« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Fauth, Misty
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Cooper J Lamb - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Squires, Jason
Judge
van Wie
Case #
CR2021-030992-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Cooper J Lamb
Crime Date
8/5/2020
Date
11/2/2022
Description
DANGEROUS DRUG-POSS/USE
ARSCode
13-3407A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Cooper J Lamb
Crime Date
8/5/2020
Date
11/2/2022
Description
DRUG PARAPHERNALIA-POSSESS/USE
ARSCode
13-3415A (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2023
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
12/23/2022
Description
119 - ME: Ord Discharge/Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO TERMINATE PROBATION
Filing Date
12/21/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDATN’S
MOTION TO TERMINATE PROBATION
Filing Date
12/20/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO TERMINATE PROBATION DEFENDANT DEATH
Filing Date
12/14/2022
Description
ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
12/9/2022
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
12/7/2022
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
12/7/2022
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
12/7/2022
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
11/7/2022
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2022
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY HEARING WITH PLEA AGREEMENT NOT ELIGIBLE FOR SENTENCING UNDER ARS 13-901.01
Filing Date
11/2/2022
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INFORMATION
Filing Date
9/27/2022
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2022
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2022
Description
584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2022
Description
584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2022
Description
584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2022
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
QUASHED 2/1/2022
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
179 - ME: Initial Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2022
Description
ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
1/24/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE &
MOTION TO QUASH WARRANT
Filing Date
12/9/2021
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2021
Description
IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2021
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
11/4/2021
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2021
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
11/4/2021
Description
SUM - Summons - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2021
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/7/2021
Time
8:29
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
2/1/2022
Time
8:26
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/1/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
3/10/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/14/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
5/24/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
7/22/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
9/23/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
11/2/2022
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
11/2/2022
Time
8:32
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/7/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing