« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Bollig, Rachael
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Emily Anne Leitzell - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Pacheco, Andrew
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2021-001862-001
Party Name
Steven Richard Leitzell - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Zamora, Gregory
Judge
Saccone
Case #
CR2021-001862-002
Disposition Information
Party Name
Emily Anne Leitzell 
Crime Date
5/2/2021
Date
2/21/2023
Description
DISORD CONDUCT-WEAPON/INSTR
ARSCode
13-2904A6 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Steven Richard Leitzell 
Crime Date
5/2/2021
Date
10/27/2022
Description
DISORD CONDUCT-WEAPON/INSTR
ARSCode
13-2904A6 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Steven Richard Leitzell 
Crime Date
5/2/2021
Date
10/27/2022
Description
DISORD CONDUCT-WEAPON/INSTR
ARSCode
13-2904A6 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2024
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
8/13/2024
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
1/12/2024
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Start Date
Filing Date
10/20/2023
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2023
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Money Start
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
With Prejudice
Filing Date
2/7/2023
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS
Filing Date
1/12/2023
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2023
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
1/4/2023
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
1/3/2023
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT STEVEN LEITZELL’S MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING
Filing Date
11/8/2022
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2022
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2022
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
10/27/2022
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Court Clerk Document Plus
Filing Date
10/21/2022
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2022
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2022
Description
588 - ME: Suspension of Prosecution - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MATTER BE SUSPENDED FROM PROSECUTION
Filing Date
9/26/2022
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT STEVEN LEITZELL’S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
9/19/2022
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
INFORMATION
Filing Date
9/19/2022
Description
ACD - Acknowledgment of Deferred Prosecution - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS CONSENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DEFERRED PROSECUTION PROGRAM AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
Filing Date
9/19/2022
Description
WPH - Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY HEARING TO PARTICIPATE IN THE FELONY DIVERSION
Filing Date
9/19/2022
Description
MSP – Motion for Suspension of Prosecution Pursuant to Rule 38.1 and Defendants Approval - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR SUSPENSION OF PROSECUTION PURSUANT TO RULE 38.1, DEFENDANT’S APPROVAL, AND ORDER
Filing Date
7/28/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
7/11/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2022
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
3/8/2022
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
3/7/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
3/7/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
1/24/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
12/23/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
11/30/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
11/16/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
11/15/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRANSCRIPT OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
11/12/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRANSCRIPT OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
11/12/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR WITNESSES PEYTON AND PAISLEY LEITZELL
Filing Date
10/25/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR WITNESSES PEYTON AND PAISLEY LEITZELL
Filing Date
10/20/2021
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2021
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Rule 15.2 Disclosure Statement
Filing Date
10/13/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
10/13/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
10/13/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2021
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
10/12/2021
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/12/2021
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/12/2021
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
Filing Date
10/8/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Rule 15.2 Disclosure Statement
Filing Date
10/8/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Initial Pretrial Conference Statement
Filing Date
10/1/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF RULE 12.9 CHALLENGE TO GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
9/24/2021
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S RULE 14.3 (b) AFFIDAVIT OF SCHEDULED COURT APPEARANCES
Filing Date
9/3/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
9/2/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
9/1/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRANSCRIPT OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
8/31/2021
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/31/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2021
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRANSCRIPT OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
8/30/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2021
Description
ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
8/26/2021
Description
ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
8/24/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANT EMILY ANNE LEITZELL
Filing Date
8/24/2021
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment
Filing Date
8/24/2021
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Rule 14.3(b) Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment
Filing Date
8/24/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
8/20/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Compliance Regarding Fingerprinting
Filing Date
8/19/2021
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2021
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2021
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED ON 08/02/2021
Filing Date
8/18/2021
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED ON 08/04/2021
Filing Date
7/28/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/28/2021
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM (JVSC)
Filing Date
7/28/2021
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/28/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/28/2021
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/28/2021
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM SPECIFY RDOC OR JVSC
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/26/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
8/26/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/14/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
10/14/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
11/17/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
11/17/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/6/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/6/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/20/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/20/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/8/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/8/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/22/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/22/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/18/2022
Time
9:10
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/18/2022
Time
9:10
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/31/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/31/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/19/2022
Time
9:10
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/19/2022
Time
9:10
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/2/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/2/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/20/2022
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/20/2022
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/4/2022
Time
8:45
Event
Trial
Date
10/4/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/18/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/27/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/27/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
10/27/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/27/2022
Time
14:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
10/27/2022
Time
14:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/27/2022
Time
15:45
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/3/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/29/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/4/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing