« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Lawson, Todd
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
McWhirter, Robert
Judge
Culbertson
Case #
CR2021-001791-001
Party Name
Gary Aller - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Dichter, Stephen
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2021-001791-002
Party Name
Steven Nielsen - (4)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Black, David
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2021-001791-003
Party Name
Kay Hartwell Hunnicut - (5)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Neff, Rhonda
Judge
Schwartz
Case #
CR2021-001791-004
Disposition Information
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell
Crime Date
5/1/2012
Date
5/31/2024
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell
Crime Date
5/1/2012
Date
5/31/2024
Description
FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES
ARSCode
13-2310 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell
Crime Date
5/1/2012
Date
5/31/2024
Description
PROCUREMENT CODE VIOLATION
ARSCode
41-2616 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell
Crime Date
7/10/2012
Date
5/31/2024
Description
FRAUD SCHEME/PRACTICE-CONCEAL
ARSCode
13-2311 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell
Crime Date
12/1/2012
Date
5/31/2024
Description
FRAUD SCHEME/PRACTICE-CONCEAL
ARSCode
13-2311 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell
Crime Date
12/1/2012
Date
5/31/2024
Description
FRAUD SCHEME/PRACTICE-CONCEAL
ARSCode
13-2311 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell
Crime Date
12/12/2012
Date
5/31/2024
Description
PUBLIC MONEY-CUSTODIAN VIOL
ARSCode
35-301 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell
Crime Date
11/12/2013
Date
5/31/2024
Description
PUBLIC MONEY-CUSTODIAN VIOL
ARSCode
35-301 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell
Crime Date
9/11/2014
Date
9/6/2024
Description
PUB OFFICIAL-OFFFER BRIBE
ARSCode
38-465 (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell
Crime Date
9/15/2014
Date
9/6/2024
Description
PUB OFFICIAL-CONFLCT OF INTRST
ARSCode
38-503 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell
Crime Date
10/7/2014
Date
5/31/2024
Description
PUB OFFICIAL-CONFLCT OF INTRST
ARSCode
38-503 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell
Crime Date
4/10/2015
Date
5/31/2024
Description
PUB OFFICIAL-CONFLCT OF INTRST
ARSCode
38-503 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell
Crime Date
5/21/2015
Date
5/31/2024
Description
PUB OFFICIAL-CONFLCT OF INTRST
ARSCode
38-503 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell
Crime Date
6/9/2015
Date
5/31/2024
Description
PUB OFFICIAL-CONFLCT OF INTRST
ARSCode
38-503 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell
Crime Date
4/6/2016
Date
5/31/2024
Description
PUB OFFICIAL-CONFLCT OF INTRST
ARSCode
38-503 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell
Crime Date
10/12/2015
Date
9/6/2024
Description
DEPT REVENUE VIOLATIONS
ARSCode
42-1127 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell
Crime Date
10/27/2016
Date
5/31/2024
Description
DEPT REVENUE VIOLATIONS
ARSCode
42-1127 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Angela Denise Birdwell
Crime Date
8/7/2017
Date
5/31/2024
Description
DEPT REVENUE VIOLATIONS
ARSCode
42-1127 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Steven Nielsen
Crime Date
5/1/2012
Date
11/29/2022
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
Steven Nielsen
Crime Date
5/1/2012
Date
11/29/2022
Description
FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES
ARSCode
13-2310 (F2)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
Steven Nielsen
Crime Date
9/16/2012
Date
11/29/2022
Description
FRAUD SCHEME/PRACTICE-CONCEAL
ARSCode
13-2311 (F5)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
Kay Hartwell Hunnicut
Crime Date
10/14/2014
Date
2/23/2023
Description
DEPT REV-PREPARE FALSE RETURN
ARSCode
42-1127B2 (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Kay Hartwell Hunnicut
Crime Date
10/12/2015
Date
2/23/2023
Description
DEPT REVENUE VIOLATIONS
ARSCode
42-1127 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Kay Hartwell Hunnicut
Crime Date
12/12/2017
Date
2/23/2023
Description
DEPT REVENUE VIOLATIONS
ARSCode
42-1127 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Gary Aller
Crime Date
5/1/2012
Date
11/29/2022
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
Gary Aller
Crime Date
5/1/2012
Date
11/29/2022
Description
FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES
ARSCode
13-2310 (F2)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
Gary Aller
Crime Date
7/6/2012
Date
11/29/2022
Description
FRAUD SCHEME/PRACTICE-CONCEAL
ARSCode
13-2311 (F5)
Disposition Code
Remand To Grand Jury
Disposition
Remand To Grand Jury
Party Name
Gary Aller
Crime Date
5/1/2012
Date
5/31/2024
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Gary Aller
Crime Date
5/1/2012
Date
5/31/2024
Description
FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES
ARSCode
13-2310 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Gary Aller
Crime Date
7/6/2012
Date
5/31/2024
Description
FRAUD SCHEME/PRACTICE-CONCEAL
ARSCode
13-2311 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Steven Nielsen
Crime Date
5/1/2012
Date
5/31/2024
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Steven Nielsen
Crime Date
5/1/2012
Date
5/31/2024
Description
FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES
ARSCode
13-2310 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Steven Nielsen
Crime Date
9/16/2012
Date
5/31/2024
Description
FRAUD SCHEME/PRACTICE-CONCEAL
ARSCode
13-2311 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2025
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/17/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2025
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/17/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2025
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2025
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/14/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2025
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE CONVICTION
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Criminal Financial Information Worksheet
Filing Date
3/28/2025
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
MOTION TO SET ASIDE
CONVICTION
Filing Date
3/18/2025
Description
ASJ - Application to Set aside Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SET ASIDE CONVICTION
Filing Date
3/4/2025
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/7/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2025
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/7/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE (31.2 (g))
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/4/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/18/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/25/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE (31.2 (g))
Filing Date
2/18/2025
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/27/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/19/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTIFICATION NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
2/10/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
2/7/2025
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT STEVEN NIELSEN’S (003) NOTICE OF APPEAL
Filing Date
2/6/2025
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/10/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GARY ALLER’S (002) NOTICE OF APPEAL
Filing Date
1/29/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/29/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2025
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/29/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2025
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/17/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Rule 2.10(c) Notification
Filing Date
11/27/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GARY ALLER (002) AND STEVEN NIELSEN (003) REPLY TO STATE’S SUPPLEMENT TO RESPONSE FILED NOVEMBER 19, 2024
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENT TO IT’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO UNSEAL GRAND JURY MATERIALS
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENT TO IT’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO UNSEAL GRAND JURY MATERIALS
Filing Date
10/16/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS GARY ALLER’S (DEF. 002) and STEVEN NIELSEN’S (DEF. 003) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO USE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPTS RECEIVED IN THE CRIMINAL CASE DISMISSED WITH (PREJUDICE) PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY, LOCAL RULE 2.8(e); FOR RELEASE OF CERTAIN GRAND JURY EXHIBITS.
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO
UNSEAL GRAND JURY
MATERIALS
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO UNSEAL GRAND JURY MATERIALS
Filing Date
9/26/2024
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EARLY
TERMINATION OF
PROBATION
Filing Date
9/17/2024
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING ORDERS
Filing Date
9/16/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS GARY ALLER’S (DEF. 002) and STEVEN NIELSEN’S (DEF. 003) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO USE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPTS RECEIVED IN THE CRIMINAL CASE DISMISSED WITH (PREJUDICE) PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY, LOCAL RULE 2.8(e); FOR RELEASE OF CERTAIN GRAND JURY EXHIBITS.
Filing Date
9/13/2024
Description
SOU - Sentencing Order Unsupervised - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOU - Sentencing Order Unsupervised
Filing Date
9/10/2024
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2024
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2024
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/6/2024
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
8/21/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2024
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
HEARING DATE: July 12, 2024
Filing Date
6/28/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2024
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2024
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2024
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2024
Description
079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2024
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2024
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/30/2024
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2024
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/30/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/30/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 1-10, COUNTS 13-17, AND COUNTS 22-23 ONLY WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/24/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ALLER (002) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
5/23/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GARY ALLER (002)’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF RULE 16.4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROBABLE CAUSE FOR INDICTMENT; OR, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO RECONSIDER DENIAL OF SECOND MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
5/23/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page for Defendant Gary Allers (002) Reply in Support of his Rule 16.4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Probable Cause for Indictment; Or, Alternatively, Motion to Reconsider Denial of Second Motion to Remand
Filing Date
5/21/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND MOTION TO
DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
COUNTS NINE AND TEN
UNDER RULE 16.4(b)
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ALLERS MOTION TO DISMISS DATED MARCH 22, 2024
Filing Date
5/16/2024
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ALLERS MOTION TO DISMISS DATED MARCH 22, 2024
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/7/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND MOTION TO
DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
COUNTS NINE AND TEN
UNDER RULE 16.4(b)
Filing Date
5/1/2024
Description
NOJ – Notice of Joinder - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFEDNDANT ALLER'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROBABLE CAUSE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
4/24/2024
Description
NOJ – Notice of Joinder - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF JOINDER
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF OUT-OF-STATE
TRAVEL
Filing Date
4/15/2024
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2024
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2024
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2024
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2024
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/1/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2024
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/22/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Gary Aller (002)s Rule 16.4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Probable Cause for Indictment; Or, Alternatively, Motion to Reconsider Denial of Second Motion to Remand
Filing Date
3/22/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/22/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2024
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT BIRDWELL'S MOTION TO SEVER COUNTS
Filing Date
2/26/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2024
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2024
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
2/14/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO MAKE LATE FILING OF REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT BIRDWELL'S MOTION TO SEVER COUNTS
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2024
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Gary Allers (002) Notice to Court
Filing Date
1/24/2024
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2024
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2024
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES NOTICE OF ERRATA
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GARY ALLER’S (002) UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES NOTICE OF ERRATA
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF ERRATA
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
NOJ – Notice of Joinder - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT ALLER’S REPLY RE: SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2024
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GARY ALLER’S (002) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 16.4 MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
12/20/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
12/20/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
12/20/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
12/20/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT BIRDWELL'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS NINE AND TEN FOR VIOLATING EX POST FACTO CLAUSE AND FAILING TO STATE AN OFFENSE
Filing Date
12/20/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION FOR STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
12/20/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION FOR STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
12/20/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION FOR STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
12/14/2023
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Request for Extension to File Response
Filing Date
12/13/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT STEVEN NIELSEN’S
REPLY RE: DEFENDANTS ALLER
AND NIELSEN’S MOTION TO
SEVER
Filing Date
12/8/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2023
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS NINE AND TEN FOR VIOLATING THE EX POST FACTO CLAUSE AND FAILING TO STATE AN OFFENSE
Filing Date
12/5/2023
Description
NOJ – Notice of Joinder - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT GARY ALLER'S SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 16.4 MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT WITH PREDJUDICE
Filing Date
11/29/2023
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GARY ALLER’S SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 16.4 MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
11/22/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF OUT-OF-STATE TRAVEL
Filing Date
11/17/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GARY ALLER’S (002) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANT ANGELA DENISE BIRDWELL (001) ENTIRELY; OR ALTERNATIVELY TO SEVER CERTAIN CHARGES AGAINST ANGELA DENISE BIRDWELL (001)
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY
Filing Date
11/13/2023
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEVER
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION FOR STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ALLER AND NIELSEN'S MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANT ANGELA DENISE BIRDWELL ENTIRELY; OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO SEVER CERTAIN CHARGES AGAINST DEFENDANT ANGELA DENISE BIRDWELL
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION FOR STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ALLER AND NIELSEN'S MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANT ANGELA DENISE BIRDWELL ENTIRELY; OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO SEVER CERTAIN CHARGES AGAINST DEFENDANT ANGELA DENISE BIRDWELL
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION FOR STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ALLER AND NIELSEN'S MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANT ANGELA DENISE BIRDWELL ENTIRELY; OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO SEVER CERTAIN CHARGES AGAINST DEFENDANT ANGELA DENISE BIRDWELL
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ALLER AND NIELSEN'S MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANT ANGELA DENISE BIRDWELL ENTIRELY; OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO SEVER CERTAIN CHARGES AGAINST DEFENDANT ANGELA DENISE BIRDWELL
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ALLER AND NIELSEN'S MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANT ANGELA DENISE BIRDWELL ENTIRELY; OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO SEVER CERTAIN CHARGES AGAINST DEFENDANT ANGELA DENISE BIRDWELL
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ALLER AND NIELSEN'S MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANT ANGELA DENISE BIRDWELL ENTIRELY; OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO SEVER CERTAIN CHARGES AGAINST DEFENDANT ANGELA DENISE BIRDWELL
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT BIRDWELL'S MOTION TO SEVER COUNTS
Filing Date
10/18/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2023
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2023
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSE
Filing Date
10/10/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT TO MOTION TO SEVER
Filing Date
10/9/2023
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2023
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT BIRDWELL'S MOTION TO SEVER COUNTS
Filing Date
9/26/2023
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Gary Aller (002) and Steven Nielsens (003) Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Defendants Aller (002) and Steven Nielsens (003) Motion to Sever Defendant Angela Denise Birdwell Entirely; or Alternatively, to Sever Certain Charges Against
Filing Date
9/26/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Gary Aller (002) and Steven Nielsens (003) Motion to Sever Defendant Angela Denise Birdwell Entirely; or Alternatively, to Sever Certain Charges Against Defendant (Angela Denise Birdwell (001))
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2023
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2023
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2023
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2023
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2023
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2023
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2023
Description
NOJ – Notice of Joinder - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT BIRDWELL’S NOTICE OF JOINDER RE: DEFENDANT STEVEN NIELSEN’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF RULE 16.4 MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
8/8/2023
Description
NOJ – Notice of Joinder - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GARY ALLER'S (002) NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT NIELSEN'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF RULE 16.4 MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
8/7/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF OUT-OF-STATE TRAVEL
Filing Date
8/7/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENDANT’S REPLY RE: MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Filing Date
8/7/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFNDANT NIELSEN’S MOTION TO
DISMISS UNDER STATUTE OF
LIMITATIONS
Filing Date
8/2/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE REPLY RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Filing Date
7/27/2023
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Motion For Extension Of Time To File Reply RE: Defendants Motion To Dismiss Under Statute Of Limitations
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: MOTION FOR DEFENDANT NIELSON TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY GRANTED
Filing Date
7/13/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED / GRANTED
Filing Date
7/13/2023
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2023
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2023
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR DEFENDANT NIELSEN TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY
Filing Date
7/10/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GARY ALLER’S (002) EMERGENCY MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
Filing Date
7/3/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO AMEND STANDARD RELEASE CONDITIONS TO PERMIT OUT-OF-STATE TRAVEL
Filing Date
6/28/2023
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2023
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2023
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2023
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Response to Defendant Nielsens Motion to Dismiss Under Statute of Limitations
Filing Date
6/9/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
State's Response to Defendant Nielsen's Motion to Dismiss Under Statute of Limitations
Filing Date
6/9/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
State's Response to Defendant Nielsen's Motion to Dismiss Under Statute of Limitation
Filing Date
6/6/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT RE: MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Filing Date
5/26/2023
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSE
Filing Date
5/26/2023
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSE
Filing Date
5/26/2023
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Request for Extension to File Response
Filing Date
5/25/2023
Description
NOJ – Notice of Joinder - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT BIRDWELL’S NOTICE OF JOINDER RE: DEFENDANT STEVEN NIELSEN’S MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT UNDER STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Filing Date
5/25/2023
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2023
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2023
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS
RE: MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GARY ALLER’S (002) NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT STEVEN NIELSEN’S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER STATUE OF LIMITATIONS
Filing Date
5/19/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
5/18/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
In support of Rule 12.9 Motion
Filing Date
5/18/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/2/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
extending Motion to exceed page limit
Filing Date
5/18/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE; NOTICE OF JOINDER GRANTED
Filing Date
5/16/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Gary Aller (002)s Reply in Support of Second Rule 12.9 Motion to Remand
Filing Date
5/16/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENDANT ALLER’S (002) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SECOND RULE 12.9 MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
5/15/2023
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS
UNDER STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Filing Date
5/9/2023
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ALLER’S (002) UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE HIS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF RULE 12.9 MOTION
Filing Date
5/9/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Defendant Allers (002) Reply in Support of Rule 16.4 Motion to Dismiss Indictment with Prejudice
Filing Date
5/9/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GARY ALLER’S (002) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF RULE 16.4 MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/8/2023
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT BIRDWELL’S NOTICE OF JOINDER RE: DEFENDANT ALLER’S RULE 16.4 MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/5/2023
Description
NOJ – Notice of Joinder - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Joinder Re: Defendant Allers Rule 16.4 Motion To Dismiss Indictment With Prejudice
Filing Date
5/3/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES / TO DEFENDANT ALLERS SECOND MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
NOJ – Notice of Joinder - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Joinder:
Defendant Birdwell’s Notice of Joinder to Codefendant Gary Aller’s Second Motion to Remand
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ALLER’S RULE 16.4 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT BIRDWELL’S REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR GRAND JURY REMAND
TREBUS VIOLATION
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING AN EXTENSION ON DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT FROM 11 PAGES TO 30 PAGES.
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GARY ALLER'S (002) RULE 16.4 MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT WITH PREDUDICE
Filing Date
4/25/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GARY ALLER'S RULE 16.4 MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
4/19/2023
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENDANT GARY ALLER’S (002) RULE 16.4 MOTION TO DISMISS INDICTMENT WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
4/19/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Gary Allers (002) Motion to File Under Seal his Rule 16.4 Motion to Dismiss Indictment with Prejudice
Filing Date
4/17/2023
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT NIELSEN'S REPLY TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO SECOND MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
4/11/2023
Description
119 - ME: Ord Discharge/Probation - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT NIELSEN’S SECOND
MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
4/3/2023
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT BIRWELL’S MOTON
FOR GRAND JURY REMAND
TREBUS VIOLATION
Filing Date
3/31/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Gary Allers (002) Unopposed Motion to Continue Final Trial Management Conference and Trial Assignment
Filing Date
3/29/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTS COUNSEL'S MOTION TO TRAVEL OUT OF THE COUNTRY FROM APRIL 25 TO MAY 5, 2023
Filing Date
3/28/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF JOINDER IN
DEFENDANT ALLER’S SECOND
MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
3/27/2023
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT HUNNICUTT’S MOTION FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION
Filing Date
3/24/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Gary Allers (002) Motion to File Under Seal His Second Motion to Remand
Filing Date
3/24/2023
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GARY ALLER’S (002) NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT STEVEN NIELSEN’S SECOND MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Gary Allers (002) Notice of Joinder in Defendant Angela D. Birdwells Motion for Grand Jury Remand Trebus Violation
Filing Date
3/22/2023
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSE
Filing Date
3/22/2023
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSE
Filing Date
3/21/2023
Description
NOJ – Notice of Joinder - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Joinder: Defendant Birdwell’s Notice of Joinder to Codefendant Stephen Nielsen’s Second Motion to Remand
Filing Date
3/21/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/21/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
91 STATUTES
Filing Date
3/17/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/21/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
91 STATUTES
Filing Date
3/17/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT NIELSEN’S SECOND
MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
3/17/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO TRAVEL
Filing Date
3/17/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/21/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
STATUTES 91
Filing Date
3/17/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/21/2023
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
91 STATUTES
Filing Date
3/14/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT HUNNICUTT’S NOTICE
OF COMPLIANCE WITH MONETARY
OBLIGATIONS
Filing Date
3/10/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2023
Description
SOU - Sentencing Order Unsupervised - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOU - Sentencing Order Unsupervised
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
NLB - Notice to Licensing Board - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Licensing Board Notification (Restricted)
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT HUNNICUTT’S
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
3/7/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
91st SGJ Statutes Transcript 08/29/2022
Filing Date
3/7/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
91st SGJ Statutes Transcript 08/29/2022
Filing Date
3/7/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
91st SGJ Statutes Transcript 08/29/2022
Filing Date
3/7/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
91st SGJ Statutes Transcript 08/29/2022
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (004)
Docket Date
3/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Gary Allers (002) Motion to Continue Complex Case Management Conference and Final Trial Management Conference
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plea Agreement
Filing Date
2/16/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT BIRDWELL’S MOTION FOR GRAND JURY
REMAND
TREBUS VIOLATION
Filing Date
2/14/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RULE 12.6
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GARY ALLER’S NOTICE OF ERRATA
Filing Date
2/6/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance within Firm
Filing Date
2/3/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2023
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
1/31/2023
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION AND TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS
Filing Date
1/30/2023
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION
Filing Date
1/27/2023
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTS COUNSEL'S MOTION TO TRAVEL FEBRUARY 11-18,2023
Filing Date
1/23/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO TRAVEL
Filing Date
1/11/2023
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Birdwells Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing 15.2 Motion
Filing Date
1/11/2023
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Birdwell Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing 12.9 Motion
Filing Date
1/10/2023
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Continue Settlement Conference
Filing Date
1/10/2023
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2023
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2023
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/30/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Temporary
Filing Date
12/20/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2022
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
12/12/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2022
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2022
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2022
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2022
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
12/1/2022
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2022
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2022
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2022
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2022
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2022
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2022
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2022
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
11/21/2022
Filing Date
11/28/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REMAND
Filing Date
11/15/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2022
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REMAND
Filing Date
11/15/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2022
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2022
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REMAND
Filing Date
11/15/2022
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2022
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2022
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2022
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2022
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2022
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING DEFENDANT STEVEN NIELSEN'S MOTION TO SEAL PORTION OF MOTION FOR REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
11/7/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO TRAVEL OUT OF STATE
Filing Date
11/3/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL ASSISTANT ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
11/3/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL ASSISTANT ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
11/3/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001,002,003,004)
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL ASSISTANT ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
11/3/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL ASSISTANT ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
11/1/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR OUT-OF-STATE TRAVEL
Filing Date
10/27/2022
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel within Firm
Filing Date
9/12/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Birdwells Notice of Joinder to Co-Defendant Gary Allers Motion to Compel Discovery
Filing Date
9/11/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT NIELSEN’S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
9/7/2022
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2022
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2022
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2022
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Birdwell’s Notice of Joinder to Co-Defendant Steven Nielsen’s Motion for Sanctions
Filing Date
9/6/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT BIRDWELL’S NOTICE OF JOINDER TO CO-DEFENDANT KAY HARTWELL HUNNICUTT’S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
Filing Date
9/2/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Gary Allers (002) Joinder in Defendant Kay Hartwell Hunnicutts Notice of Supplemental Authority
Filing Date
8/23/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Motion to Continue FTMC and Convert to Status Conference
Filing Date
8/23/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Motion to Continue FTMC and Convert to Status Conference
Filing Date
8/23/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Motion to Continue FTMC and Convert to Status Conference
Filing Date
8/23/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE FTMC AND CONVERT TO STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
8/22/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Hunnicutts Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Remand
Filing Date
8/17/2022
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2022
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Allers (002) Reply to States Response to Motion to Compel Discovery
Filing Date
8/5/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Steven Nielsens Reply To States Response To Defendants Motion To Remand To Grand Jury
Filing Date
8/2/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Corrected Defendant Steven Nielsens Reply To States Response To Defendants Motion To Remand To Grand Jury
Filing Date
8/1/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT HUNNICUTT’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9, ARIZ. R. CRIM. P.
Filing Date
8/1/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Nielsens Reply to States Response to Motion for Sanctions
Filing Date
8/1/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT HUNNICUTT’S MOTION TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMIT REGARDING
DEFENDANT’S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
7/29/2022
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SECOND MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9,
ARIZ. R. CRIM. P.
Filing Date
7/28/2022
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Reply Deadline for Motion to Remand
Filing Date
7/27/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Gary Aller (002) Reply to States Response to Allers Rule 12.9 Motion
Filing Date
7/27/2022
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT GARY ALLER’S (002) REPLY DEADLINE AND EXTEND PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
7/26/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT NIELSEN’S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
7/26/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ALLER’S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Filing Date
7/20/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Joinder in Defendant Allers Motion To Compel Discovery
Filing Date
7/18/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT HUNNICUTT’S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN CO-DEFENDANT GARY ALLER’S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Filing Date
7/18/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT HUNNICUTT’S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN CO-DEFENDANT STEVEN NIELSEN’S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
7/15/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ALLER’S (002) MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED
EXPEDITED HEARING REQUESTED
Filing Date
7/6/2022
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion For Extension Of Time To File Reply
Filing Date
7/6/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GARY ALLER’S (002) NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT NIELSEN’S RULE 15.7(c) MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER
Filing Date
7/5/2022
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9,
ARIZ. R. CRIM. P.
Filing Date
7/1/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT NIELSEN’S MOTION TO REMAND TO GRAND JURY
And
MOTION TO JOIN DEF. ALLER’S (002) MOTION FOR GRAND JURY REMAND
Filing Date
7/1/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Nielsens Rule 15-79(c) Motion For Sanctions For Failure To Comply With Court Order
Filing Date
6/30/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Defendant Hunnicutts Motion to Remand to the Jury Pursuant to Rule 12.9, Ariz. R. Crim. P.
Filing Date
6/30/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Response to Defendant Allers Motion to Remand Pursuant to Rule 12.9
Filing Date
6/20/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO TRAVEL
Filing Date
6/16/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTING DEADLINE TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Filing Date
6/9/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2022
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Filing Date
6/8/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO REQUEST PERMISSION TO TRAVEL OUT OF STATE JULY 8th THROUGH JULY 10th
Filing Date
6/6/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSE
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/31/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSE
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/31/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSE
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Joinder:
Defendant Birdwell’s Notice of Joinder to Codefendant Stephen Nielsen’s Motion to Compel
Filing Date
5/23/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO JOIN DEF. HUNNICUTT’S (004) MOTION FOR REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
5/20/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT HUNNICUTT’S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN CO-DEFENDANT STEVEN NIELSEN’S MOTION TO COMPEL
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GARY ALLER’S (002) NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT STEVEN NIELSEN’S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERYy
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE FTMC, TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE FTMC, TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE FTMC, TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
NOJ – Notice of Joinder - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Gary Allers (002) Notice of Joinder in Defendant Steven Nielsens Motion to Remand to Grand Jury
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GARY ALLER’S (002) NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT KAY HARTWELL HUNNICUTT’S MOTION TO REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE FTMC, TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES
Filing Date
5/19/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE FTMC, TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES
Filing Date
5/17/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO STAY ARIZONA BOARD OF EDUCATION PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
5/16/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEAL PORTION OF DEFENDANT STEVEN NIELSEN'S (003) MOTION FOR REMAND TO GRAND JURY Defendant,
Filing Date
5/13/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO JOIN DEF. ALLER'S (002) MOTION FOR REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
5/13/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Hunnicutts Notice of Joinder to Defendant Nielsens Motion to Remand
Filing Date
5/13/2022
Description
NOJ – Notice of Joinder - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT HUNNICUTT’S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN CO-DEFENDANT GARY ALLER’S MOTION
TO REMAND
Filing Date
5/13/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT HUNNICUTT’S MOTION
TO REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY
PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9, ARIZ. R.
CRIM. P.
Filing Date
5/13/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT HUNNICUTT’S MOTION TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMIT REGARDING
DEFENDANT’S REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9, ARIZ. R. CRIM. P.
Filing Date
5/12/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ALLER’S (002) MOTION TO REMAND PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9
ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED
Filing Date
5/11/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
4/26/2022
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Filing Date
4/18/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (004)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO REQUEST PERMISSIONG TO TRAVEL OUT OF STATE 3-14-22 TO 3-23-22
Filing Date
3/14/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO REQUEST PERMISSION TO TRAVEL OUT OF STATE MARCH 14, 2022 TO MARCH 23, 2022
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Aller (002) and Nielsens (003) Unopposed Joint Motion to Vacate Deadlines
Filing Date
2/9/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Allers (002) Reply in Support of his Motion to Disqualify
Filing Date
2/4/2022
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Compel Discovery
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Page Limit for Defendant Gary Allers (002) Reply in Support of His Motion to Disqualify
Filing Date
1/27/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
1/31/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ALLER'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY THE OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
1/26/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION
Filing Date
1/24/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2022
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9
Filing Date
1/20/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GARY ALLER (002)’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION
Filing Date
1/18/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO JOIN MOTION TO
EXTEND TIME TO CHALLENGE
GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS WITH
CR2021-001791-002
Filing Date
1/14/2022
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion of Gary Aller (002) To Extend Time To File Rule 12.9 Motion
Filing Date
1/14/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
1/10/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT ON MOTION TO SUPPRESS
Filing Date
1/10/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLIES
Filing Date
1/10/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
1/10/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
1/10/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
1/7/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS ALLER (002) and NIELSON’S (003) REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE IN DEFENDANTS ALLER AND NIELSON’S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULE 16.4, A.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
1/7/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ALLER’S REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ALLER’S MOTION TO DISMISS BASED UPON PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
1/7/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Allers (002) Reply to States Response to Defendants Motion to Suppress
Filing Date
1/7/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Allers (002) Motion to Disqualify the Office of the Attorney General
Filing Date
12/22/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Page Limit for Defendant Gary Allers Replies in Support of its Motion to Suppress, Motion to Dismiss Based Upon Prosecutorial Misconduct, Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 16.4
Filing Date
12/22/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Gary Allers Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Files Its Replies
Filing Date
12/22/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS ALLER and NIELSON'S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULE 16.4, A.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
12/20/2021
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS ALLER and NIELSON'S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULE 16.4, A.R.CRIM.P.
Filing Date
12/20/2021
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ALLER’S MOTION TO DISMISS BASED UPON PROSECUTORIAL MISCONDUCT
Filing Date
12/20/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SUPPRESS
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION
Filing Date
12/16/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION AND ORDERING THAT THE DEADLINE FOR FILING THE MOTION BE EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING 01/19/22
Filing Date
12/15/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO EXTEND
TIME TO FILE MOTION TO REMAND
PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9,
ARIZ. R. CRIM. P.
Filing Date
12/10/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION
Filing Date
12/10/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING DEFENDANTS RULE 12.9 MOTION DEADLINE FROM 12/20/21 TO 01/19/22
Filing Date
12/6/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Rule 12.9 Motion
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
11/24/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply To Motion To Dismiss For Lack of Specificity and Notice: A Due Process Violation Oral Argument Requested
Filing Date
11/24/2021
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Aller (002) and Nielsons (003) Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 16.4, A.R.Crim.P.
Filing Date
11/23/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
11/23/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
11/12/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2021
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2021
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2021
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2021
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2021
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Allers Motion to Dismiss Based Upon Prosecutorial Misconduct
Filing Date
11/4/2021
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2021
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2021
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2021
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO REQUEST PERMISSION TO TRAVEL OUT OF STATE
Filing Date
11/1/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF JOINDER TO DEFENDANTS GARY ALLER AND STEVEN NIELSEN’S
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SPECIFICITY:
A DUE PROCESS VIOLATION
Filing Date
11/1/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Gary Allers Rule 15.2(b) Disclosure Statement
Filing Date
10/28/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ALLER’S MOTION
TO SUPPRESS
Filing Date
10/28/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Unopposed Motion to Extend Page Limit for Defendant Gary Allers Motion to Suppress
Filing Date
10/19/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO REQUEST PERMISSION
TO TRAVEL OUT OF STATE
Filing Date
10/11/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF DEFENSES, WITNESSES, AND EXHIBITS
PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
10/11/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Request for Discovery
Filing Date
10/8/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST
FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
10/8/2021
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF DEFENSES, WITNESSES, AND EXHIBITS
PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
10/6/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF UPCOMING COURT DATE AND REQUIRED APPEARANCE
Filing Date
10/4/2021
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2021
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2021
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2021
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Response to Defendants Motion for Lack of Specificity and Notice: A Due Process Violation
Filing Date
10/1/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SPECIFICITY AND NOTICE: A DUE PROCESS VIOLATION
Filing Date
9/27/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
9/24/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party ()
Docket Date
9/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
9/23/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE GRAND JURY EXHIBITS
Filing Date
9/22/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
9/22/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
9/21/2021
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2021
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2021
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2021
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2021
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE
OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703
Filing Date
9/16/2021
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure
Filing Date
9/16/2021
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion Pursuant to A.R.S. § 13-703
Filing Date
9/16/2021
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion Pursuant to A.R.S. § 13-703
Filing Date
9/16/2021
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure
Filing Date
9/16/2021
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion Pursuant to A.R.S. § 13-703
Filing Date
9/16/2021
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
9/16/2021
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
9/9/2021
Description
001 - ME: Disqualification - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2021
Description
001 - ME: Disqualification - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2021
Description
001 - ME: Disqualification - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2021
Description
001 - ME: Disqualification - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2021
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SPECIFICITY AND NOTICE: A DUE PROCESS VIOLATION
Filing Date
8/18/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION OF DEFENDANTS ANGELA D. BIRDWELL, GARY ALLER, STEVEN NIELSEN AND KAY HARTWELL HUNNICUTT TO EXTEND THE DATE BY WHICH RULE 12.9 MOTIONS MUST BE FILED AND PRESCRIBING PAGE LIMITS
Filing Date
8/17/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES MOTION TO AMEND THE INDICTMENT
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
8/13/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2021
Description
569 - ME: Not Guilty Arraignment/Complex Case Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2021
Description
569 - ME: Not Guilty Arraignment/Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2021
Description
569 - ME: Not Guilty Arraignment/Complex Case Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2021
Description
569 - ME: Not Guilty Arraignment/Complex Case Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2021
Description
ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
8/11/2021
Description
ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
8/11/2021
Description
ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
8/11/2021
Description
ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
8/11/2021
Description
ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
8/11/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO DESIGNATE COMPLEX CASE
Filing Date
8/10/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DESIGNATE COMPLEX CASE
Filing Date
8/9/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
8/9/2021
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Gary Allers Notice of Filing Stamped Summons to Show Completion of Fingerprinting
Filing Date
8/6/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
8/5/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
8/5/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2021
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2021
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2021
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2021
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL OF
RECORD FOR DEFENDANT
KAY HUNNICUTT
Filing Date
7/26/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
7/23/2021
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/23/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
07/21/2021
Filing Date
7/23/2021
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/23/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
07/21/2021
Filing Date
7/23/2021
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
07/21/2021
Filing Date
7/23/2021
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/23/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
07/21/2021
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/23/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/23/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/23/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/23/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/23/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/23/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2021
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/11/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
8/11/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
8/11/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
8/11/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
9/29/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
9/29/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
9/29/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
9/29/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
11/9/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/9/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/9/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/9/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/9/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/9/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/9/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/9/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/30/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/30/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/30/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/30/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/12/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/12/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/12/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/12/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/16/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/16/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/16/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/16/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/24/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/24/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/24/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/24/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/24/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/24/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/24/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/24/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/24/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/24/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/24/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/24/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/7/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/7/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/7/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/7/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/26/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/26/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/26/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/26/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/9/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/9/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/9/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/9/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/25/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/25/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/6/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/6/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/6/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/6/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/8/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/8/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/28/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/28/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/28/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/28/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/29/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/29/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/13/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/13/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/13/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/13/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/14/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/14/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/14/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/13/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
1/18/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/18/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/18/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/18/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/18/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/18/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/18/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/18/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/7/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/7/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/7/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/7/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/17/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
2/23/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/6/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/6/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/6/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/6/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/7/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/7/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/7/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/9/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
3/14/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/14/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/14/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/14/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/4/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/4/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/4/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/11/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/11/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/11/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/16/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/16/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/16/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/12/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/12/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/12/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/13/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/13/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/13/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/19/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/19/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/19/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/15/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
9/15/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
9/15/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
10/27/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/27/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/27/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/4/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/4/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/4/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/4/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/4/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/4/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/11/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/11/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/11/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/26/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/26/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/26/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/26/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/26/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/26/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/1/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/1/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/1/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/22/2024
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/22/2024
Time
14:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/22/2024
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/22/2024
Time
14:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/22/2024
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/22/2024
Time
14:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/29/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/29/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/29/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/29/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/29/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/29/2024
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/31/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/31/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/31/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/31/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/31/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/31/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/31/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/31/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/31/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/31/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/12/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/12/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/12/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/9/2024
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/16/2024
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/6/2024
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/6/2024
Time
10:31
Event
Sentencing
Date
9/19/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/19/2024
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/26/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Trial