« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Kay, Treena
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Lori N Daybell - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Per, Pro
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2022-001242-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Lori N Daybell
Crime Date
10/2/2019
Date
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2025
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST TO PRECLUDE THE
MEDIA FROM SHOWING THE FACE OF
TESTIFYING WITNESS
Filing Date
5/3/2025
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST TO FILE MOTION IN
LIMINE TO PRECLUDE INADMISSIBLE
EVIDENCE RELATING TO TAMMY
LACHCIK UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
4/27/2025
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S AMENDED REQUEST FOR
RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
4/18/2025
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2025
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE
DEFENDANT'S OTHER
ACTS TO ESTABLISH CONSPIRACY,
PREMEDITATION AND/OR TO ESTABLISH
MOTIVE PURSUANT TO RULE
404(b), ARIZONA RULES OF
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/10/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Disclose Exculpatory Evidence and Prosecutorial Misconduct
Filing Date
4/4/2025
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
3/26/2025
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NATE EATON'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/26/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION
TO DISMISS FOR VIOLATION OF
CONFIDENTIAL COMMUNICATION AND
THE SIXTH AMENDMENT
Filing Date
3/21/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
3/20/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2025
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-PARTY MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF OFFICE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DEFENDANT TO HAVE REMOVED RESTRAINTS IN TRIAL
Filing Date
3/19/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF JERRY SHERIDAN’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO APPEAR IN CIVILIAN CLOTHES
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCLUDE STATE WITNESSES
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DEFENDANT TO HAVE REMOVED RESTRAINTS IN TRIAL
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DEFENDANT TO WEAR CIVILIAN CLOTHING AT TRIAL
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISCLOSE ALL 404(B) EVIDENCE
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Motion to Dismiss for Violation of Confidential Communication and the Sixth Amendment
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2025
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2025
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Defendants Supplemental Rule 15.2 Notice of Defenses and Disclosure
Filing Date
2/27/2025
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2025
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Reply to States Response to Motion to Dismiss CR2021-001704-001 and CR2022-001242-001 for Violation of Speedy Trial Act
Filing Date
2/10/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION
TO DISMISS FOR VIOLATION OF SPEEDY
TRIAL ACT
Filing Date
2/4/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Motion to Dismiss CR2021-001704-001 and CR2022-001242-001 for Violation of Speedy Trial Act
Filing Date
2/3/2025
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE
TO MOTION FOR SPECIFIC
DISCOVERY
(DR 19-1804 RECORDED INTERVIEW)
Filing Date
2/3/2025
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR
SPECIFIC DISCOVERY (DR 19-1804
RECORDED INTERVIEW)
Filing Date
1/31/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Defendants Objections to Court T.V.s Media Request for Trial
Filing Date
1/29/2025
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF’S
RESPONSE TO MOTION ORDERING
MCSO TO UPDATE SYSTEM
Filing Date
1/28/2025
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUESTED LIMITATIONS RE:
COURT TV MEDIA REQUEST
Filing Date
1/28/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY (COMMUNICATIONS)
Filing Date
1/27/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Motion Ordering M.C.S.O. to Update S.H.I.E.L.D. System to Reflect Judges January 10, 2025, Name Change Order
Filing Date
1/17/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SPECIFIC
DISCOVERY (Communications)
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO DIMISS CR-2022-001242-001 FOR LACK OF SPEEDY TRIAL
Filing Date
1/14/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2025
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY
Filing Date
1/10/2025
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2025
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY
Filing Date
1/8/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO
ORDER STATE OF ARIZONA TO PRODUCE
DISCOVERY OF EXTRADITION
Filing Date
12/19/2024
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF
TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO ORDER STATE OF ARIZONA
TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY OF
EXTRADITION
Filing Date
12/19/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ORDER MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF [SIC] OFFICE DEFENDANT'S RECORDS
Filing Date
12/16/2024
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/18/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER STATE OF ARIZONA TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY OF EXTRADITION
Filing Date
12/16/2024
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/18/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF OFFICE DEFENDANTS RECORDS
Filing Date
12/12/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2024
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND WAIVER
Filing Date
12/6/2024
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Filing Date
12/6/2024
Description
123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORTS:CAMILLE HERNANDEZ 10/29/2024
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORTS:CAMILLE HERNANDEZ 11/08/2024
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORTS:MICHAEL MCGADY 11/07/2024
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORTS: RICK WEBSTER 12/02/2024
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2024
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2024
Description
122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2024
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW PRIOR COUNSEL'S MOTION FOR RULE 11 EVALUATION
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2024
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO
COMPEL DISCOVERY
Filing Date
11/13/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE DEFENDANT’S APPEARANCE
Filing Date
11/13/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2024
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW RULE 11 EVALUATION REQUEST
Filing Date
10/29/2024
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW RULE 11 EVALUATION REQUEST
Filing Date
10/25/2024
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 11 APPOINTMENT
Filing Date
10/24/2024
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2024
Description
120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF RUSSELL SKINNER'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ORDER MCSO TO ALLOW ACCESS TO A LAPTOP FOR DISCOVERY REVIEW
Filing Date
10/22/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO MCSO RUSSELL SKINNER'S OBJECTION TO MOTION TO ORDER MCSO TO ALLOW ACCESS TO A LAPTOP FOR DISCOVERY REVIEW
Filing Date
10/22/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR A FULL RULE 11 EVALUATION
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE COUNSEL
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE COUNSEL
Filing Date
10/21/2024
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw
Filing Date
10/17/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2024
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO
RESPOND TO DEFENSE MOTION TO
COMPEL DISCOVERY
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2024
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (TURNDOWN MATERIAL)
Filing Date
10/9/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DEFENSE MOTION FOR RULE 11 EVALUATION
Filing Date
10/7/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL
THE REPLY TO MCSO RUSSELL
SKINNER’S OBJECTION TO
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO ORDER
MCSO TO ALLOW ACCESS TO A
LAPTOP FOR DISCOVERY REVIEW
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Document under Seal
Filing Date
9/30/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION FOR DEFENSE TO COMPLY WITH RULE 15.4(e)
Filing Date
9/27/2024
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2024
Description
AVL - Avowal - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Avowal
Filing Date
9/24/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER MCSO TO ALLOW ACCESS TO A LAPTOP FOR DISCOVERY REVIEW
Filing Date
9/19/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION FOR DEFENSE TO
COMPLY WITH RULE 15.4{e)
Filing Date
9/17/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ORDER MCSO TO ALLOW ACCESS TO A LAPTOP FOR DISCOVERY REVIEW
Filing Date
9/10/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO CAMERA COVERAGE AND PHOTOGRAPHY FOR SEPTEMBER 6, 2024 COURT HEARING
Filing Date
9/5/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO CAMERA COVERAGE AND PHOTOGRAPHY FOR SEPTEMBER 6, 2024, COURT HEARING
Filing Date
9/5/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2024
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
8/29/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2024
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Court Reporter
Filing Date
8/19/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE FOR SEPTEMBER 6, 2024, HEARING
Filing Date
8/15/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROVIDE NOTICE AND TIME TO OBJECT IF A REQUEST FOR COURT CAMERA FOOTAGE (“FTR”) IS MADE BEFORE DISCLOSING IT TO BE BROADCAST
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISCLOSE “NO BILL”
GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPTS
Filing Date
8/14/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE ALL MEDIA REQUESTS INTO THE RECORD
Filing Date
7/15/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION
Filing Date
7/9/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO MCSO OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO APPEAR IN CIVILIAN CLOTHES AT ALL FUTURE HEARINGS WHERE THE MEDIA WILL BROADCAST FOOTAGE
Filing Date
7/8/2024
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF ‘S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO APPEAR IN CIVILIAN CLOTHES AT ALL FUTURE HEARINGS WHERE THE MEDIA WILL BROADCAST FOOTAGE
Filing Date
7/3/2024
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2024
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2024
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO CAMERA COVERAGE AND PHOTOGRAPHY FOR JULY 2, 2024, COURT HEARING
Filing Date
7/2/2024
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Information
Filing Date
7/2/2024
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
6/27/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE
MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT
TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
6/27/2024
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ALLOW THE DEFENDANT TO APPEAR IN CIVILIAN CLOTHES AT ALL FUTURE HEARINGS WHERE THE MEDIA WILL BROADCAST FOOTAGE
Filing Date
6/26/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DEFENDANT’S OBJECTION TO CAMERA COVERAGE AND PHOTOGRAPHY FOR JULY 2, 2024, COURT HEARING
Filing Date
6/26/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/21/2024
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
6/18/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER MEDIA TO COMPLY WITH ARIZONA SUPREME COURT RULE 122 BEFORE BROADCASTING COURT FOOTAGE VIDEO
Filing Date
6/13/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER MEDIA TO COMPLY WITH ARIZONA SUPREME COURT RULE 122 BEFORE BROADCASTING COURT FOOTAGE VIDEO
Filing Date
6/13/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER MEDIA TO COMPLY WITH ARIZONA SUPREME COURT RULE 122 BEFORE BROADCASTING COURT FOOTAGE VIDEO
Filing Date
6/13/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ORDER MEDIA TO COMPLY WITH ARIZONA SUPREME COURT RULE 122 BEFORE BROADCASTING COURT FOOTAGE VIDEO
Filing Date
6/13/2024
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2024
Description
AVL - Avowal - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AVOWAL
Filing Date
6/6/2024
Description
MCM - Motion to Correct Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER TO CORRECT MINUTE ENTRY REGARDING DEFENSE MOTION AT JUNE 5, 2024 COURT HEARING
Filing Date
6/6/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
6/2/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Management Report
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
AVL - Avowal - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Avowal
Filing Date
4/25/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2024
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
4/10/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SECOND MOTION FOR
PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
4/8/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/22/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2024
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
2/12/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/24/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2024
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to File Notice to Defendant Under Seal
Filing Date
1/17/2024
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: STATE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: STATE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
STATEMENT
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE
OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE
SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. §
13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2
NOTICE OF DEFENSES
AND DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF
HISTORICAL PRIOR CONVICTIONS
UPON CONVICTION IN A
CURRENTLY PENDING CASE
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF
TIME TO CHALLENGE THE
GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
1/4/2024
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE
DESIGNATION IN CR2021-001704-001 AND
CR2022-001242-001
Filing Date
12/20/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE DEFENSE COUNSEL RESTRICT DISSEMINATION OF THE PROTECTED INFORMATION CONTAINED WITHIN BRANDON BOUDREAUX'S CELL PHONE DOWNLOAD (PROPERTY ID 662811)
Filing Date
12/15/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER
Filing Date
12/8/2023
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: STATE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
12/7/2023
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
12/3/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2023
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL FORM IV
Filing Date
11/30/2023
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
11/30/2023
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNREDACTED FORM IV
Filing Date
11/30/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
11/30/2023
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REDACTED FORM IV
Filing Date
8/2/2023
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FILED FOR EXTRADITION PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
5/17/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2023
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO UNSEAL AND DISCLOSE THE GRAND JURY INDICTMENT
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE STATE'S MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO DISCLOSE INDICTMENTS UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2022
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2023
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/30/2023
Time
2:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
12/7/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/18/2024
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
2/21/2024
Time
8:20
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/21/2024
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
3/28/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/4/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/24/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/5/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/1/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/2/2024
Time
8:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/2/2024
Time
8:20
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/25/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/1/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/6/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/24/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/6/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/14/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
11/20/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/5/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
12/6/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/10/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/10/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/24/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/11/2025
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/18/2025
Time
8:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/31/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/1/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/2/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/3/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/7/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/8/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/9/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/10/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/14/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/15/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/16/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/17/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/21/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/14/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/29/2025
Time
13:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/30/2025
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/2/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/3/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/4/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/5/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/6/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/9/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/10/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/11/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/12/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/13/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/23/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/24/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/25/2025
Time
10:30
Event
Trial