« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
DEOL, RAVNEET
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Workman, Laurel
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2022-105040-001
Party Name
Christina Marie Burns - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Denny, Johnathan
Judge
Cairo
Case #
CR2022-105040-002
Disposition Information
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
11/18/2021
Date
3/29/2022
Description
CARRY CONCEAL WPN-W/O PERMIT
ARSCode
13-3102A1 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
11/4/2021
Date
3/29/2022
Description
TRAFFICK STOLEN PROP 2ND DEG
ARSCode
13-2307A (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Christina Marie Burns 
Crime Date
11/13/2021
Date
7/19/2022
Description
TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER
ARSCode
13-2008A (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Christina Marie Burns 
Crime Date
11/13/2021
Date
7/19/2022
Description
THEFT CREDIT CARD-CONTROL
ARSCode
13-2102A1 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Christina Marie Burns 
Crime Date
11/18/2021
Date
7/19/2022
Description
THEFT CREDIT CARD-CONTROL
ARSCode
13-2102A1 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Christina Marie Burns 
Crime Date
11/19/2021
Date
7/19/2022
Description
THEFT CREDIT CARD-CONTROL
ARSCode
13-2102A1 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Christina Marie Burns 
Crime Date
2/9/2022
Date
7/19/2022
Description
NARCOTIC DRUG-POSSESS/USE
ARSCode
13-3408A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
11/18/2021
Date
12/15/2022
Description
CARRY CONCEAL WPN-W/O PERMIT
ARSCode
13-3102A1 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
11/4/2021
Date
12/15/2022
Description
TRAFFICK STOLEN PROP 2ND DEG
ARSCode
13-2307A (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Christina Marie Burns 
Crime Date
11/13/2021
Date
7/25/2022
Description
TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER
ARSCode
13-2008A (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Christina Marie Burns 
Crime Date
11/13/2021
Date
7/25/2022
Description
THEFT CREDIT CARD-CONTROL
ARSCode
13-2102A1 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Christina Marie Burns 
Crime Date
11/18/2021
Date
7/25/2022
Description
THEFT CREDIT CARD-CONTROL
ARSCode
13-2102A1 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Christina Marie Burns 
Crime Date
11/19/2021
Date
7/25/2022
Description
THEFT CREDIT CARD-CONTROL
ARSCode
13-2102A1 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Christina Marie Burns 
Crime Date
2/9/2022
Date
7/25/2022
Description
NARCOTIC DRUG-POSSESS/USE
ARSCode
13-3408A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2024
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2024-07-24
Filing Date
7/23/2024
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
7/23/2024
Description
PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PTR
Filing Date
6/14/2024
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2024
Description
DHR - Dispo: Reinstate probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DHR - Disposition Order - Reinstated
Filing Date
6/5/2024
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/5/2024
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement Jail
Filing Date
6/5/2024
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
6/5/2024
Description
PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2024
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
4/21/2024
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
2/26/2024
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2024-02-26
Filing Date
2/25/2024
Description
PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PTR
Filing Date
1/10/2024
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/2023
Description
DHR - Dispo: Reinstate probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DHR - Disposition Order - Reinstated
Filing Date
12/26/2023
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
12/26/2023
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
12/26/2023
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/26/2023
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Release
Filing Date
12/19/2023
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
12/19/2023
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
9/15/2023
Description
133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2023
Description
098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2023
Description
IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2023-09-13
Filing Date
9/11/2023
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2023
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2023
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2023
Description
117 - ME: Guilt New Chg/Prob Violation - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2023
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw
Filing Date
8/16/2023
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
8/8/2023
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
8/8/2023
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
8/1/2023
Description
PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1 Appearance Bond (Secured) set at $500.00
Filing Date
8/1/2023
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2023-08-01
Filing Date
7/7/2023
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2023
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2023
Description
DHR - Dispo: Reinstate probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DHR - Disposition Order - Reinstated
Filing Date
6/29/2023
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Release
Filing Date
6/29/2023
Description
PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/29/2023
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement Jail
Filing Date
6/29/2023
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/29/2023
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
6/16/2023
Description
PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PTR
Filing Date
6/16/2023
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2023-06-16
Filing Date
4/11/2023
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
DHR - Dispo: Reinstate probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DHR - Disposition Order - Reinstated
Filing Date
3/24/2023
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/24/2023
Description
PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/24/2023
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement Jail
Filing Date
3/24/2023
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
3/17/2023
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
3/17/2023
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
1/5/2023
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2022
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2022
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
12/8/2022
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS
Filing Date
12/8/2022
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS
Filing Date
11/29/2022
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
11/21/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/10/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
11/8/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/1/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
10/27/2022
Description
PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2022-10-27
Filing Date
10/26/2022
Description
PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1 Cash Bond set at $10,000
Filing Date
9/26/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
9/21/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR SEPTEMBER 15, 2022 AND TRIAL SET FOR SEPTEMBER 29, 2022
Filing Date
8/31/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Filing Date
8/30/2022
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2022
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLEA AGREEMENT ADDENDUM STIPULATED FACTUAL BASIS
Filing Date
8/24/2022
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2022
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement Jail
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
8/10/2022
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2022
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS OWN RECOGNIZANCE OR TO REDUCE BOND OR TO RELEASE DEFENDANT TO THIRD PARTY CUSTODY
Filing Date
8/3/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL
Filing Date
7/28/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2022
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2022
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Court Clerk Document Plus
Filing Date
7/25/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
7/19/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Modify Release Conditions
Filing Date
7/11/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
7/11/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
7/7/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2022
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2022
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
6/9/22
Filing Date
6/14/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
6/9/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
6/9/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/27/2022
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSE AND LIST OF WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY ROLE 15.1(a) and (b) AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/23/2022
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
PSO - Pretrial Services Order Issued - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
WARRANT ISSUED
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
5/17/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICES OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURES
Filing Date
5/11/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
5/6/2022
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/2/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13- 708(C)
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES, TRANSCRIPTS, OR EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(e)
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
4/22/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/22/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/19/2022
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/18/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/18/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/11/2022
Description
173 - ME: Arraignment Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2022
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
03/21/22
Filing Date
4/1/2022
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
NPH - Notice of Affirmation of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
3/22/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2022
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2022
Description
IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2022-02-24
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2022
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2022
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2022
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2022
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
2/14/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2022
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
2/14/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
2/14/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
2/14/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
2/14/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/16/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/16/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/18/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
2/18/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
2/24/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/28/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
3/22/2022
Time
2:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
3/24/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/28/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
3/28/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/5/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/5/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/6/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/8/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/12/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/12/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
5/19/2022
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/19/2022
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/25/2022
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
6/9/2022
Time
20:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
6/15/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference - Post Warrant
Date
6/15/2022
Time
9:10
Event
Status Conference - Post Warrant
Date
6/20/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
6/21/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
6/27/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
6/29/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference - Post Warrant
Date
6/29/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference - Post Warrant
Date
7/19/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/19/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
7/19/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
7/26/2022
Time
9:40
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/2/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/9/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/16/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/18/2022
Time
9:50
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/18/2022
Time
9:50
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/1/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/13/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
9/15/2022
Time
10:10
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/29/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/21/2022
Time
9:40
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/29/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/19/2022
Time
10:40
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/19/2022
Time
10:40
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/3/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/17/2023
Time
20:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
3/24/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/24/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
6/22/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
6/29/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
6/29/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
8/8/2023
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
8/15/2023
Time
8:29
Event
Review Hearing
Date
8/15/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
8/15/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
8/16/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
9/13/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
9/14/2023
Time
8:29
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
9/14/2023
Time
8:29
Event
Review Hearing
Date
9/14/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
12/19/2023
Time
20:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
12/26/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference - Post Warrant
Date
12/26/2023
Time
8:32
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
4/21/2024
Time
11:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
4/29/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/29/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
6/5/2024
Time
8:29
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
6/5/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Disposition Hearing