« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, T P C Appeals
Judge
Case #
Party Name
MARK ANTHONY CURTIS - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Per, Pro
Judge
Brain
Case #
CR2022-002468-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
MARK ANTHONY CURTIS
Crime Date
11/4/2021
Date
7/17/2023
Description
TRAFFICK STOLEN PROP 2ND DEG
ARSCode
13-2307A (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
MARK ANTHONY CURTIS
Crime Date
11/18/2021
Date
7/17/2023
Description
THEFT CREDIT CARD-CONTROL
ARSCode
13-2102A1 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
MARK ANTHONY CURTIS
Crime Date
2/9/2022
Date
7/17/2023
Description
TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER
ARSCode
13-2008A (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
MARK ANTHONY CURTIS
Crime Date
2/9/2022
Date
7/17/2023
Description
AGG TAKING ID-GT 3 UNLAW
ARSCode
13-2009A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF NO COLORABLE CLAIMS; REQUEST FOR 45 DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO ALLOW DEFENDANT TO FILE A PRO PER PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF INTENT NOT TO FILE A NARRATIVE STATEMENT
Filing Date
1/5/2024
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF INTENT NOT TO FILE A NARRATIVE STATEMENT
Filing Date
12/22/2023
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
905 - ME: Correspondence Received By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRANSCRIPT: PLEA AGREEMENT/CHANGE OF PLEA
Filing Date
11/14/2023
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S NARRATIVE STATEMENT OF THE SENTENCING PROCEEDING ON AUGUST 21, 2023.
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
905 - ME: Correspondence Received By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/10/2023
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
9/29/2023
Description
595 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2023
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
9/8/2023
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2023
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
letter
Filing Date
8/24/2023
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
8/21/2023
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
8/21/2023
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
8/21/2023
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
8/21/2023
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
8/21/2023
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
8/18/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECOMMENDATION AS TO SENTENCE
Filing Date
7/26/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/06/2023
Filing Date
7/20/2023
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2023
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Sever
Filing Date
7/7/2023
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2023
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/1/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S
MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
6/29/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/26/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
6/16/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2023
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2023
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE FROM THE STATE ARCP RULE 15.1
Filing Date
3/7/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBIT
Filing Date
3/3/2023
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPERIOR COURT OF ARIZONA MARICOPA COUNTY TRIAL/HEARING
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR STATE TO PROVIDE DEFENDANT WITH ANY IMPEACHMENT OR EXCULPATORY EVIDENCE THAT IS FAVORABLE TO DEFENDANT
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE FROM THE STATE
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
STATEMENT
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/7/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
State Response to Motion to Suppress
Filing Date
2/5/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S
MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS
OWN RECOGNIZANCE OR TO REDUCE
BOND OR TO RELEASE DEFENDANT TO
THIRD PARTY CUSTODY
Filing Date
2/1/2023
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES MOTION TO SUPPRESS REQUEST SUPPRESSION HEARING
Filing Date
2/1/2023
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS O.R. OR BOND REDUCTION
Filing Date
1/27/2023
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; MOTION TO SUPPRESS; REQUEST SUPPRESSION HEARING
Filing Date
1/27/2023
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
1/17/2023
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE
OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE
SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S.
§ 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES
COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM
CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S.
§ 13-708(C)
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF
HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF
HISTORICAL PRIOR CONVICTIONS
UPON CONVICTION IN A
CURRENTLY PENDING CASE
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST
FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST
FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXERCISE CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHT TO WAIVE COUNSEL AND PROCEED PRO POER AND TO RETAIN PRESENT COUNSEL AS ADVISORY COUNSEL
Filing Date
12/28/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
STATEMENT
Filing Date
12/27/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2022
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
12/13/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Filing Date
12/1/2022
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2022
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw (OPDS Appointed on Other Matter)
Filing Date
11/23/2022
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
11/22/2022
Filing Date
11/22/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
11/22/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
11/21/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2022
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2022
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/22/2022
Time
20:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
11/29/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/19/2022
Time
10:40
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/17/2023
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
2/9/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
2/21/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
3/3/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/15/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/21/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/22/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/28/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/19/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/26/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/17/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/14/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/5/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/10/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/17/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/17/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/1/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/2/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/7/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/8/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/9/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/10/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/21/2023
Time
9:10
Event
Acceptance Of Plea/Snt