUPERIOR COURT
Filing Date
8/6/2024
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2024
Description
017 - ME: Counsel Appointed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2024
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE 31.2 G
Filing Date
7/26/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
7/23/2024
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM SUPERIOR COURT
Filing Date
7/23/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR COURT APPOINTED APPELLATE COUNSEL
Filing Date
7/16/2024
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
7/12/2024
Description
INJ - Injunction - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Injunction
Filing Date
7/12/2024
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
7/12/2024
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
7/12/2024
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
7/12/2024
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
7/12/2024
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
7/12/2024
Description
VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2024
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/17/2024
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2024
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
6/13/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECOMMENDATION AS TO SENTENCE
Filing Date
5/17/2024
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Release of Deposit
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
4/6/2024
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
4/4/2024
Description
195 - ME: Bond Forfeited - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
BFJ - Bond Forfeiture Judgment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2024
Description
180 - ME: Bond Forfeiture Hrg - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Limited Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
12/20/2023
Description
133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALED JURY QUESTIONNAIRES
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2023-11-15
Filing Date
11/14/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2023
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
11/13/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: GRANTING STATE'S ORDER TO AMEND THE INDICTMENT
Filing Date
11/9/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO AMEND THE INDICTMENT
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO AMEND THE INDICTMENT
Filing Date
11/6/2023
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INDICTMENT 837 GJ 164
Filing Date
11/3/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMEND THE INDICTMENT
Filing Date
11/2/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED COURT REPORTER
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR A VOLUNTARINESS HEARING
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO THE STATES MOTION IN LIMINE 1: MOTION TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS SELF-SERVING HEARSAY STATEMENTS
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO THE STATES MOTION IN LIMINE 2: MOTION TO PRECLUDE MENTION OF ANY MEDICATION(S) TAKEN BY VICTIM AS MOTHER
Filing Date
10/10/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2023
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE 2: MOTION TO PRECLUDE MENTION OF ANY MEDICATION(S) TAKEN BY VICTIM A’S MOTHER
Filing Date
10/9/2023
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE 1: MOTION TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANT’S SELFSERVING HEARSAY STATEMENTS
Filing Date
10/9/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10/09/2023
Filing Date
10/9/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUESTED JOINT JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FACILITY DOG
Filing Date
9/26/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUESTED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS
Filing Date
9/19/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER FOR ORAL DEPOSITION OF MAUREEN MCQUADE
Filing Date
9/7/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR THE ORAL DEPOSITION OF MAUREEN McQUADE
Filing Date
9/7/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT
Filing Date
8/22/2023
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2023
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ACCELERATE FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
8/9/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
7/25/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT
Filing Date
7/19/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/19/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/19/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/18/2023
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2023
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/26/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
4/7/2023
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2023
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
4/3/2023
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/3/2023
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
3/28/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
3/10/2023
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2023
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Grand Jury Transcript
Filing Date
2/17/2023
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2023
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASH BAIL
Filing Date
2/16/2023
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
2/14/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSE REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY AND DISCLOSURE STATEMENT
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2023
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2023
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2023
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/20/2023
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: STATE'S MOTION TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/20/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 COFIDENTIAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/10/2023
Time
5:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
2/17/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/3/2023
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
4/4/2023
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/3/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
7/6/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/13/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/14/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
9/5/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/12/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/3/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/10/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/17/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/2/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/3/2023
Time
14:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/6/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/7/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/8/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/13/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/13/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/14/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/15/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/16/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/19/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Bond Forfeiture Hearing
Date
3/21/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Bond Forfeiture Hearing
Date
4/6/2024
Time
20:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
4/16/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference - Post Warrant
Date
5/20/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
6/14/2024
Time
11:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
7/12/2024
Time
15:30
Event
Sentencing