« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Bigler, Tristan
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Fernando Ramos - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Skura, Michelle
Judge
Lang
Case #
CR2022-118532-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Fernando Ramos 
Crime Date
5/21/2022
Date
6/2/2022
Description
FAIL TO STAY/WITH DEATH/INJURY
ARSCode
28-661B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Fernando Ramos 
Crime Date
5/21/2022
Date
10/16/2023
Description
FAIL TO STAY/HIT RUN WITH INJ
ARSCode
28-661C (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
1/17/2024
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Vacate
Filing Date
11/1/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Vacate
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Settlement Conference Memorandum
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY
Filing Date
9/18/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
10/11/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Secure Funds FOR EXPERT ASSISTANCE
Filing Date
8/31/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2022
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/4/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2022
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2022
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
7/26/2022
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13- 703 or A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
7/26/2022
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/30/2022
Description
905 - ME: Correspondence Received By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2022
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2022
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2022
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2022
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
6/14/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Brady Motion
Filing Date
6/14/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Designate Complex
Filing Date
6/13/2022
Description
173 - ME: Arraignment Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2022
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
$250,000 Secured Appearance Bond
Filing Date
6/9/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S REQUEST TO REDUCE BOND
Filing Date
6/1/2022
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2022
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2022
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/22/2022
Time
2:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
5/27/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/1/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
6/7/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/8/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
6/10/2022
Time
15:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/14/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/13/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/18/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
7/27/2022
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
7/27/2022
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
8/25/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
8/29/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
8/29/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/20/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/4/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/27/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/10/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/26/2023
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/9/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/3/2023
Time
9:10
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/10/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/6/2023
Time
9:10
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/13/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/20/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/27/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/16/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
10/16/2023
Time
16:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
10/19/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/26/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/16/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/16/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
3/18/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing