« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, S P 2 Family Violence East
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Gloria Leonore Reyes - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Blum, Ashley
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2022-106476-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Gloria Leonore Reyes 
Crime Date
2/21/2022
Date
3/2/2022
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Gloria Leonore Reyes 
Crime Date
2/21/2022
Date
3/2/2022
Description
BURGLARY 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1508A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Gloria Leonore Reyes 
Crime Date
2/21/2022
Date
3/2/2022
Description
DSCHRG FIREARM IN CITY LIMIT
ARSCode
13-3107A (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Gloria Leonore Reyes 
Crime Date
2/21/2022
Date
3/2/2022
Description
DISORD CONDUCT-WEAPON/INSTR
ARSCode
13-2904A6 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Gloria Leonore Reyes 
Crime Date
2/21/2022
Date
9/1/2023
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Guilty Except Insane By Court
Disposition
Guilty Except Insane By Court
Party Name
Gloria Leonore Reyes 
Crime Date
2/21/2022
Date
9/1/2023
Description
BURGLARY 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1508A (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty Except Insane By Court
Disposition
Guilty Except Insane By Court
Party Name
Gloria Leonore Reyes 
Crime Date
2/21/2022
Date
9/1/2023
Description
DSCHRG FIREARM IN CITY LIMIT
ARSCode
13-3107A (F6)
Disposition Code
Guilty Except Insane By Court
Disposition
Guilty Except Insane By Court
Party Name
Gloria Leonore Reyes 
Crime Date
2/21/2022
Date
9/1/2023
Description
DISORD CONDUCT-WEAPON/INSTR
ARSCode
13-2904A6 (F6)
Disposition Code
Guilty Except Insane By Court
Disposition
Guilty Except Insane By Court
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2023
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2023
Description
188 - ME: Guilty Except Insane - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2023
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2023
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2023
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Memorandum to Court Re: Submittal on the Record
Filing Date
8/9/2023
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SENTENCING/DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
7/19/2023
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2023
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2023
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO SET STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
5/4/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
4/17/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
3/16/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
1/23/2023
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
12/19/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO THE STATE'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE GEI DEFENSE
Filing Date
12/19/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO FILE RESPONSE TO THE STATE'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE GEI DEFENSE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
12/16/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER SEALING RECORDS
Filing Date
12/14/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Recommendation from Counsel for GEI Evaluation of Defendant
Filing Date
12/6/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
12/6/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
11/21/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO FILE RESPONSE TO THE STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE GEI DEFENSE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
11/8/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE GEI DEFENSE
Filing Date
11/8/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE GEI DEFENSE
Filing Date
10/31/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DEFENSE: INSANITY
Filing Date
10/27/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
7/28/2022
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
7/28/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS
Filing Date
7/28/2022
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
7/28/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.1 REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/16/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/14/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
5/3/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2022
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2022
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
4/15/2022
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Request For Extension of Time to Challenge the Grand Jury Proceedings
Filing Date
4/15/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRESERVE AND DISCLOSE TAPE RECORDINGS OF 911 TAPES AND POLICE RADIO BROADCASTS
Filing Date
4/15/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS
Filing Date
4/15/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.1 REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/14/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/12/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2022
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/7/2022
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
4/1/2022
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S AMENDED MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON 50,000 BOND, RELEASE TO CUSTODY OF THIRD PARTY
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/16/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Motion to Release Defendant on 50,000 Bond, Release to Custody of Third Party
Filing Date
3/14/2022
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2022
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
$1000000
Filing Date
3/2/2022
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
NPH - Notice of Affirmation of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2022
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2022
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
2/24/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
2/24/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/22/2022
Time
5:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
2/28/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/3/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
3/8/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/8/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/21/2022
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
6/9/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/20/2022
Time
8:50
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/20/2022
Time
8:50
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/3/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/28/2022
Time
8:50
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/5/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/8/2022
Time
9:10
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/6/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/7/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/7/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/7/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/1/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/8/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/5/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/16/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
6/23/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/11/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/1/2023
Time
14:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/11/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/18/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial