« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Weinberg, Hilary
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Raul Meza Portillo - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2021-112435-001
Party Name
B Witness - (3)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2021-112435-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Raul Meza Portillo
Crime Date
4/2/2021
Date
4/12/2021
Description
MANSLAUGHTER-RECKLESS
ARSCode
13-1103A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Raul Meza Portillo
Crime Date
4/2/2021
Date
4/12/2021
Description
FAIL TO STAY/WITH DEATH/INJURY
ARSCode
28-661B (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Raul Meza Portillo
Crime Date
4/2/2021
Date
5/13/2022
Description
MANSLAUGHTER-RECKLESS
ARSCode
13-1103A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Raul Meza Portillo
Crime Date
4/2/2021
Date
5/13/2022
Description
FAIL TO STAY/WITH DEATH/INJURY
ARSCode
28-661B (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2022
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2022
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2022
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2022
Description
SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation
Filing Date
6/29/2022
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
6/28/2022
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
5/16/2022
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2022
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
5/13/2022
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLEA AGREEMENT
Filing Date
4/11/2022
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
STATEMENT
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
1/28/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PARTIALLY REDACTED DOCUMENT
Filing Date
1/24/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW OF
AND REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
11/10/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL CONTINUANCE/FORM
Filing Date
11/1/2021
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/1/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVISED MOTION FOR RULE 15.1 DISCOVERY FROM THE STATE
Filing Date
10/21/2021
Description
MTT - Motion To Transfer - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO TRANSFER DEFENDANT TO COURT FOR HEARING
Filing Date
9/27/2021
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Notice of Appearance for Defendant (Party 02)
Filing Date
9/24/2021
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
9/21/2021
Description
MFH - Motion For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Set Discovery Hearing
Filing Date
8/12/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Brady Motion
Filing Date
8/11/2021
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Rule 15.1 (B) Discovery From the State
Filing Date
7/29/2021
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT
REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
6/17/2021
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2021
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPANISH SPEAKING
Filing Date
6/10/2021
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
6/10/2021
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY
CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-
703 or A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
6/10/2021
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
6/10/2021
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/10/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT INTERPRETER
Filing Date
6/7/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
6/4/2021
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION
Filing Date
5/3/2021
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2021
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2021
Description
173 - ME: Arraignment Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT
TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/8/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2021
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2021
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
4/6/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2021
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
4/6/2021
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/3/2021
Time
17:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
4/8/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/12/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/16/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/30/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/30/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
6/3/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
6/8/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
7/2/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
7/8/2021
Time
17:00
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
7/27/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/27/2021
Time
17:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/29/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/29/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/12/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/26/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/23/2021
Time
17:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/4/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/4/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/8/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/22/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/3/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/17/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/8/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
5/13/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
6/1/2022
Time
9:50
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/16/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/28/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Sentencing