Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Beecher, Marcus | ||
Justin Matthew Walters - (2) |
Defendant | M | O'Sullivan, Colin | Master Calendar | CR2021-117036-001 |
B Victim - (3) |
Victim | N/A | Rasmussen, Chase |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 6/1/2019 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 6/4/2021 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 6/1/2019 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 6/4/2021 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 10/31/2019 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 6/4/2021 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 1/18/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 6/4/2021 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 6/1/2019 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 6/4/2021 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 10/31/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 6/4/2021 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 6/1/2019 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 6/4/2021 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 6/15/2019 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 6/4/2021 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 6/1/2019 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 6/4/2021 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 6/1/2019 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 6/4/2021 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 6/1/2019 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 4/19/2022 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 6/1/2019 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 4/19/2022 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 6/1/2019 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 4/19/2022 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 6/1/2019 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 4/19/2022 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 6/1/2019 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 4/19/2022 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 6/1/2019 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 4/19/2022 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 6/15/2019 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 4/19/2022 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F3) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 10/31/2019 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 4/19/2022 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F3) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 1/18/2020 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 4/19/2022 |
Justin Matthew Walters | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 10/31/2020 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 4/19/2022 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
6/16/2022 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 6/30/2022 | |
5/31/2022 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 6/7/2022 | |
NOTE: SEX OFFENDER REGISTRATION ADDENDUM | |||
5/31/2022 | SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation - Party (001) | 5/31/2022 | |
NOTE: SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation | |||
5/27/2022 | NLB - Notice to Licensing Board - Party (001) | 5/31/2022 | |
NOTE: Licensing Board Notification (Restricted) | |||
5/27/2022 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 5/27/2022 | |
NOTE: | |||
5/27/2022 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 5/27/2022 | |
NOTE: Order of Confinement | |||
5/27/2022 | TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001) | 5/27/2022 | |
NOTE: Terms and Conditions of Probation | |||
5/27/2022 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 5/27/2022 | |
NOTE: Presentence Report | |||
5/27/2022 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 5/27/2022 | |
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered | |||
5/25/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 5/25/2022 | |
5/25/2022 | SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001) | 5/27/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM | |||
5/18/2022 | SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001) | 5/19/2022 | |
NOTE: SENTENCING MEMORANDUM | |||
4/26/2022 | NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001) | 4/28/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Release of Deposit JAMES WALTERS $100,000.00 | |||
4/20/2022 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 4/20/2022 | |
4/19/2022 | ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001) | 4/22/2022 | |
4/19/2022 | RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001) | 4/19/2022 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
4/19/2022 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 4/19/2022 | |
NOTE: PLEA AGREEMENT | |||
4/8/2022 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 4/8/2022 | |
4/5/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 4/11/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 6, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. | |||
3/18/2022 | 331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001) | 3/18/2022 | |
1/26/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 1/26/2022 | |
1/24/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 1/26/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
1/24/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 1/25/2022 | |
NOTE: AMENDED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
10/28/2021 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001) | 10/28/2021 | |
10/27/2021 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 10/27/2021 | |
NOTE: Joint Complex Case Management Report | |||
10/12/2021 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 10/12/2021 | |
9/27/2021 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 9/29/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS | |||
9/15/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 9/17/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS TO ALLOW TEMPORARY OUT OF STATE TRAVEL | |||
8/25/2021 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001) | 8/25/2021 | |
8/23/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 8/25/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion for Complex Case Designation | |||
8/17/2021 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 8/18/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
8/9/2021 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/20/2021 | |
8/2/2021 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 8/12/2021 | |
8/2/2021 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/13/2021 | |
8/2/2021 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/13/2021 | |
7/26/2021 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 7/26/2021 | |
7/21/2021 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 7/27/2021 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
7/21/2021 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 7/27/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
7/21/2021 | AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001) | 7/27/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704 | |||
7/19/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001) | 7/19/2021 | |
7/19/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 7/19/2021 | |
7/16/2021 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 7/27/2021 | |
7/13/2021 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 7/20/2021 | |
7/13/2021 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 7/21/2021 | |
7/13/2021 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 7/22/2021 | |
7/7/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 7/8/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S RULE 15.1 REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
7/7/2021 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001) | 7/8/2021 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES | |||
7/7/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 7/8/2021 | |
NOTE: REQUEST TO PRESERVE AND PRODUCE POLICE RECORDINGS | |||
7/7/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 7/8/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REMAND | |||
7/7/2021 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 7/9/2021 | |
NOTE: INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS | |||
6/30/2021 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 6/30/2021 | |
6/29/2021 | ROR - Release Order - Party (001) | 6/29/2021 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
6/29/2021 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 6/29/2021 | |
6/24/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 6/24/2021 | |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR TRAVEL | |||
6/15/2021 | REC - Receipt - Party (001) | 6/21/2021 | |
NOTE: $100,000 CASH BAIL | |||
6/14/2021 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/4/2021 | WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001) | 6/14/2021 | |
NOTE: 05/27/21 | |||
6/4/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 6/7/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
6/4/2021 | NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001) | 6/9/2021 | |
NOTE: $100,000 | |||
6/3/2021 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 6/9/2021 | Plaintiff (1) |
6/3/2021 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 6/9/2021 | Plaintiff (1) |
6/3/2021 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 6/9/2021 | Plaintiff (1) |
6/3/2021 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 6/9/2021 | |
6/3/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 6/7/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL | |||
6/3/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 6/7/2021 | |
NOTE: ORDER RE: STATE'S MOTION TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL | |||
6/3/2021 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 6/7/2021 | |
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM | |||
6/1/2021 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 6/8/2021 | |
5/28/2021 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 5/28/2021 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
5/28/2021 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 5/28/2021 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
5/28/2021 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 5/28/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
5/10/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 5/10/2021 | |
5/6/2021 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 5/6/2021 | |
5/6/2021 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 5/6/2021 | |
5/6/2021 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001) | 5/6/2021 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
5/6/2021 | WFS - Warrant Fact Sheet - Party (001) | 5/6/2021 | |
5/6/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 5/6/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL | |||
5/6/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 5/6/2021 | |
NOTE: ORDER TO SEAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER | |||
5/6/2021 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 5/6/2021 | |
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER | |||
5/6/2021 | IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001) | 5/6/2021 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
5/28/2021 | 8:00 | Initial Appearance |
6/4/2021 | 10:30 | Status Conference |
6/7/2021 | 10:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
6/10/2021 | 9:00 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
6/29/2021 | 8:15 | Status Conference |
6/29/2021 | 8:15 | Oral Argument |
7/22/2021 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
8/24/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
10/21/2021 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/27/2021 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
11/4/2021 | 9:00 | Trial |
1/25/2022 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/3/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
2/9/2022 | 9:15 | Status Conference |
3/16/2022 | 13:30 | Settlement Conference |
4/6/2022 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
4/19/2022 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/3/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
5/27/2022 | 10:00 | Sentencing |