« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Minicozzi, Michael
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Otoniel N Navarrete - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Feldman, Adam
Judge
Culbertson
Case #
CR2021-129268-001
Party Name
B Witness - (3)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
F
Attorney
Black, David
Judge
Case #
CR2021-129268-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Otoniel N Navarrete 
Crime Date
5/1/2018
Date
8/16/2021
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Otoniel N Navarrete 
Crime Date
7/1/2018
Date
8/16/2021
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Otoniel N Navarrete 
Crime Date
7/1/2019
Date
8/16/2021
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Otoniel N Navarrete 
Crime Date
7/1/2018
Date
8/16/2021
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Otoniel N Navarrete 
Crime Date
7/1/2017
Date
8/16/2021
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Otoniel N Navarrete 
Crime Date
7/1/2018
Date
8/16/2021
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Otoniel N Navarrete 
Crime Date
7/1/2019
Date
8/16/2021
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Otoniel N Navarrete 
Crime Date
7/1/2018
Date
2/22/2024
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Otoniel N Navarrete 
Crime Date
7/1/2018
Date
2/22/2024
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Otoniel N Navarrete 
Crime Date
7/1/2018
Date
2/22/2024
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Otoniel N Navarrete 
Crime Date
7/1/2018
Date
2/22/2024
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Otoniel N Navarrete 
Crime Date
7/1/2018
Date
10/23/2023
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Otoniel N Navarrete 
Crime Date
5/1/2018
Date
2/22/2024
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Otoniel N Navarrete 
Crime Date
7/1/2017
Date
2/22/2024
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
MEB - Motion to Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2024
Description
079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
179 - ME: Initial Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2024
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CRIMINAL SUBPOENA
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/31/2024
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/31/2024
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/31/2024
Filing Date
2/6/2024
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/29/2024
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/13/2023
Description
065 - ME: Order Exonerating Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
12/11/2023
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2023
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2023
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
11/22/2023
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
11/3/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL/HEARING
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALED JURY QUESTIONNAIRES
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Release of Deposit
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO ORDER DEPOSTION OF MATERIAL WITNESS, YOLANDA VARGAS
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
at this deposition, MS Vargas is required to answer questions relevant to this matter.
Filing Date
10/19/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO AMEND COUNT 4 OF THE INDICTMENT
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10/04/2023
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2023
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S PETITION FOR ORDER GRANTING IMMUITY TO WITNESS
Filing Date
10/12/2023
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUIRED TO GIVE TESTIMONY OR PRODUCE EVIDENCE
Filing Date
10/12/2023
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Preclude
Filing Date
10/11/2023
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S OBJECTION TO CAMERA REQUEST
Filing Date
10/11/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
10/9/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: EMERGENCY MOTION FOR DEPOSITION
Filing Date
10/6/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2023
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/5/2023
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
10/5/2023
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY MOTION FOR DEPOSITION
Filing Date
10/3/2023
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING: JOINT PROPOSAL FOR JURY QUESTIONNAIRE
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
9/15/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
9/14/2023
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2023
Description
AIN - Amended Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2023
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2023
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Filing Date
8/30/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO AMEND THE INDICTMENT
Filing Date
8/22/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: REQUEST TO HOLD ALL SUBPOENAS IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT
Filing Date
8/17/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST TO HOLD ALL SUBPOENAS IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT
Filing Date
8/10/2023
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING RE: MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
7/24/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
YOLANDA VARGAS, A MATERIAL WITNESS IN THIS MATTER, SHALL SUBMIT TO A DEPOSITION
Filing Date
7/18/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/11/2023
Filing Date
7/18/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07-11-2023
Filing Date
7/18/2023
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2023
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Witness shall submit disposition
Filing Date
5/15/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND MOTION FOR ORDER FOR MATERIAL WITNESS DEPOSITION/INTERVIEW
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
4/13/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER FOR MATERIAL WITNESS DEPOSITION/INTERVIEW
Filing Date
4/10/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR ORDER FOR MATERIAL WITNESS DEPOSITION/INTERVIEW
Filing Date
2/27/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02/14/2023
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
2/8/23
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
2/7/23
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
2/7/23
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
2/7/23
Filing Date
1/24/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
12/9/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DENYING RE: MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
9/28/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
5/13/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2022
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2021
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2021
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASH BAIL
Filing Date
10/8/2021
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1
Filing Date
9/24/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2
Filing Date
9/24/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2
Filing Date
9/23/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2021
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANC
Filing Date
9/21/2021
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
9/21/2021
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
9/14/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
9/2/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRANSCRIPT OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
9/2/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
9/2/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2021
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2021
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2021
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Secured Appearance Bond $ 50,000.00
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2021
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
8/13/2021
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/13/2021
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2021
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/13/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/12/2021
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
$50000
Filing Date
8/12/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2021
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2021
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
8/10/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
8/10/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO SEAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER
Filing Date
8/10/2021
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
8/10/2021
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
8/10/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER
Filing Date
8/10/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/6/2021
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
8/12/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/16/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
8/20/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/1/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
11/4/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
12/21/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/13/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/21/2022
Time
9:10
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/23/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/5/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/26/2022
Time
8:40
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/9/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/27/2022
Time
9:40
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/11/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/9/2023
Time
8:50
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/17/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/22/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/2/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/9/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/18/2023
Time
8:45
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/1/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/8/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/8/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
9/12/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/12/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/19/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/3/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/5/2023
Time
2:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
10/9/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/9/2023
Time
12:00
Event
Miscellaneous - (Appearance)
Date
10/12/2023
Time
10:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/12/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/16/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/17/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/18/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/19/2023
Time
13:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/23/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/24/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/25/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/26/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/30/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/1/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/2/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/20/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/5/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/7/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/12/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/13/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/14/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/15/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/20/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/21/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/26/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/27/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/28/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/29/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/4/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/5/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Trial