« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Fu, Catherine
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Carlos Andres Encinas - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Jakobe, Carissa
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2022-109896-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Carlos Andres Encinas
Crime Date
3/18/2022
Date
3/30/2022
Description
SEXUAL ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1406A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Carlos Andres Encinas
Crime Date
3/18/2022
Date
1/13/2023
Description
SEXUAL ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1406A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2023
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2023
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2023
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
State's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice
Filing Date
1/13/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Response to States Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice
Filing Date
1/13/2023
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
1/13/2023
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
1/12/2023
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO STATES MOTION TO CONTINUE FIRM TRIAL DATE IN VIOLATION OF DEFENDANTS SPEEY TRIAL RIGHTS
Filing Date
12/30/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
12/30/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR COURT’S
MINUTE ENTRY ON STATE’S MOTION
TO CONTINUE FIRM TRIAL DATE FILED
NOVEMBER 15, 2022
Filing Date
11/27/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
11/27/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S
MOTION TO CONTINUE FIRM TRIAL
DATE
Filing Date
11/21/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
11/15/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL TRIAL MANAGMENT CONFERENCE
JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
9/23/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2022
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
9/14/2022
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice of Filing Email to Supplement the Record to The State's CCMC Statement
Filing Date
9/14/2022
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE
DEFENDANT'S OTHER CRIMES,
WRONGS OR ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE
404(b) and (c), ARIZONA RULES OF
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
9/14/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Strike States 404b
Filing Date
9/8/2022
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference
Filing Date
8/3/2022
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
6/1/2022
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/13/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
5/10/2022
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE
DESIGNATION
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/11/2022
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/3/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC
DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT
TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e),(g)
Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
4/3/2022
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF
DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR
NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq.,
ARIZ.R.CRIM.P
Filing Date
3/30/2022
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SURERTY/BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY/$10000
Filing Date
3/30/2022
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT
TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT
TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: STATE'S MOTION TO SEAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/21/2022
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
3/28/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/30/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/5/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
5/19/2022
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
6/20/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
7/18/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/18/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/1/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/1/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/9/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
9/15/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/21/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/15/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/29/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/11/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/17/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial