« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
GRIMSMAN, FRANKIE
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Christopher R Hoopes - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Raynak, Daniel
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2022-118447-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Christopher R Hoopes
Crime Date
5/20/2022
Date
5/31/2022
Description
MURDER 2ND DEG-INTENTIONAL
ARSCode
13-1104A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Christopher R Hoopes
Crime Date
5/20/2022
Date
5/31/2022
Description
DSCHRG FIREARM IN CITY LIMIT
ARSCode
13-3107A (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Christopher R Hoopes
Crime Date
5/20/2022
Date
Description
MURDER 2ND DEG-INTENTIONAL
ARSCode
13-1104A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Christopher R Hoopes
Crime Date
5/20/2022
Date
Description
DSCHRG FIREARM IN CITY LIMIT
ARSCode
13-3107A (F6)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2025
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2025
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2025
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Reset Status Conference
Filing Date
2/24/2025
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw
Filing Date
1/10/2025
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
10/11/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS TO
ATTEND THANKSGIVING
Filing Date
9/4/2024
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
7/17/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
4/16/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO APPOINT EXPERT WITNESS
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO APPOINTMENT EXPERT WITNESS
Filing Date
3/5/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Appointment Expert Witness
Filing Date
2/23/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS AND RULE 15.1 REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO THE STATE
Filing Date
2/14/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
11/17/2023
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2023
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
11/3/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS RE: THANKSGIVING
Filing Date
10/9/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S EXPEDITED MOTION
TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
9/7/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
7/24/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Joint Case Management Plan
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL RULE
15.2 DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES
AND
EXHIBITS AND RULE 15.1 REQUEST
FOR PRODUCTION TO THE STATE
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
5/11/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Joint Case Management Plan
Filing Date
5/11/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion for the Disclosure of Colleen Hoopes Locating and/or Identifying Information to Defendant Christopher Hoopes and Joint Motion for Protective Order
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Defendants Response in Opposition to States Motion for Protective Order
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO VACATE COURT’S
ORDER GRANTING STATE’S
MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
4/26/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSE COUNSEL RESTRICT DISSEMINATION OF THE PROTECTED INFORMATION CONTAINED WITHIN VICTIM'S APPLE IPHONE
Filing Date
4/19/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER
Filing Date
4/18/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/11/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Joint Case Management Plan
Filing Date
3/30/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2023
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
$750,000.00
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Modify Release Conditions
Filing Date
2/27/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Modify Release Conditions
Filing Date
2/23/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Supplemental Rule 15.2 Disclosure of Witnesses and Exhibits and Rule 15.1 Request for Production to the State
Filing Date
1/23/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
1/11/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Joint Case Management Plan
Filing Date
12/15/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Joint Case Management Plan
Filing Date
11/21/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2022
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order/$750,000
Filing Date
11/16/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Expedited Motion to Modify Release Conditions (Unopposed)
Filing Date
11/16/2022
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Secured Appearance Bond $750,000.00
Filing Date
11/16/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/15/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
9/15/2022
Description
591 - ME: Complex Case/Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
9/7/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Joint Case Management Plan
Filing Date
8/15/2022
Description
063 - ME: Stipulation Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO REMAND HELD IN ABEYANCE
Filing Date
7/26/2022
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO REMAND TO GRAND
JURY
Filing Date
7/15/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Initial Pretrial Conference Statement
Filing Date
7/12/2022
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Modify Release Conditions
Filing Date
7/8/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Initial Rule 15.2 Disclosure of Witnesses and Exhibits and Rule 15.1 Request for Production to the State
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Designate Case as Complex
Filing Date
6/26/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES, TRANSCRIPTS OR EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY, LOCAL RULE 2.8(e)
Filing Date
6/23/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
6/22/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
6/22/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2022
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
6/20/2022
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/17/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2022
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/7/2022
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2022
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2022
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/21/2022
Time
2:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
5/26/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/31/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
6/3/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/21/2022
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
8/23/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
9/13/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/6/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/27/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/8/2022
Time
8:50
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/12/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/17/2023
Time
8:40
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/24/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/16/2023
Time
9:10
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/5/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/16/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/23/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/19/2023
Time
8:40
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/5/2023
Time
8:40
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/13/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/20/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/13/2023
Time
9:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/20/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/14/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/22/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/15/2024
Time
8:50
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/22/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/15/2024
Time
8:50
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/22/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/29/2024
Time
8:40
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/15/2024
Time
8:40
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/10/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/7/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/14/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/21/2025
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
3/18/2025
Time
8:40
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/20/2025
Time
8:50
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/8/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/14/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/21/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/7/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/8/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/15/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial