« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Cinto, Michael
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
BLIEDEN, LAWRENCE
Judge
Culbertson
Case #
CR2022-002420-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
2/9/2022
Date
6/21/2023
Description
POSS WPN BY PROHIB PERSON
ARSCode
13-3102A4 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND QUASH WARRANT OR SUMMONS
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JURY QUESTIONNAIRE
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRELIMINARY - SECOND DRAFT
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION IN LIMINE RE: EVIDENCE EXCLUDABLE PURSUANT TO RULES 403 AND 404(B)
Filing Date
6/19/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2023
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
6/16/2023
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2023
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE INTRODUCTION BY DEFENDANT OF HIS OWN STATEMENTS DURING TRIAL
Filing Date
6/14/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUESTED VOIR DIRE
Filing Date
6/13/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/13/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/2/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2023
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO RECONSIDER STATE’S ORAL MOTION TO CONTINUE (Expedited Hearing Requested)
Filing Date
5/8/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/28/2023
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Appoint Counsel to Witness Christina Burns
Filing Date
4/24/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/24/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
4/24/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
4/21/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/14/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES RESPONSE OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPRESS
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Comprehensive Pretrial Conference Statement
Filing Date
1/18/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2023
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2023
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO RULE 803(10)
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/28/2022
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
12/28/2022
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIOR CONVICTIONS UPON CONVICTION IN A CURRENTLY PENDING CASE
Filing Date
12/28/2022
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/28/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
12/28/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
12/28/2022
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
12/28/2022
Description
AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-708(C)
Filing Date
12/28/2022
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
12/28/2022
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
12/27/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2022
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2022
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2022
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
11/16/2022
Filing Date
11/16/2022
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
11/16/2022
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
11/15/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2022
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2022
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/16/2022
Time
20:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
11/23/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/19/2022
Time
10:40
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/10/2023
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
2/9/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
2/21/2023
Time
8:31
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/3/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/15/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/22/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/19/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/26/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/26/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/17/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/14/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/19/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/22/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/26/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/27/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial