« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Miller, Jeremy
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Christina D Leon - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Kazan, Lawrence
Judge
Griblin
Case #
CR2022-134595-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Christina D Leon 
Crime Date
9/11/2022
Date
10/6/2022
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - Agg Aslt-Officer
ARSCode
13-1204A8A (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Christina D Leon 
Crime Date
9/11/2022
Date
10/6/2022
Description
Agg Aslt-Officer
ARSCode
13-1204A8A (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Christina D Leon 
Crime Date
9/11/2022
Date
10/6/2022
Description
CRIMINAL DAMAGE-DEFACE
ARSCode
13-1602A1 (M2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Christina D Leon 
Crime Date
9/11/2022
Date
10/6/2022
Description
DISORDERLY CONDUCT-FIGHTING
ARSCode
13-2904A1 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Christina D Leon 
Crime Date
9/11/2022
Date
10/6/2022
Description
CRIMINAL TRESPASS 2ND DEG
ARSCode
13-1503A (M2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2023
Description
OSJ - Order re: Setting Aside Judgment of Guilt - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Court Clerk Document Plus
Filing Date
6/16/2023
Description
CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Criminal Financial Information Worksheet
Filing Date
6/9/2023
Description
ASJ - Application to Set aside Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
RESTORE GUN RIGHTS
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2023
Description
116 - ME: Dispo-Revoke/Terminate - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2023
Description
MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEMO TO THE COURT
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION AND REQUEST FOR MISDEMEANOR DESIGNATION
Filing Date
3/22/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION AND REQUEST FOR MISDEMEANOR DESIGNATION
Filing Date
3/10/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Early Termination of Probation and Request for Misdemeanor Designation
Filing Date
12/12/2022
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2022
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOSE LEON $1,000.00
Filing Date
11/14/2022
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
11/9/2022
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2022
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
11/9/2022
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
11/9/2022
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
11/9/2022
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
11/4/2022
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sentencing Memorandum
Filing Date
10/20/2022
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Cash Bail
Filing Date
10/10/2022
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2022
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY HEARING WITH PLEA AGREEMENT
Filing Date
10/6/2022
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INFORMATION
Filing Date
9/20/2022
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
9/15/2022
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/11/2022
Time
20:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
9/16/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/20/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/6/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/6/2022
Time
8:32
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/10/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
11/9/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing