« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Brady, Tiffany
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Gezane Izrael Cabanillas-Lape - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Marrufo, Candy
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2022-110321-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Gezane Izrael Cabanillas-Lape 
Crime Date
3/22/2022
Date
3/31/2022
Description
MANSLAUGHTER-RECKLESS
ARSCode
13-1103A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Gezane Izrael Cabanillas-Lape 
Crime Date
3/22/2022
Date
3/31/2022
Description
MANSLAUGHTER-RECKLESS
ARSCode
13-1103A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Gezane Izrael Cabanillas-Lape 
Crime Date
3/22/2022
Date
3/31/2022
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Gezane Izrael Cabanillas-Lape 
Crime Date
3/22/2022
Date
8/17/2023
Description
MANSLAUGHTER-RECKLESS
ARSCode
13-1103A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Gezane Izrael Cabanillas-Lape 
Crime Date
3/22/2022
Date
8/17/2023
Description
MANSLAUGHTER-RECKLESS
ARSCode
13-1103A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Gezane Izrael Cabanillas-Lape 
Crime Date
3/22/2022
Date
8/17/2023
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2025
Description
067 - ME: Stipulation And Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2025
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2025
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESTITUTION
Filing Date
1/9/2025
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Restitution Stipulation
Filing Date
12/11/2024
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2024
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR A RESTITUTION HEARING
Filing Date
10/18/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND JURISDICTION OVER RESTITUTION
Filing Date
9/30/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO EXTEND PERIOD OF JURISDICTION OVER RESTITUTION
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2023
Description
SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation
Filing Date
10/6/2023
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
10/6/2023
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
10/6/2023
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
10/6/2023
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
10/6/2023
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/6/2023
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
10/5/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
THIRD NOTICE OF FILING
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Sentencing Memorandum
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND NOTICE OF FILING
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
First Notice of Filing
Filing Date
8/31/2023
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2023
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2023
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
8/21/2023
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
8/17/2023
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2023
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR RELEASE OF VICTIM’S MEDICAL RECORDS
Filing Date
8/8/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Final Trial Management Conference Joint Pretrial Statement
Filing Date
7/31/2023
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT OF DENFENDANT’S MOTION FOR CHANGE OF JUDGE FOR CAUSE
Filing Date
7/18/2023
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DENFENDANT’S MOTION FOR CHANGE OF JUDGE FOR CAUSE
Filing Date
7/13/2023
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
6/26/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE OF DEFENSE WITNESSES
Filing Date
6/26/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
4/26/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL
Filing Date
11/16/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
First Request for Supplemental Disclosure
Filing Date
11/7/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Unopposed Motion to Continue FTMC Trial
Filing Date
10/6/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
8/31/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE BY INTRESTED THIRD PARTY
Filing Date
8/18/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Joint Case Management Plan
Filing Date
7/14/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/7/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/5/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Determination of Indigence and Appointment of Funds for Experts
Filing Date
6/9/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANT
Filing Date
6/8/2022
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2022
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Change of Address for Defendant
Filing Date
6/3/2022
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
6/3/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DESIGNATE CASE COMPLEX
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defenses
Filing Date
5/13/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
5/13/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Grand Jury Transcripts
Filing Date
5/11/2022
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
5/11/2022
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/10/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR RELEASE OF VICTIM’S MEDICAL RECORDS
Filing Date
4/21/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/13/2022
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SURETY $50,000 BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Filing Date
4/12/2022
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2022
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
$50,000.00
Filing Date
4/6/2022
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
$1,000,000.00
Filing Date
4/4/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REDETERMINE CONDITIONS OF RELEASE
Filing Date
3/31/2022
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO MODIFY MOTION RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
3/30/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/30/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/30/2022
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2022
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/23/2022
Time
20:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
3/29/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/31/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/5/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/6/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/7/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/7/2022
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/16/2022
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
6/20/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
7/19/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/2/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/16/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/3/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/16/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/1/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/22/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/1/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/25/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/9/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/27/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/10/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/20/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
7/25/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
7/26/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/1/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/3/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/9/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/10/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/16/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/17/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
8/17/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/21/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/21/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/6/2023
Time
14:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
12/6/2024
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/16/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Restitution Hearing
Date
1/10/2025
Time
13:30
Event
Restitution Hearing