« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, S P 2 Sex Crimes East
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Karpel, Jason
Judge
Culbertson
Case #
CR2022-133985-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
9/15/2022
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
9/15/2022
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
9/15/2022
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
9/15/2022
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
9/15/2022
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
9/15/2022
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
9/15/2022
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
9/15/2022
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
9/15/2022
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
9/15/2022
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
10/2/2024
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
10/2/2024
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
10/2/2024
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
10/2/2024
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
10/2/2024
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
10/2/2024
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
10/2/2024
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
10/2/2024
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
10/2/2024
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Raymond Zwiefelhofer
Crime Date
6/21/2022
Date
10/2/2024
Description
SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3553A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/30/2024
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
12/27/2024
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/26/2024
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/26/2024
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2024
Description
DOR - Designation Of Record On Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DESIGNATION OF RECOl
FOR APPEAL
Filing Date
11/20/2024
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE (31.2 (g))
Filing Date
11/20/2024
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
065 - ME: Order Exonerating Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
11/13/2024
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
11/11/2024
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appeal
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
11/6/2024
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S SENTENCING
MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
11/6/2024
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
State's Sentencing Memorandum
Filing Date
11/5/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Filing Date
10/17/2024
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO
STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE
SENTENCING
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO CONTINUE
SENTENCING
Filing Date
10/11/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL
Filing Date
10/11/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALED JURY QUESTIONNAIRES
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
#2
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL / HEARING WORKSHEET
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL / HEARING WORKSHEET
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S BRIEF REGARDING WILLITS INSTRUCTION
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2024
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2024
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2024
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2024
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
9/9/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
WITNESSES
Filing Date
9/7/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
8/26/2024
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S COMPLEX CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
5/30/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE
TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
AND TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
5/17/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
5/17/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Allow State's Case Agent to Appear Virtually on May 20 2024
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE
EVIDENTIARY HEARING (EXPEDITED
RULING REQUESTED)
Filing Date
3/26/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Management Report
Filing Date
3/20/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND
TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
3/12/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Response to States Motion to Admit Other Acts Evidence Pursuant to Rule 404(b) and (c)
Filing Date
3/3/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SUPPRESS
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO ADMIT OTHER ACTS EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 404(B) AND (C) AND REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS PURSUANT TO RULE 1.9, ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
2/21/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Suppress Defendants Involuntary Statements
Filing Date
1/23/2024
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Trial Management Conference and Trial Date
Filing Date
1/3/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
1/2/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Request for Discovery
Filing Date
12/13/2023
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND
TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Request for Discovery
Filing Date
9/20/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE
TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
AND TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
7/24/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial Management Conference and Trial Date
Filing Date
6/29/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
6/2/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
5/17/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial Management Conference and Trial Date
Filing Date
3/16/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order/$50,000
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Reconsider Defendants Motion to Modify Release Conditions
Filing Date
2/17/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2023
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Remand to the Grand Jury
Filing Date
1/30/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
CR15.1 Supplemental Monday Jan 30 2023 at 031141_9516461 PM
Filing Date
1/23/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
1/18/2023
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2023
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion For Extension to File Motion for Remand to the Grand Jury
Filing Date
12/23/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SECOND MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS TO SEE HIS GRANDCHILDREN
Filing Date
12/13/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Modify Release Conditions
Filing Date
12/5/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF OPPORTUNITY TO
INSPECT CONTRABAND EVIDENCE
Filing Date
11/28/2022
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE
OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE
SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. §
13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
11/18/2022
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 11/14/2022
Filing Date
11/14/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DECLARE DEFENDANT INDIGENT
Filing Date
11/14/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
11/10/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Initial Pretrial Conference Statement
Filing Date
11/9/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Initial Pretrial Conference Statement
Filing Date
11/9/2022
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/8/2022
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES, WITNESSES
AND EXHIBITS AND REQUEST
FOR REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
11/1/2022
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2022
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Complex Case Designation
Filing Date
10/21/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
10/21/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2022
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE A
MOTION FOR REMAND TO THE
GRAND JURY
Filing Date
10/17/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
10/17/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
10/5/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Modify Release Conditions
Filing Date
9/27/2022
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2022
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2022
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2022
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASH BAIL
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SURETY $50,000.00 BANKERS INSURANCE CO
Filing Date
9/12/2022
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
9/9/2022
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2022
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
9/9/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
9/9/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
9/9/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE /
NOT GUILTY PLEA
Filing Date
9/9/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Discovery
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/7/2022
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
9/13/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/15/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
9/20/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/21/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
9/22/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
11/10/2022
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
12/13/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/24/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/9/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/16/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/1/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/8/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
5/11/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/18/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/19/2023
Time
8:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/22/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/12/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/19/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/11/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/18/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/20/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/20/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/27/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/4/2024
Time
9:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/17/2024
Time
9:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/21/2024
Time
9:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/28/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/21/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/21/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/28/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/3/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
5/3/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/20/2024
Time
9:20
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/9/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/16/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/26/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
7/26/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/10/2024
Time
9:20
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/10/2024
Time
9:20
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/17/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/17/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/23/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/24/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/25/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/26/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/30/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/1/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/2/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/28/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/8/2024
Time
14:30
Event
Sentencing