Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Beasley, Shaylee | ||
Chloe Rae Sergent - (2) |
Defendant | F | Ortega, Alane | Master Calendar | CR2022-112217-001 |
Keola Cachero Wimbish - (3) |
Defendant | M | Lockhart, David | Master Calendar | CR2022-112217-002 |
B Victim - (4) |
Victim | N/A | Swinford, Robert | ||
B Victim - (5) |
Victim | N/A | To Be Determined |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Chloe Rae Sergent | 13-3623 (F2) | CHILD/VULNERABLE ADULT ABUSE | 12/1/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/14/2022 |
Chloe Rae Sergent | 13-3623 (F2) | CHILD/VULNERABLE ADULT ABUSE | 12/1/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/14/2022 |
Keola Cachero Wimbish | 13-3623 (F2) | CHILD/VULNERABLE ADULT ABUSE | 12/1/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/14/2022 |
Keola Cachero Wimbish | 13-3623 (F2) | CHILD/VULNERABLE ADULT ABUSE | 12/1/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/14/2022 |
Chloe Rae Sergent | 13-3623A1 (F2) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Chloe Rae Sergent | 13-3623A1 (F2) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Chloe Rae Sergent | 13-3623A1 (F2) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Chloe Rae Sergent | 13-3623A1 (F2) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Chloe Rae Sergent | 13-3623B1 (F4) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Chloe Rae Sergent | 13-3623B1 (F4) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Chloe Rae Sergent | 13-3623B1 (F4) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Chloe Rae Sergent | 13-3623B1 (F4) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Chloe Rae Sergent | 13-3623B1 (F4) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Chloe Rae Sergent | 13-1202A1 (M1) | THREAT-INTIM W/INJ-DMGE PROP | 12/1/2020 | |||
Keola Cachero Wimbish | 13-3623A1 (F2) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Keola Cachero Wimbish | 13-3623A1 (F2) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Keola Cachero Wimbish | 13-3623A1 (F2) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Keola Cachero Wimbish | 13-3623A1 (F2) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Keola Cachero Wimbish | 13-3623A1 (F2) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Keola Cachero Wimbish | 13-3623A1 (F2) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Keola Cachero Wimbish | 13-3623A1 (F2) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Keola Cachero Wimbish | 13-3623B1 (F4) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Keola Cachero Wimbish | 13-3623B1 (F4) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Keola Cachero Wimbish | 13-3623B1 (F4) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Keola Cachero Wimbish | 13-3623B1 (F4) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 12/1/2020 | |||
Keola Cachero Wimbish | 13-1202A1 (M1) | THREAT-INTIM W/INJ-DMGE PROP | 12/1/2020 | |||
Keola Cachero Wimbish | 13-1204A2 (F2) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 12/1/2020 | |||
Keola Cachero Wimbish | 13-1204A2 (F2) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 12/1/2020 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
3/2/2023 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 3/2/2023 | |
3/2/2023 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002) | 3/2/2023 | |
2/20/2023 | REP - Report - Party (002) | 2/23/2023 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 | |||
2/3/2023 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 2/3/2023 | |
2/3/2023 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002) | 2/3/2023 | |
1/30/2023 | REP - Report - Party (002) | 1/31/2023 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 | |||
1/27/2023 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 1/30/2023 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 | |||
12/12/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 12/12/2022 | |
12/12/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002) | 12/12/2022 | |
12/6/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 12/7/2022 | |
NOTE: UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE | |||
12/5/2022 | REP - Report - Party (002) | 12/5/2022 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 | |||
12/5/2022 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 12/6/2022 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 | |||
11/30/2022 | 331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001) | 11/30/2022 | |
11/16/2022 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 11/16/2022 | |
11/16/2022 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002) | 11/16/2022 | |
11/9/2022 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 11/10/2022 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 | |||
11/9/2022 | REP - Report - Party (002) | 11/10/2022 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 | |||
10/26/2022 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 10/26/2022 | |
10/26/2022 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002) | 10/26/2022 | |
10/17/2022 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 10/18/2022 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 | |||
10/17/2022 | REP - Report - Party (002) | 10/18/2022 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 | |||
10/6/2022 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001) | 10/6/2022 | |
9/15/2022 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001) | 9/15/2022 | |
9/7/2022 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 9/7/2022 | |
9/7/2022 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002) | 9/7/2022 | |
8/29/2022 | REP - Report - Party (002) | 8/30/2022 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 | |||
8/29/2022 | REP - Report - Party (002) | 8/31/2022 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 | |||
8/26/2022 | REP - Report - Party (002) | 8/30/2022 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 | |||
8/25/2022 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 8/26/2022 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 | |||
8/2/2022 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 8/4/2022 | |
NOTE: Crime Victims Notice of Appearance | |||
8/2/2022 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002) | 8/4/2022 | |
NOTE: Crime Victims Notice of Appearance | |||
7/15/2022 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 7/15/2022 | |
7/15/2022 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002) | 7/15/2022 | |
7/9/2022 | REP - Report - Party (002) | 7/11/2022 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 | |||
6/28/2022 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001) | 6/29/2022 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES, WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES | |||
6/15/2022 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (002) | 6/15/2022 | |
6/15/2022 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001) | 6/15/2022 | |
6/13/2022 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002) | 6/20/2022 | |
6/13/2022 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 6/13/2022 | |
6/13/2022 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002) | 6/13/2022 | |
6/6/2022 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002) | 6/13/2022 | |
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS | |||
6/6/2022 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002) | 6/14/2022 | |
6/6/2022 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002) | 6/16/2022 | |
6/3/2022 | STA - Statement - Party (002) | 6/6/2022 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
6/3/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (002) | 6/7/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION | |||
6/3/2022 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 6/7/2022 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
6/2/2022 | ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (002) | 6/3/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS | |||
6/2/2022 | RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (002) | 6/3/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING | |||
6/2/2022 | ALG - Allegation - Party (002) | 6/3/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
6/2/2022 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002) | 6/3/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
6/2/2022 | NOT - Notice - Party (002) | 6/3/2022 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE | |||
6/2/2022 | AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (002) | 6/6/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13- 708 | |||
6/2/2022 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 6/6/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
6/2/2022 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 6/6/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
5/17/2022 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 5/17/2022 | |
5/17/2022 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002) | 5/17/2022 | |
4/25/2022 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002) | 4/25/2022 | |
4/25/2022 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 4/25/2022 | |
4/20/2022 | ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: Release Order/$50,000 | |||
4/20/2022 | ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (002) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: Secured Appearance Bond $50,000.00 | |||
4/13/2022 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002) | 4/13/2022 | |
4/13/2022 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 4/19/2022 | Plaintiff (1) |
4/13/2022 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 4/19/2022 | Plaintiff (1) |
4/13/2022 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 4/19/2022 | |
4/13/2022 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 4/19/2022 | Plaintiff (1) |
4/13/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/19/2022 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL | |||
4/13/2022 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 4/19/2022 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL | |||
4/13/2022 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 4/19/2022 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM | |||
4/13/2022 | IND - Indictment - Party (002) | 4/19/2022 | Plaintiff (1) |
4/13/2022 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002) | 4/19/2022 | Plaintiff (1) |
4/13/2022 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002) | 4/19/2022 | |
4/13/2022 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002) | 4/19/2022 | Plaintiff (1) |
4/13/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (002) | 4/19/2022 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL | |||
4/13/2022 | ORD - Order - Party (002) | 4/19/2022 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL | |||
4/13/2022 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002) | 4/19/2022 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM | |||
4/12/2022 | NPH - Notice of Affirmation of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001) | 4/18/2022 | |
4/12/2022 | OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (002) | 4/18/2022 | |
4/12/2022 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 4/12/2022 | |
4/12/2022 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002) | 4/12/2022 | |
4/8/2022 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 4/8/2022 | |
4/8/2022 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002) | 4/8/2022 | |
4/8/2022 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 4/8/2022 | |
4/8/2022 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001) | 4/8/2022 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
4/8/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/8/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL | |||
4/8/2022 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 4/8/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER TO SEAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER | |||
4/8/2022 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 4/8/2022 | |
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER | |||
4/8/2022 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002) | 4/8/2022 | |
4/8/2022 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (002) | 4/8/2022 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
4/8/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (002) | 4/8/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL | |||
4/8/2022 | ORD - Order - Party (002) | 4/8/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER TO SEAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER | |||
4/8/2022 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002) | 4/8/2022 | |
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER | |||
4/8/2022 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002) | 4/8/2022 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
4/8/2022 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 4/8/2022 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
4/8/2022 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002) | 4/8/2022 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
4/8/2022 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 4/8/2022 | |
NOTE: IA Packet |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
4/12/2022 | 10:30 | Status Conference |
4/12/2022 | 10:30 | Status Conference |
4/14/2022 | 10:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
4/14/2022 | 10:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
4/20/2022 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
4/20/2022 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
5/13/2022 | 10:30 | Status Conference |
5/17/2022 | 10:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
6/7/2022 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
6/7/2022 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
7/11/2022 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
7/11/2022 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
7/12/2022 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
7/12/2022 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
8/1/2022 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/1/2022 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/16/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
8/16/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
8/29/2022 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
8/29/2022 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
10/17/2022 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
10/17/2022 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
11/4/2022 | 10:00 | Settlement Conference |
11/10/2022 | 9:00 | Complex / Capital Case |
11/10/2022 | 9:00 | Complex / Capital Case |
11/22/2022 | 13:30 | Settlement Conference |
12/5/2022 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
12/5/2022 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
12/20/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
12/20/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
1/31/2023 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
1/31/2023 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
2/22/2023 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
2/22/2023 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
4/3/2023 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
4/3/2023 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
6/6/2023 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/6/2023 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/13/2023 | 9:00 | Trial |
6/13/2023 | 9:00 | Trial |