« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, S P 2 Sex Crimes East
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Carlos Andres Encinas - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Jakobe, Carissa
Judge
Brain
Case #
CR2022-002505-001
Party Name
B Victim - (3)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
F
Attorney
Godbehere, Gina
Judge
Case #
CR2022-002505-001
Party Name
B Victim - (4)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2022-002505-001
Party Name
Gina Godbehere - (5)
Relationship
Victim Representative
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2022-002505-001
Party Name
B Witness - (6)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2022-002505-001
Party Name
B Witness - (7)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2022-002505-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Carlos Andres Encinas 
Crime Date
5/17/2020
Date
4/30/2025
Description
SEXUAL ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1406A (F2)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Party Name
Carlos Andres Encinas 
Crime Date
3/18/2022
Date
4/30/2025
Description
SEXUAL ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1406A (F2)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Party Name
Carlos Andres Encinas 
Crime Date
3/18/2022
Date
4/30/2025
Description
SEXUAL ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1406A (F2)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Party Name
Carlos Andres Encinas 
Crime Date
1/22/2022
Date
4/30/2025
Description
SEXUAL ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1406A (F2)
Disposition Code
Disms By Defense Motion
Disposition
Dismissed By Defense Motion
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2025
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2025
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
5/1/2025
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
4/25/2025
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply RE: Defendants Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice PURSUANT TO RULE 16.4(B),(C),(D) ARIZ. R. CRIM.P.
Filing Date
4/22/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
4/15/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2025
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 16.4(b),(c), (d), Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
4/13/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Exceed Page Limit RE: Defendants Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice RULE 1.9(C) ARIZ R CRIM P
Filing Date
4/10/2025
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2025
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2025
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE FTMC AND TRIAL
Filing Date
3/3/2025
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2025
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF FILING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
2/13/2025
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2025
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Stipulation for Motion to Continue Firm Trial Date
Filing Date
2/7/2025
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulated Motion to Continue Firm Trial Date
Filing Date
1/10/2025
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2024
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2024
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALED JURY QUESTIONNAIRES
Filing Date
11/14/2024
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DELIBERATION 1-6
Filing Date
11/14/2024
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL HEARING
Filing Date
11/13/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2024
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2024
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2024
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR MISTRIAL & TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE DUE TO INTENTIONAL PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
10/30/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO ALLOW VIRTUAL TESTIMONY
Filing Date
10/25/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO APPEAR AT TRIAL WITH UPDATED MEDICAL RECORDS
Filing Date
10/25/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
UPDATED MEDICAL STATUS AND INABILITY TO APPEAR FOR TRIAL
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE GOVERNMENT FROM IMPROPERLY OBJECTING DURING CROSS-EXAMINATION
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO APPEAR AT TRIAL
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS FOR DAVID RAMIREZ & BRYAN WILLINGHAM
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Response to States Motion to Admit Prior Witness Testimony
Filing Date
10/12/2024
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE RE: HEARSAY TESTIMONY ABOUT CM AND IS BY ALLEGED VICTIM A
Filing Date
10/11/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION IN LIMINE RE: OFFER FOR HOME
Filing Date
10/11/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR MISTRIAL & TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
10/11/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT RE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR MISTRIAL AND TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE (HONORABLE M. BRAIN)
Filing Date
10/11/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO ADMIT PRIOR WITNESS TESTIMONY
Filing Date
10/11/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2024
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2024
Description
NJC - Notice of change of Judge for cause - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice of Change of Judge Pursuant to Rule 10.1, Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
10/10/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice of Filing Exhibit A in Support of Defendants Motion In Limine RE: Offer of Home
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice of Filing Exhibit B in Support of Defendants Motion In Limine RE: Offer of Home
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice of Filing Exhibit C in Support of Defendants Motion In Limine RE: Offer of Home
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice of Filing Exhibit D in Support of Defendants Motion In Limine RE: Offer of Home
Filing Date
10/8/2024
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion In Limine RE: Offer For Home
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
MTQ - Motion To Quash - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
BRYAN WILLINGHAM AND WITNESS DAVID RAMIREZ’S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS
Filing Date
10/2/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (FOR WITNESS TERESA MIRANDA)
Filing Date
9/28/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
State's Reply to Defendant's Response to State's Motion to Strike and Motions in Limine for Retrial
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE FOR RETRIAL
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF WITNESS PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq, ARIZ.R.CRIM.
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e),(g) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
9/19/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
9/18/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE FOR RE-TRIAL
Filing Date
9/13/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
9/11/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAREANCE FOR WITNESS LETICIA GARCIA
Filing Date
9/9/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT RE: DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE RE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL TO STATE’S WITNESS DAVID RAMIREZ
Filing Date
9/5/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE RE: MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL TO STATE’S WITNESS DAVID RAMIREZ
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
State's Response to Defendant's Motion to Appoint Counsel to State's Witness David Ramirez
Filing Date
9/1/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e),(g) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
8/29/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT-OF-STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
8/29/2024
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES PETITION TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
8/28/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice of Witness for Trial Pursuant to Rule 15.2 et seq., Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
8/28/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
8/26/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
8/24/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Appoint Counsel for States Witness David Ramirez
Filing Date
8/23/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
8/23/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Specific Discovery Request Pursuant Rule 15.1(b)(c),(e), Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
8/23/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e),(g) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
8/19/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Specific Discovery Request Pursuant to Rule 15.1(b)(c),(e), Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
8/19/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/18/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
8/16/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Specific Discovery Request Pursuant to Rule 15.1(b)(c),(e), Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
8/15/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF WITNESS PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq, ARIZ.R.CRIM.
Filing Date
8/8/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
8/8/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
8/8/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
8/8/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
8/7/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE DEFENDANTS EXPEDITED REQUEST TO REMOVE ANKLE MONITOR FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING MRI OF INJURY
Filing Date
8/5/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY FOR FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, SEPTEMBER 24, 2024
Filing Date
8/4/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Specific Discovery Request Pursuant to Rule 15.1(b)(c),(e), Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
8/4/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e),(g) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
8/2/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/1/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S EXPEDITED REQUEST TO REMOVE ANKLE MONITOR FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING (MRI) OF INJURY
Filing Date
7/11/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e),(g) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
6/12/2024
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2024
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2024
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2024
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Request for State to File Power Points in Closing and Rebuttal Closing
Filing Date
5/29/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALED JURY QUESTIONNAIRES
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO REMOVE EXHIBIT 160 FROM THE RECORD
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING EMAIL TO AUGMENT THE RECORD RE: OBJECTION TO VOLUNTARY INTOXICATION JURY INSTRUCTION
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING EMAILS RE DETECTIVE ANDREA GRIFFITHS/STOCEK UNDOCUMENTED INTERVIEW OF RAMON
Filing Date
5/17/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF FILING EMAIL FROM STATE RE: GOVERNMENT INTERFERENCE
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF OFFER OF PROOF OF DEFENDANTS DENIAL OF RIGHT TO MAKE A SIMULTANEOUS RECORD DURING TESTIMONY AT TRIAL AND THREATS AND INTIMIDATION BY THE STATE
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF OFFER OF PROOF OF PROPER IMPEACHMENT WITH INCONSISTENT STATEMENTS
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S OFFER OF PROOF
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF OFFER OF PROOF RE: DETECTIVE ROJEL’S RECROSS-EXAMINATION
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
073 - ME: Motion Withdrawn - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2024
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO ALLOW A LIMITED PRESENTATION OF DEFENDANT’S INVOCATION AS A FAIR RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S CLAIM OF CONFIRMATION BIAS AND INADEQUACY OF INVESTIGATION
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S AMENDED MOTION TO SEAL PARTS OF THE DOCKET CONTAINING VICTIMS’ IDENTIFYING INFORMATION
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE RE: DETECTIVE ROJEL’S REDIRECT
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S OFFER OF PROOF
Filing Date
5/5/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATE’S WITNESS ARTURO MIRANDA FOR LACK OF NOTICE
Filing Date
5/3/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2024
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw Defendants Notice of Offer of Proof RE: Brice Phebus
Filing Date
5/2/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S OFFER OF PROOF RE: STATE’S WITNESS BRICE PHEBUS
Filing Date
5/2/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED Defendants Offer of Proof RE: States Witness Brice Phebus
Filing Date
5/2/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice of Offer of Proof Re: States Witness Steven Jeansonne
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2024
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2024
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Court Interpreter
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CERTIFIED LIMITED PRACTICE LAW STUDENT, RULE 39(C)(4)(c)(i), ARIZ.R.SUP.CT.
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPOINTING A SPANISH SPEAKING INTERPRETER TO THIS CAUSE NUMBER FOR ASSISTANCE WITH PRE-TRIAL HEARINGS AND TESTIMONY OF IRMA MIRANDA
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY RE: PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION
Filing Date
4/24/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO ALLOW DEFENSE EXPERT TO OBSERVE STATE EXPERT’S TRIAL TESTIMONY
Filing Date
4/24/2024
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER STATE’S CASE AGENT TO REMOVE HIS WEAPON DURING TRIAL
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ALLOW DEFENSE EXPERT TO OBSERVE STATE EXPERT’S TRIAL TESITMONY
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Exhibit A to Motion to Allow Defense Expert to Observe Testimony
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CERTIFIED LIMITED PRACTICE LAW STUDENT, RULE 39(c)(4)(C)(i), ARIZ.R.SUP.CT.
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO HAVE ACCESS TO COUNTY WIFI
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Exhibit B to Motion to Allow Defense Expert Observe Testimony
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Emails
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO SEAL PARTS OF THE DOCKET CONTAINING VICTIMS’ IDENTIFYING INFORMATION
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT-OF-STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
4/11/2024
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
4/6/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
4/6/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
4/1/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/1/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
3/26/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF EXHIBITS PROVIDED TO THE COURT
Filing Date
3/22/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF FILING EVIDENCE
Filing Date
3/22/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING EVIDENCE
Filing Date
3/21/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
3/21/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
3/19/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
3/14/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTING & CORRECTING THE RECORD
Filing Date
3/10/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ADMIT MOTIVE/BIAS EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO ARS 13-1421 A 3
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE RE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO ADMIT MOTIVE/BIAS EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO A.R.S. s 13- 1421(A)(3)
Filing Date
3/7/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO ADMIT OTHER CRIMES, WRONGS OR ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE 404(B) & (C)
Filing Date
3/4/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO ADMIT MOTIVE/BIAS EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO A.R.S. 13-1421(A)(3)
Filing Date
3/4/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT CHARACTER EVIDENCE
Filing Date
3/4/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO ADMIT OTHER CRIMES, WRONGS OR ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE 404(B) & (C), ARIZ.R.CRIM.P. AND REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS PURSUANT TO RULE 1.9, ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
2/28/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR VICTIM B.S. AND ASSERTION OF VICTIM’S CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS
Filing Date
2/27/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Response to States Motion in Limine to Preclude Unrelated Lawsuit
Filing Date
2/23/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2024
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE UNRELATED CIVIL LAWSUIT
Filing Date
2/22/2024
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT CHARACTER EVIDENCE
Filing Date
2/22/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO ADMIT DEFENDANT’S OTHER CRIMES, WRONGS OR ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE 404(B) AND (C), ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE AND REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS PURSUANT TO RULE 1.9, ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
2/21/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ADMIT MOTIVE/BIAS EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO A.R.S. s 13-1421(A)(3)
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
2/8/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS 15.2 NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE (LAWSUIT) & REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT, RULE 1.9, ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
2/8/2024
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER FOR MARCH 22, 2024 EVIDENTIARY HEARING PURSUANT TO RULE 30(b)(1), SUP.CT.RULE
Filing Date
2/8/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
2/7/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE ON JANUARY 31, 2024, PURSUANT TO RULE 1.9 A ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
2/7/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATE'S WITNESS NONNIE HULAN PURSUANT TO RULE 1.9(a), ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
2/7/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
2/7/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED ORDER RE: MOTION TO ORDER PARTIES SUBMIT TO BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT’S FILINGS AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE DATED JANUARY 27 AND JANUARY 31, 2024
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
2/5/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY RE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO ORDER PARTIES SUBMIT TO BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO ORDER PARTIES SUBMIT TO BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Filing Date
2/1/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER PARTIES SUBMIT TO BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Filing Date
1/31/2024
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
1/31/2024
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE RE: “VICTIM” & “DEFENDANT” & “RAPIST”
Filing Date
1/31/2024
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE RE: TESTIMOY RELEVANT TO COUNT 4 (RUBEN SOMOZA)
Filing Date
1/31/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
1/27/2024
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE RE: HEARSAY TESTIMOY RELEVANT TO COUNTS 2 & 3
Filing Date
1/27/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATE’S WITNESS NONNIE HULON PURSUANT TO RULES 401, 402, 403, 404, ARIZ.R.EVID
Filing Date
1/27/2024
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE RE: TESTIMOY RELEVANT TO COUNT 4
Filing Date
1/27/2024
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion in Limine re: Testimony Relevant to Count 4
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice of Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 15.2 et seq, Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
1/23/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR OUT OF STATE SUBPOENA (CERTIFICATE) FOR DEFENSE WITNESS, MANUEL BARRIGA, TO APPEAR AND TESTIFY AT TRIAL FOR THE DEFENDANT
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw Defendants Motion to Withdraw
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF WITNESS PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq, ARIZ.R.CRIM.
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR OUT OF STATE SUBPOENA (CERTIFICATE) FOR DEFENSE WITNESS, PETA DAMSA, TO APPEAR AND TESTIFY AT TRIAL FOR THE DEFENDANT
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF WITNESS PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq, ARIZ.R.CRIM
Filing Date
1/3/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: STIPULATION BY THE PARTIES
Filing Date
12/8/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Rule 39 Law Clerk
Filing Date
12/8/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
12/4/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF WITNESS PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq, ARIZ.R.CRIM.
Filing Date
12/4/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF WITNESS PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq, ARIZ.R.CRIM.
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
019 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
11/29/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: MOTION FOR COURT TO ORDER PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT TO DISCLOSE ELECTRONIC & SCIENTIFIC EVIDENCE
Filing Date
11/28/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
11/28/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
11/28/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF EXPERT WITNESS PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2(c)(2), ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF EXPERT WITNESS PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2(c)(2), ARIZ.R.CRIM.
Filing Date
11/13/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice of Witness Pursuant to Rule 15.2 et seq, Ariz.R.Crim.
Filing Date
11/13/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
11/8/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
027 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF EXPERT WITNESS PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2(c)(2), ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF EXPERT WITNESS PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2(c)(2), ARIZ.R.CRIM.
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
State’s Amended Response to Defendant’s Motion for Court to Order Phoenix Police Department to Disclose Electronic & Scientific Evidence Pursuant to 15.1(g)
Filing Date
10/28/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR COURT TO ORDER PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT TO DISCLOSE ELECTRONIC & SCIENTIFIC EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO 15.1(g), ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
10/27/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COURT TO ORDER PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT TO DISCLOSE ELECTRONIC & SCIENTIFIC EVIDENC PURSUANT TO 15.1 (G) ARIZ.R. CRIM.P.
Filing Date
10/27/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
State’s Response to Defendant’s Motion for Court to Order Phoenix Police Department to Disclose Electronic & Scientific Evidence Pursuant to 15.1(g)
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
10/10/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO MAKE FINDINGS OF FACT & CONSLUSIONS OF LAW RE: MOTION TO APPOINT STATE’S WITNESS JACKIE MIRANDA COUNSEL
Filing Date
9/23/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
9/20/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
027 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
9/18/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Specific Discovery Request Pursuant to Rule 15.1(b)(c),(e), Ariz.Crim.P.
Filing Date
9/14/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
9/6/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
9/6/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
9/5/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
9/5/2023
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESS PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
8/31/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/29/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
022 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
8/28/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: HONOR HEALTH TO DIGITALLY DISCLOSE "PHOTO #6" TO MCAO & MCAO TO DISCLOSE DOWNLOAD LINK OF PHOTO TO DEFENSE EXPERT
Filing Date
8/28/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Specific Discovery Request Pursuant to Rule 15.1(b)(c)(e), Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
8/28/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION REGARDING COURT ORDER RE: HONOR HEALTH TO DIGITALLY DISCLOSE “PHOTO #6”
Filing Date
8/23/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
8/17/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION FOR COURT ORDER TO ALLOW RELEASE OF “PHOTO #6” TO THE DEFENSE FOR EXPERT REVIEW
Filing Date
8/11/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF EXPERT WITNESS PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2(c)(2), ARIZ.R.CRIM.
Filing Date
8/11/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION FOR COURT ORDER TO ALLOW RELEASE OF “PHOTO #6” TO THE DEFENSE FOR EXPERT REVIEW
Filing Date
8/11/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
8/11/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
8/9/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNSEALING SW2022-09887
Filing Date
8/3/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
598 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
7/28/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSE COUNSEL ADVISING DEFENDANT OF NEW DATES
Filing Date
7/26/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
7/19/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
7/19/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO UNSEAL SEARCH WARRANT SW2022-098879 AND SEARCH WARRANT RETURN
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
7/13/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
7/13/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
7/13/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION TO CONTINUE FIRM TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
7/13/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/7/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
7/6/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT RE: DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S REPLY RE: MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL TO STATE’S WITNESS JACKIE MIRANDA
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S REPLY RE: MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL TO STATE’S WITNESS JACKIE MIRANDA
Filing Date
6/24/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Specific Discovery Request Pursuant to Rule 15.1(b)(c)(e), Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
6/24/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Appoint Counsel for States Witness Jackie Miranda
Filing Date
6/23/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL TO STATE’S WITNESS
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE TO THE STATA
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/1/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY RE: COUNT 4 PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
5/30/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING RE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9 ARIZ.R.CRIM.P
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
5/8/2023
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO EXTEND RULE 12.9 DEADLINE
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES, TRANSCRIPTS, OR EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(E)
Filing Date
4/26/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION TO RESET COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
4/7/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2023
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulated Motion for Nunc Pro Tunc
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION FOR NUNC PRO TUNC
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST RE: COUNT 1 PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
3/22/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
3/21/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/15/2023
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
3/15/2023
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 et seq., ARIZ.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/6/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Specific Discovery Request, Rule 15.1(b)(c),(e), Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b),(c),(e),(g) Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
1/24/2023
Description
NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice of Change of Judge, 10.2, Ariz.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
1/23/2023
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2023
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
$10,000 Secured Appearance Bond
Filing Date
1/3/2023
Description
173 - ME: Arraignment Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/28/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
12/21/2022
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/29/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/12/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/10/2023
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
3/6/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
3/15/2023
Time
8:29
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
4/18/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
5/16/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/16/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/18/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/22/2023
Time
8:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/25/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/1/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/8/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/18/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/27/2023
Time
8:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/7/2023
Time
9:10
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/31/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/31/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/7/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/18/2023
Time
9:20
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/26/2023
Time
9:10
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/8/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/25/2024
Time
9:40
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/1/2024
Time
8:50
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/8/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/29/2024
Time
9:50
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/22/2024
Time
9:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/3/2024
Time
9:50
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/8/2024
Time
8:50
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/15/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/19/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/22/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/23/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/24/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/25/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/29/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/30/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/1/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/2/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/6/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/7/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/8/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/9/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/13/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/14/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/15/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/16/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/20/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/21/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/22/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/23/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/28/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/6/2024
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/24/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/1/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/7/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/8/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/14/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/15/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/16/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/17/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/18/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/21/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/22/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/23/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/28/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/29/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/30/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/1/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/4/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/5/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/6/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/7/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/8/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/12/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/13/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/14/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/22/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/13/2025
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/17/2025
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
2/11/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/18/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/28/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
3/19/2025
Time
8:50
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/26/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/18/2025
Time
13:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
6/2/2025
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/9/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial