« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Clark, Joshua
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Thomas James Desharnais - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Tavassoli, Alan
Judge
Fish
Case #
CR2022-103685-001
Party Name
Stephanie Marie Davis - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Bublik, Terry
Judge
Fish
Case #
CR2022-103685-002
Party Name
AMANDRIA SMITH - (4)
Relationship
Victim Representative
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Newstone, David
Judge
Case #
CR2022-103685-002
Disposition Information
Party Name
Thomas James Desharnais
Crime Date
1/30/2022
Date
2/8/2022
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Thomas James Desharnais
Crime Date
1/30/2022
Date
2/8/2022
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Thomas James Desharnais
Crime Date
1/30/2022
Date
2/8/2022
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Thomas James Desharnais
Crime Date
1/30/2022
Date
2/8/2022
Description
TAMP W/PHY EVID-DESTROY/ALTER
ARSCode
13-2809A1 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Stephanie Marie Davis
Crime Date
1/30/2022
Date
2/8/2022
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Stephanie Marie Davis
Crime Date
1/30/2022
Date
2/8/2022
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Stephanie Marie Davis
Crime Date
1/30/2022
Date
2/8/2022
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Stephanie Marie Davis
Crime Date
1/30/2022
Date
2/8/2022
Description
TAMP W/PHY EVID-DESTROY/ALTER
ARSCode
13-2809A1 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Stephanie Marie Davis
Crime Date
1/30/2022
Date
2/8/2022
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Stephanie Marie Davis
Crime Date
1/30/2022
Date
2/8/2022
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Thomas James Desharnais
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Thomas James Desharnais
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Thomas James Desharnais
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Thomas James Desharnais
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Thomas James Desharnais
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Thomas James Desharnais
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Thomas James Desharnais
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Thomas James Desharnais
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Thomas James Desharnais
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Thomas James Desharnais
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Thomas James Desharnais
Crime Date
1/28/2022
Date
Description
TAMP W/PHY EVID-DESTROY/ALTER
ARSCode
13-2809A1 (F6)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Stephanie Marie Davis
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME
ARSCode
13-1105A2 (F1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Stephanie Marie Davis
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Stephanie Marie Davis
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Stephanie Marie Davis
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Stephanie Marie Davis
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Stephanie Marie Davis
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Stephanie Marie Davis
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Stephanie Marie Davis
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Stephanie Marie Davis
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Stephanie Marie Davis
Crime Date
8/1/2019
Date
Description
CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT
ARSCode
13-3623B1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Party Name
Stephanie Marie Davis
Crime Date
1/28/2022
Date
Description
TAMP W/PHY EVID-DESTROY/ALTER
ARSCode
13-2809A1 (F6)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/2/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/9/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENT
Filing Date
4/28/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/29/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRODUCE FORENSIC DNA & LUMINOL PROCEDURES & TECHNICAL PROTOCOLS FOR SCOTTSDALE PD CRIME LAB
Filing Date
4/21/2025
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/TO WAIVE PRESENCE FOR HEARING
Filing Date
4/14/2025
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2025
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2025
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/11/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/7/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
029 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
4/2/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/2/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF DISCLOSURE BY STATE IN THIS MATTER AND ORDER
Filing Date
4/1/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF DISCLOSURE BY STATE IN THIS MATTER
Filing Date
4/1/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
4/1/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF DISCLOSURE BY STATE IN THIS MATTER AND ORDER
Filing Date
4/1/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF DISCLOSURE BY STATE IN THIS MATTER
Filing Date
4/1/2025
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/7/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/31/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/31/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/31/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/28/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2025
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/18/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE MOTION, SUBPEONA, FOREIGN SUBPOENA, AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, AND ORDER EX PARTE AND UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING EX-PARTE MOTION
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING EX-PARTE MOTION
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE MOTION SUBPEONA, FOREIGN SUBPOENA AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, AND ORDER EX PARTE AND UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
3/10/2025
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2025
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2025
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
3/6/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
3/3/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/3/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE
Filing Date
2/26/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
2/25/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CAPITAL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
2/25/2025
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/26/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
2/25/2025
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/25/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/26/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
USB- EXHIBIT A TO MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE
Filing Date
2/22/2025
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2025
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Join Co defendants Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
VICTIM GUARDIAN’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION
TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING USB DEVICE AS
EXHIBIT A TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Victim Guardian Response to Defendant Motion to Continue
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/3/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE USB DEVICE AS EXHIBIT A TO MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE
Filing Date
2/19/2025
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING
Filing Date
2/18/2025
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE CAPITAL
TRIALS
Filing Date
2/14/2025
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to File USB Device as Exhibit A to Motion for Change of Venue
Filing Date
2/14/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Change of Venue
Filing Date
2/14/2025
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING
Filing Date
2/11/2025
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2025
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2025
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT/TO UNSEAL AND PRODUCE MENTAL HEALTH HEARING AND STATUS REPORTS
Filing Date
1/21/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/23/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE TO COURT RE: Extended Stay
America Hotel’s Court Ordered
Disclosure
Filing Date
1/16/2025
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
1/9/2025
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/9/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2025
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Filing Date
12/31/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/3/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO RESET THE CASE
STATUS CONFERENCE CURRENTLY
SET FOR 2/14/25
Filing Date
12/17/2024
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2024
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Complex Case Management Plan, December 12, 2024
Filing Date
12/4/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2024
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2024
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION
TO EXTEND MITIGATION
DISCLOSURE DEADLINE
Filing Date
11/18/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE, ORAL ARGUMENT, AND MITIGATION DEADLINE FROM DECEMBER 10, 2024, TO DECEMBER 12, 2024
Filing Date
11/15/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO EXTEND MITIGATION DEADLINE
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR COURT ORDER TO OBTAIN THERAPY RECORDS OF VICTIM L.G
Filing Date
11/5/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR COURT ORDER TO OBTAIN THERAPY RECORDS OF VICTIM L.G.
Filing Date
11/4/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND MITIGATION DISCLOSURE DEADLINE
Filing Date
11/1/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION TO UNSEAL AND
PRODUCE MENTAL HEALTH
HEARING & STATUS REPORTS
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Mitigation Deadline
Filing Date
10/25/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S
RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR
COURT ORDER TO OBTAIN
THERAPY/SCHOOL RECORDS OF
VICTIM L.G.
Filing Date
10/23/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY
FOR, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION
FOR SHORT CONTINUANCE OF,
NOVEMBER 5, 2024 CAPITAL CASE
MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
10/23/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY
FOR, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION
FOR SHORT CONTINUANCE OF,
NOVEMBER 5, 2024 CAPITAL CASE
MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
10/18/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION
FOR COURT ORDER TO OBTAIN
THERAPY RECORDS OF VICTIM
L.G.
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to Victim Guardians Response to Motion for Court Order to Obtain Therapy/School Records of Victim L.G.
Filing Date
10/9/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Desharnais, et.al.; Geoffrey Fish
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
VICTIM GUARDIAN'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR COURT ORDER TO OBTAIN THERAPY RECORDS OF VICTIM L.G.
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: STATE'S MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR COURT ORDER TO OBTAIN THERAPY RECORDS OF VICTIM L.G.
Filing Date
10/4/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2024
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO EXTEND
DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO
MOTION FOR COURT ORDER TO
OBTAIN THERAPY RECORDS OF
VICTIM L.G.
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF CELLPHONES AND LAPTOP FOR EXAMINATION
Filing Date
9/27/2024
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF
RETURN OF EVIDENCE ITEM
Filing Date
9/19/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COURT ORDER TO
OBTAIN THERAPY RECORDS OF
VICTIM L.G.
Filing Date
9/16/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROHIBITING DISSEMINATION OF THE FOLLOWING EXTENDED STAY AMERICA HOTEL DISCLOSURE TO PERSONS OTHER THAN THE PROSECUTION AND DEFENSE TEAMS INCLUDING ANY EXPERTS AND CONSULTANTS THEY RETAIN
Filing Date
9/12/2024
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/11/2024
Filing Date
9/11/2024
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL
PRODUCTION OF CELLPHONES
AND LAPTOP FOR EXAMINATION
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT COMPLEX CASE
MANAGMENT PLAN
September 4, 2024
Filing Date
8/29/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Status Report
Filing Date
8/27/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
023 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
8/27/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT ORDER
Filing Date
8/27/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANT STEPHANIE MARIE DAVIS' MOTION TO UNSEAL AND PRODUCE MENTAL HEALTH HEARING AND STATUS REPORTS
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE DEFENDANTS MOTION TOUNSEAL AND PRODUCE MENTAL HEALTH HEARING AND STATUS REPORTS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
8/8/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Waive Appearances and Reset Oral Argument on Substantive Motions
Filing Date
8/2/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
HEARING DATE: 08/06/2024
Filing Date
7/30/2024
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Status Report
Filing Date
7/24/2024
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Desharnais, et.al.; Geoffrey Fish
Filing Date
7/19/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/11/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF RETURN OF EVIDENCE ITEMS
Filing Date
7/10/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF
RETURN OF EVIDENCE ITEM
Filing Date
7/5/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE
OF RETURN OF EVIDENCE ITEMS
Filing Date
7/5/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER RE: Extended Stay America Hotel
Filing Date
6/20/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’MOTION FOR DISCOVERY filed 5/2/24.
Filing Date
6/14/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2024
Description
RDM - Response to Defendant’s Motion for Discovery - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MAY 2, 2024, MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
6/2/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY RE: DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR COURT ORDERED DISCLOSURE RE: Witness Courtney Lage and Extended Stay America
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF
APPEARANCE
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
5/24/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
5/24/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN MAY 29, 2024
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE RE: MOTION TO DISMISS DUPLICITOUS COUNTS 1- 5 & 9 OF THE INDICTMENT
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER RE:
Defense Crime Scene Investigation at
Extended Stay America Hotel
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENT
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO UNSEAL AND PRODUCE MENTAL HEALTH HEARING & STATUS REPORTS
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO PARTIES STIPULATION TO PHOTOGRAPH SCAN MATERIALS
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO PARTIES STIPULATION TO PHOTOGRAPH SCAN MATERIALS
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Extended Stay Americas Objections to Request for Court Order
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Join Co-defendant Daviss motion for discovery filed on May 2, 2024
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS DUPLICITOUS COUNTS
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STIPULATION TO PHOTOGRAPH/SCAN MATERIALS
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STIPULATION TO PHOTOGRAPH/SCAN MATERIALS
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER RE:
Extended Stay America Hotel
Filing Date
5/2/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Court Order re Extended Stay America Hotel
Filing Date
5/2/2024
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Discovery
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Witnesses Phase I
Filing Date
4/28/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS DUPLICITOUS COUNTS 1- 5 & 9 OF THE INDICTMENT
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT
PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
HEARING DATE: 03/26/2024
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGMENT PLAN FOR MARCH 25, 2024
Filing Date
3/24/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defendants Proposed Trial Schedule
Filing Date
3/21/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS PROPOSED TRIAL SCHEDULE
Filing Date
2/16/2024
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION
TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
2/5/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION
TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Trial Date of April 16, 2024
Filing Date
1/30/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
1/26/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL DEFENDANT'S REPLY RE MOTION FOR MEDICAL CONSULT AND/OR TREATMENT AND TO PROVIDE REGULARLY SCHEDULED MEDICATION
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR THE COURT TO ORDER MEDICAL CONSULT AND/OR TREATMENT AND TO PROVIDE REGULARLY SCHEDULED MEDICATION
Filing Date
1/17/2024
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Desharnais, et.al.; Geoffrey Fish
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT
PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
1/10/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation RE OME Slides
Filing Date
1/10/2024
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation RE OME Slides
Filing Date
1/10/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR THE COURT TO ORDER MEDICAL CONSULT AND/OR TREATMENT AND TO PROVIDE REGULARLY SCHEDULED MEDICATION
Filing Date
1/10/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE ITS RESONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR THE COURT TO ORDER MEDICAL CONSULT AND/OR TREATMENT AND TO PROVIDE REGULARLY SCHEDULED MEDICATION UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/10/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR MEDICAL CONSULT AND/OR TREATEMENT AND TO PROVIDE REGULARLY SCHEDULED MEDICATION
Filing Date
1/9/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR THE COURT TO ORDER MEDICAL CONSULT AND/OR TREATMENT AND TO PROVIDE REGULARLY SCHEDULED MEDICATION
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: STATE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL HEALTH RECORDS
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES MOTION TO FILE ITS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S "MOTION FOR THE COURT TO ORDER MEDICAL CONSULT AND/OR TREATMENT AND TO PROVIDE REGULARLY SCHEDULED MEDICATION" UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
12/10/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL
DISCOVERY RE: Autopsy
Filing Date
12/8/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL
DISCOVERY
Filing Date
12/7/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
.
Filing Date
11/22/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’s MOTION
FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE:
CONFIDENTIAL HEALTH RECORDS
Filing Date
11/20/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to States Motion for Protective Order Regarding Confidential Health Records
Filing Date
11/16/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR
PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING
CONFIDENTIAL HEALTH RECORDS
Filing Date
11/16/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR
PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING
CONFIDENTIAL HEALTH RECORDS
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DISCOVERY RE DNA
Filing Date
11/6/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT COMPLEX CASE
MANAGMENT PLAN FOR
NOVEMBER 9, 2023
Filing Date
11/3/2023
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/31/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT COMPLEX CASE
MANAGMENT PLAN FOR OCTOBER 19, 2023
Filing Date
10/12/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Seal Document
Filing Date
10/10/2023
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Filing Date
10/8/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO CO-DEFENDANT’S
DESHARNAIS’ OBJECTION TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR
TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF
OFFICIAL COURT DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
10/8/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S SECOND
REQUEST FOR MORE DEFINITE
STATEMENT
Filing Date
10/8/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SECOND REQUEST FOR
MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT
Filing Date
10/6/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE AND NOTICE OF DEFENSES
Filing Date
10/3/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT DESHARNAIS' OBJECTION TO CO-DEFENDANT STEPHANIE MARIE DAVIS' MOTION FOR TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES, TRANSCRIPTS, TAPES OR EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(e)
Filing Date
10/2/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10/02/2023
Filing Date
10/2/2023
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESTRICTING DISSEMINATION OF DISCOVERY
Filing Date
9/30/2023
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
RE: DNA
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/26/2023
Filing Date
9/26/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defenses
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: MOTION FOR RELEASE OF MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE JAIL RECORDS RE: THOMAS DESHARNAIS
Filing Date
9/19/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED CHARGING DOCUMENT CONSOLIDATION
Filing Date
9/19/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED CHARGING DOCUMENT CONSOLIDATION
Filing Date
9/18/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Defendant Davis’s Motion for Release of MCSO Jail Records re: Thomas Desharnais
Filing Date
9/18/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Status Report
Filing Date
9/18/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
RE: Thomas Desharnais
Filing Date
9/18/2023
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRODUCE
DISCOVERY
Filing Date
9/18/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR TEMPORARY
REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT
FILES, TRANSCRIPTS, TAPES OR
EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO MARICOPA
COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(e)
Filing Date
9/11/2023
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Desharnais, et.al.; Geoffrey Fish
Filing Date
9/11/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2023
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANT STEPHANIE MARIE DAVIS' REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
8/29/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR MORE
DEFINITE STATEMENT
Filing Date
8/29/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Defendants Motion to Sever Defendants
Filing Date
8/29/2023
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBIT Re: MOTION TO SEVER
DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
8/28/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
State's Response to Motion to Sever
Filing Date
8/28/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION
TO SEVER
Filing Date
8/28/2023
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses
Filing Date
8/25/2023
Description
053 - ME: Case Consolidation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2023
Description
053 - ME: Case Consolidation - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Filing Date
8/23/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Filing Date
8/22/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANT STEPHANIE MARIE DAVIS’ REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
8/17/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2023
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2023
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request For Discovery
Filing Date
8/11/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
8/9/2023
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Desharnais, et.al.; Geoffrey Fish
Filing Date
8/7/2023
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S AMENDED NOTICE OF
INTENT TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY,
NOTICE OF AGGRAVATING
FACTORS AND WITNESSES
Filing Date
8/7/2023
Description
NID - Notice of Intent to Seek the Death Penalty - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S AMENDED NOTICE OF
INTENT TO SEEK DEATH PENALTY,
NOTICE OF AGGRAVATING
FACTORS AND WITNESSES
Filing Date
8/7/2023
Description
NOJ – Notice of Joinder - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Joinder to Co-Defendant’s Motion to Continue Case Status Conference on 8/15/2023
Filing Date
8/6/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue CSC on 8-15-23
Filing Date
7/28/2023
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/26/2023
Filing Date
7/18/2023
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to extend rule 1.9 time limit
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES
Filing Date
7/13/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-PARTY MARICOPA COUNTY
SHERIFF’S OFFICE’S NOTICE
REGARDING DEFENDANT’S
MOTION FOR RELEASE OF JAIL
PHONE RECORDS
Filing Date
7/7/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/07/2023
Filing Date
6/29/2023
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2023
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO THE JUNE 27, 2023 CAMERA REQUEST
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER PROTECTING PUBLIC RECORDS FROM DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/20/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE CONTENTS OF THE FILES FOR MARICOPA COUNTY OFFICE OF THE MEDICAL EXAMINER CASE NO. 22-01327 SHALL BE PROTECTED FROM PUBLIC DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO CO-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL-MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE PHONE RECORDS
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSE OBJECTION TO STATE’S MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW OF WITNESS MATERIAL
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to States Motion for In Camera Review of Witness Material
Filing Date
6/18/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RELEASE OF
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF’S
OFFICE JAIL RECORDS RE: THOMAS
DESHARNAIS
Filing Date
6/18/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RELEASE OF
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF’S
OFFICE JAIL RECORDS RE: DAVID
FOSTER
Filing Date
6/18/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RELEASE OF
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF’S
OFFICE JAIL RECORDS RE: DAVID
FOSTER
Filing Date
6/9/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW
OF WITNESS MATERIAL
Filing Date
6/8/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW
OF WITNESS MATERIAL
Filing Date
6/1/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2023
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL VICTIM GUARDIAN'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
5/31/2023
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL VICTIM GUARDIAN'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
5/26/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
VICTIM GUARDIAN'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
5/26/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
VICTIM GUARDIAN'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
5/26/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
VICTIM GUARDIAN’S MOTION TO FILE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
5/26/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
VICTIM GUARDIAN'S MOTION TO FILE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
5/26/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/26/2023
Filing Date
5/18/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RELEASE OF
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF’S
OFFICE JAIL PHONE RECORDS
Filing Date
5/18/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Court Order re Desharnais jail calls
Filing Date
5/12/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Preliminary Hearing
Set for May 18, 2023
Filing Date
5/10/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO BE FILED EX PARTE AND REMAIN UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
5/10/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE MOTION,
AFFIDAVIT, AND ORDER EX PARTE
AND UNDER SEAL (7)
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to File Motion and Order Ex
Parte and Under Seal (8)
Filing Date
4/26/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 04/26/2023
Filing Date
4/21/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O.
NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
4/17/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Complex Case Management Plan
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/02/2023
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
2/13/2023
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA AND AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2023
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Filing Date
2/6/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROVIDE COMPLETE AND UNREDACTED COPIES OF MEDICAL RECORDS
Filing Date
2/6/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROVIDE COMPLETE AND UNREDACTED COPIES OF MEDICAL RECORDS
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COURT
ORDER COMPELLING HEALTH
CARE PROVIDERS TO PROVIDE
PROTECTED HEALTH
INFORMATION
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COURT
ORDER COMPELLING HEALTH
CARE PROVIDERS TO PROVIDE
PROTECTED HEALTH
INFORMATION
Filing Date
1/24/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGMENT PLAN
Filing Date
1/12/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY TO MOTION FOR
A.R.S. § 13-753 and 13-754
SCREENING EVALUATIONS
Filing Date
1/5/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/05/2023
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSE OBJECTION TO ANY COURT ORDERED SANITY, I.Q. AND COMPETENCY EVALUATIONS
Filing Date
1/3/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR A.R.S. § 13-753 and
13-754 SCREENING EVALUATIONS
Filing Date
12/28/2022
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/20/2022
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/9/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2022
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & APPOINTMENT PURSUANT TO RULE (S) 6.2 AND 6.8
Filing Date
12/5/2022
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/5/2022
Filing Date
12/5/2022
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/5/2022
Filing Date
12/5/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Desharnais, et.al.; Geoffrey Fish
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT COMPLEX CASE
MANAGMENT PLAN
Filing Date
11/22/2022
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/22/2022
Filing Date
11/16/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTION TO MOTION TO
WITHDRAW THE MARICOPA
COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER’S
OFFICE FROM
REPRESENTATION
Filing Date
11/15/2022
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE MARICOPA COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE FROM REPRESENTATION
Filing Date
11/9/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RULING ON DEFENDANT DAVIS' MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANT DESHARNAIS' MOTION TO PRECLUDE MCAO FROM OBTAINING RECORDS FROM MCSO RELATED TO PROFESSIONAL VISITS
Filing Date
11/3/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Of Arizona vs. Desharnais, et.al.; Geoffrey Fish
Filing Date
11/1/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/01/2022
Filing Date
10/18/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10/04/2022
Filing Date
10/4/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
10/4/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
9/30/2022
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S OBJECTION TO
COURT ORDERED IQ TESTING
AND COMPETENCY/SANITY
SCREENING
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSE OBJECTION TO COURT ORDERED IQ TESTING AND COMPETENCY/SANITY SCREENING
Filing Date
9/8/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/08/2022
Filing Date
8/31/2022
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2022
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO DISMISS OR ALTERNATIVELY
MOTION TO REMAND FOR NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
8/10/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CAPITAL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AUGUST 2022
Filing Date
8/5/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGMENT PLAN
Filing Date
8/3/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 08/03/2022
Filing Date
7/26/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER REGARDING COURT'S JUNE 1, 2022 ORDER
Filing Date
7/26/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Motion to Compel - Access to Photographs of Co-Defendant
Filing Date
7/22/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S SECOND MOTION TO COMPEL ACCESS TO CODEFENDANT’S IMAGES
Filing Date
7/12/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL – ACCESS TO PHOTOGRAPHS OF CO-DEFENDANT
Filing Date
7/7/2022
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2022
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2022
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2022
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/06/2022
Filing Date
7/6/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR OBJECTION TO IQ
Filing Date
7/5/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING IS VACATED AND RESET
Filing Date
7/1/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO CORRECT MINUTE ENTRY DATED 06/01/2022 NUNC PRO TUNC
Filing Date
6/29/2022
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR OBJECTION TO IQ, COMPETENCY, AND SANITY PRESCREENING EVALUATIONS
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE RULE 6.2/6.8 HEARING SET FOR JULY 20, 2022
Filing Date
6/23/2022
Description
960 ME: Capital Case Assignment and Scheduling Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2022
Description
960 ME: Capital Case Assignment and Scheduling Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2022
Description
NID - Notice of Intent to Seek the Death Penalty - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO
SEEK DEATH PENALTY, NOTICE
OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS AND
WITNESSES
Filing Date
6/16/2022
Description
NID - Notice of Intent to Seek the Death Penalty - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO
SEEK DEATH PENALTY, NOTICE
OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS AND
WITNESSES
Filing Date
6/15/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/3/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/2/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 06/02/2022
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL – PHOTOGRAPHS OF DEFENDANT AND CO-DEFENDANT
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO CO-DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL – PHOTOGRAPHS OF DEFENDANT AND CO-DEFENDANT
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO REMAND FOR NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
defendants motion to file under seal
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO COMPEL PHOTOGRAPHS OF
DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO COMPEL PHOTOGRAPHS OF
DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
5/20/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO EXCEED
PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
5/20/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO FILE STATE’S
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO DISMISS OR
ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO
REMAND UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO CO-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL-PHOTOGRAPHS OF DEFENDANT AND CO-DEFENDANT
Filing Date
5/12/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to have Separate Court Dates From Co-Defendant Davis
Filing Date
5/12/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO CO-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO WAIVE DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE FOR MAY 12, 2022 IPTC
Filing Date
5/10/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Compel - Photographs of Defendant and Co-Defendant
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE DEFENDANT'S PRESENCE FOR MAY 12, 2022 IPTC
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
5/4/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING RULE 12.9 MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
5/2/2022
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED 05/02/22
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF
OPPORTUNITY TO INSPECT
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF
OPPORTUNITY TO INSPECT
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/25/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE MOTION TO REMAIN SEALED
Filing Date
4/25/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO REMAIN UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
4/25/2022
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION
Filing Date
4/25/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION
Filing Date
4/22/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
RECONSIDER
Filing Date
4/18/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to File Motion and Order Ex Parte and Under Seal (Ex parte 5)
Filing Date
4/18/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to File Motion and Order Ex Parte and Under Seal (Ex parte 6)
Filing Date
4/14/2022
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO RECONSIDER DENIAL OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE MCAO FROM OBTAINING RECORDS FROM MCSO RELATED TO PROFESSIONAL VISITS
Filing Date
4/13/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2022
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT RULE 12 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION TO REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
4/7/2022
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2022
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2022
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM AND AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED 04/06/22
Filing Date
4/4/2022
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO
PRECLUDE MCAO FROM
OBTAINING RECORDS FROM
MCSO RELATED TO
PROFESSIONAL VISITS
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON- PARTY MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF PAUL PENZONE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE MCAO FROM OBTAINING RECORDS AND MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO
PRECLUDE MCAO FROM
OBTAINING RECORDS FROM
MCSO RELATED TO
PROFESSIONAL VISITS
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Initial Pretrial Conference Statement
Filing Date
3/22/2022
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT DAVIS' MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANT DESHARNAIS' MOTION TO PRECLUDE MCAO FROM OBTAIING RECORDS FROM MCSO RELATED TO PROFESSIONAL VISITS
Filing Date
3/17/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE AND NOTICE OF DEFENSES
Filing Date
3/15/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING RULE 12.9 MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
3/14/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE MCAO FROM OBTAINING RECORDS FROM MCSO RELATED TO PROFESSIONAL VISITS AND MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
3/10/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
3/8/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
EXTEND TIME FOR FILING RULE
12.9 MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
3/8/2022
Description
067 - ME: Stipulation And Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2022
Description
067 - ME: Stipulation And Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2022
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING RULE 12.9 MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
3/5/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE
Filing Date
3/4/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
3/2/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE NEW DEADLINE FOR THE STATE TO FILE NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK THE DEATH PENALTY IS 06/17/22
Filing Date
3/2/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 3/01/2022
Filing Date
3/2/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to File Motion and Order Ex Parte and Under Seal (3)
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE
DEADLINE
Filing Date
2/25/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2022
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE
Filing Date
2/25/2022
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02/23/2022
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to File Motion and Order Ex Parte and Under Seal (Ex parte 2)
Filing Date
2/18/2022
Description
569 - ME: Not Guilty Arraignment/Complex Case Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/18/2022
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2022
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2022
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
2/15/2022
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
2/15/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT DAVIS' MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANT DESHARNAIS' MOTION TO COMPEL ACCESS TO EXTENDED STAY AMERICA
Filing Date
2/14/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Victim Guardian
Filing Date
2/14/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Victim Guardian
Filing Date
2/11/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Compel Access to Extended Stay America
Filing Date
2/11/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ESA MANAGEMENT, LLC'S RESPONSE TO THOMAS JAMES DESHARNAIS' MOTION TO COMPEL ACCESS TO EXTENDED STAY AMERICA
Filing Date
2/8/2022
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT
TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
2/8/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Seal the Form IV and Addendum
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL THE FORM IV AND ADDENDUM
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT ORDER
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RE: STATE'S MOTION TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CONFIDENTIAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RE: STATE'S MOTOIN TO FILE CONFDENTIAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CONFIDENTIAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
NPH - Notice of Affirmation of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO SEAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER
Filing Date
2/3/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER
Filing Date
2/3/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO VACATE STATUS
CONFERENCE/ AFFIRM
PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
2/3/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
2/3/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO SEAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER
Filing Date
2/3/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/7/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/7/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/9/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
2/9/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
2/15/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/15/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/16/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/29/2022
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
3/29/2022
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/12/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/12/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/1/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/1/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/1/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/20/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/20/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/2/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/2/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/3/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/3/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/3/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/3/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/8/2022
Time
8:55
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/8/2022
Time
8:55
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/17/2022
Time
9:45
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/27/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/27/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/10/2022
Time
8:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/10/2022
Time
8:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/11/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/11/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/7/2022
Time
8:50
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/7/2022
Time
8:50
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/11/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/18/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/18/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/1/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/1/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/19/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/19/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/20/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/20/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/15/2023
Time
9:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/15/2023
Time
9:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/19/2023
Time
8:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/19/2023
Time
8:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/19/2023
Time
8:45
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/19/2023
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/9/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/9/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/17/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/17/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/27/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/27/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/26/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/26/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/16/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/16/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/29/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/29/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/6/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/6/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/6/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/4/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/4/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/4/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/5/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/5/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/10/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/10/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/12/2024
Time
8:45
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/12/2024
Time
8:45
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/28/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/14/2025
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/14/2025
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/28/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/28/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/6/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/6/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/18/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/18/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/2/2025
Time
14:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/2/2025
Time
14:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/24/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/24/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/28/2025
Time
10:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/28/2025
Time
10:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/9/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/9/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/9/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/9/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/9/2025
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/9/2025
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/23/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/23/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/29/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/29/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/17/2025
Time
14:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/17/2025
Time
14:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/6/2026
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/6/2026
Time
10:30
Event
Trial