Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Blackman, Martha | ||
Dylan Ray Johnson - (2) |
Defendant | M | To Be Determined | Master Calendar | CR2021-100079-001 |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Dylan Ray Johnson | 13-1201A (F6) | ENDANGERMENT | 1/1/2021 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 1/25/2021 |
Dylan Ray Johnson | 28-1383A5 (F4) | AGG DUI-WRONG WAY DRIVING | 1/1/2021 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 1/25/2021 |
Dylan Ray Johnson | 28-1383A5 (F4) | AGG DUI-WRONG WAY DRIVING | 1/1/2021 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 1/25/2021 |
Dylan Ray Johnson | 13-1204A1 (F2) | AGG ASLT-SERIOUS PHY INJURY | 1/1/2021 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 1/25/2021 |
Dylan Ray Johnson | 13-1204 (F2) | AGGRAVATED ASSAULT | 1/1/2021 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 5/20/2021 |
Dylan Ray Johnson | 28-1383 (F4) | AGGRAVATED DUI | 1/1/2021 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 5/20/2021 |
Dylan Ray Johnson | 28-1383A5 (F4) | AGG DUI-WRONG WAY DRIVING | 1/1/2021 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 5/20/2021 |
Dylan Ray Johnson | 13-1201A (F6) | ENDANGERMENT | 1/1/2021 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 5/20/2021 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
10/17/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 10/17/2022 | |
9/27/2022 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 9/30/2022 | |
NOTE: OF PAYMENTS MADE WITH RESPECT TO RESTITUTION ORDER | |||
1/12/2022 | 099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001) | 1/12/2022 | |
1/6/2022 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001) | 1/10/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record | |||
8/2/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 8/2/2021 | |
7/29/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 8/3/2021 | |
NOTE: TO MODIFY THE RESTITUTION PAYEE BUT NOT CHANGE THE TOTAL AMOUNT OF THE ORIGINAL RESTITUTION ORDER | |||
7/28/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 8/2/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO MODIFY THE RESTITUTION PAYEE BUT NOT CHANGE THE TOTAL AMOUNT OF THE ORIGINAL RESTITUTION ORDER | |||
7/26/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 7/29/2021 | |
7/19/2021 | SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001) | 7/19/2021 | |
NOTE: SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation | |||
7/16/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 7/16/2021 | |
7/16/2021 | SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001) | 7/16/2021 | |
NOTE: SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation | |||
7/16/2021 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 7/16/2021 | |
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered | |||
7/16/2021 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 7/16/2021 | |
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered | |||
7/15/2021 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 7/15/2021 | |
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered | |||
7/15/2021 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 7/15/2021 | |
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered | |||
7/15/2021 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 7/15/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
7/15/2021 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 7/15/2021 | |
NOTE: Order of Confinement | |||
7/15/2021 | PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001) | 7/15/2021 | |
NOTE: PSR Supporting Documents | |||
7/15/2021 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 7/15/2021 | |
NOTE: Presentence Report | |||
7/15/2021 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 7/22/2021 | |
NOTE: DOCUMENT RE MCSO TRANSCRIPT REPORT | |||
6/23/2021 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001) | 6/23/2021 | |
6/2/2021 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 6/2/2021 | |
6/2/2021 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 6/2/2021 | |
NOTE: Plea Agreement | |||
6/2/2021 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001) | 6/3/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing | |||
5/20/2021 | RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001) | 5/20/2021 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
4/28/2021 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 4/28/2021 | |
3/23/2021 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 3/23/2021 | |
3/22/2021 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 3/23/2021 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
3/19/2021 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 3/19/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
3/19/2021 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 3/19/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
3/9/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 3/9/2021 | |
3/8/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 3/12/2021 | |
NOTE: THAT THE HONOR HEALTH JCL NOTRTH MONTIAN RELEASE TO MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE OR REPRESENTATIVE | |||
3/1/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 3/2/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR RELEASE OF VICTIM’S MEDICAL RECORDS | |||
2/25/2021 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 2/26/2021 | |
2/11/2021 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 2/11/2021 | |
2/2/2021 | 173 - ME: Arraignment Reset - Party (001) | 2/2/2021 | |
1/22/2021 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 1/28/2021 | Plaintiff (1) |
1/22/2021 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 1/28/2021 | Plaintiff (1) |
1/22/2021 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 1/28/2021 | |
1/22/2021 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 1/28/2021 | Plaintiff (1) |
1/12/2021 | 004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001) | 1/12/2021 | |
1/12/2021 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001) | 1/13/2021 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES | |||
1/6/2021 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 1/7/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
1/5/2021 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 1/5/2021 | |
1/5/2021 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 1/5/2021 | |
1/5/2021 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001) | 1/5/2021 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
1/5/2021 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 1/5/2021 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
1/5/2021 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 1/5/2021 | |
NOTE: IA Packet |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
1/1/2021 | 20:00 | Initial Appearance |
1/7/2021 | 10:30 | Status Conference |
1/11/2021 | 10:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
1/29/2021 | 11:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
1/29/2021 | 11:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
2/2/2021 | 10:30 | Status Conference |
2/5/2021 | 9:00 | Arraignment Hearing |
2/5/2021 | 9:00 | Arraignment Hearing |
2/5/2021 | 10:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
3/16/2021 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
3/22/2021 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
4/15/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
4/27/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
5/13/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/20/2021 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/27/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/3/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/22/2021 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
7/15/2021 | 8:30 | Sentencing |