« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Polk, Matt
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Steven Richard Leitzell - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Zamora, Gregory
Judge
Saccone
Case #
CR2022-135641-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Steven Richard Leitzell 
Crime Date
9/18/2022
Date
10/27/2022
Description
Agg Aslt-Officer
ARSCode
13-1204A8A (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Steven Richard Leitzell 
Crime Date
9/18/2022
Date
10/27/2022
Description
RESIST ARREST-PHYSICAL FORCE
ARSCode
13-2508A1 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2024
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
10/20/2023
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2023
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2023
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
1/3/2023
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Sentencing Memorandum
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT STEVEN LEITZELL’S MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING
Filing Date
11/8/2022
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2022
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Allow him to Live at Home with Wife and Daughters
Filing Date
10/27/2022
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
10/27/2022
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLEA AGREEMENT
Filing Date
10/21/2022
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2022
Description
581 - ME: Preliminary Hearing/Ng Arraignment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2022
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2022
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INFORMATION
Filing Date
10/3/2022
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INFORMATION
Filing Date
9/27/2022
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
9/23/2022
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2022
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2022
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2022
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
9/20/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
9/20/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/18/2022
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
9/23/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/26/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
9/27/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/3/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
10/3/2022
Time
14:00
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/18/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/19/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/24/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/27/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
10/27/2022
Time
14:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
10/27/2022
Time
15:45
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/14/2022
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
11/29/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
12/14/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/4/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/26/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/2/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial