« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, S P 2 Family Violence East
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Jason Todd Jeschor - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Lang
Case #
CR2022-111684-001
Party Name
MARY ANN JESCHOR - (3)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
EAST, CHANCE
Judge
Case #
CR2022-111684-001
Party Name
KACY FABIE - (4)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
EAST, CHANCE
Judge
Case #
CR2022-111684-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Jason Todd Jeschor
Crime Date
4/1/2022
Date
4/11/2022
Description
MURDER 2ND DEG-INTENTIONAL
ARSCode
13-1104A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Jason Todd Jeschor
Crime Date
4/1/2022
Date
4/11/2022
Description
TAMP W/PHY EVID-DESTROY/ALTER
ARSCode
13-2809A1 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Jason Todd Jeschor
Crime Date
4/1/2022
Date
1/4/2024
Description
MURDER 2ND DEG-INTENTIONAL
ARSCode
13-1104A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Jason Todd Jeschor
Crime Date
4/1/2022
Date
1/4/2024
Description
TAMP W/PHY EVID-DESTROY/ALTER
ARSCode
13-2809A1 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
4/15/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2024
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2024
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2024
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
2/9/2024
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2024
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
INJ - Injunction - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Injunction
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
INJ - Injunction - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Injunction
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
INJ - Injunction - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Injunction
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/5/2024
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
1/31/2024
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2024
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
1/4/2024
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2023
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
8/23/2023
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2023
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THIS MATTER BE DESIGNATED COMPLEX PURSUANT TO RULE 8.2(A)(3) OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE AND IN COMPLIANCE MARICOPA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-127
Filing Date
7/28/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE
DESIGNATION
Filing Date
7/26/2023
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/26/2023
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
7/19/2023
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2023
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2023
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF EXPERT
Filing Date
1/31/2023
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2022
Description
122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2022
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
FOR VICTIMS AND
ASSERTION OF VICTIMS’
CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS
Filing Date
7/1/2022
Description
124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT BY DR. JACQUELINE WORSLEY DATED 06/23/2022
Filing Date
6/30/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT BY DR. JASON R. FRIZZELL DATED 06/25/2022
Filing Date
6/30/2022
Description
SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2022
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 11 APPOINTMENT
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RULE 11 EVALUATION
Filing Date
5/6/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Crime Victims Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUESTED
15.2 DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/22/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/18/2022
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTINUITY OF CARE PLAN
Filing Date
4/8/2022
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/8/2022
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/8/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/7/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER FROM PUBLIC DEFENDER TO THE OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENSE SERVICES
Filing Date
4/7/2022
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/2/2022
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
4/7/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/11/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/15/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
5/9/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/11/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
6/2/2022
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
6/30/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
6/30/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
7/27/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/11/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/8/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
9/22/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
12/1/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
12/12/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/12/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
1/26/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/21/2023
Time
11:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/7/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/5/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/14/2023
Time
14:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/28/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
5/26/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/23/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
7/17/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/21/2023
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
9/21/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/21/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
10/18/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/25/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/7/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
12/7/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
1/4/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/11/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/6/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
4/17/2024
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference