« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Weinberg, Hilary
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Collin Alexander Jones - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Finefrock, Scott
Judge
Fish
Case #
CR2021-001293-001
Party Name
B Victim - (3)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Balson, Jamie
Judge
Case #
CR2021-001293-001
Party Name
B Victim - (4)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Balson, Jamie
Judge
Case #
CR2021-001293-001
Party Name
B Victim - (5)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Balson, Jamie
Judge
Case #
CR2021-001293-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Collin Alexander Jones
Crime Date
5/21/2020
Date
4/26/2022
Description
FAIL TO STAY/WITH DEATH/INJURY
ARSCode
28-661B (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Collin Alexander Jones
Crime Date
5/21/2020
Date
4/26/2022
Description
FAIL TO STAY/ACCID/ATTEND VEH
ARSCode
28-662A2 (M2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2023
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
6/2/2023
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
4/21/2023
Description
MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
11/22/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
REQUEST TO VISIT PARENTS IN MEXICO
Filing Date
7/22/2022
Description
NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel for Crime Victim
Filing Date
6/30/2022
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2022
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2022
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RSD Collin Jones
Filing Date
6/22/2022
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
6/21/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION RE RESTITUTION
Filing Date
6/21/2022
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2022
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
6/21/2022
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
6/21/2022
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
6/21/2022
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement Jail
Filing Date
6/21/2022
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
6/21/2022
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/20/2022
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation regarding restitution
Filing Date
6/20/2022
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ADDITIONAL INFORMATION
FOR COURT’S CONSIDERATION
AT SENTENCING
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2022
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plea Agreement
Filing Date
4/26/2022
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2022
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2022
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THIS PRECONVICTION LIEN BE FILED THIS DATE
Filing Date
2/24/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/23/2022
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR PRE-CONVICTION RESTITUTION LIEN
Filing Date
1/26/2022
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
1/18/2022
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
11/19/2021
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTON TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
9/22/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDING RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
9/17/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ALLOW TEMPORARY OUT OF STATE TRAVEL
Filing Date
9/13/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
STATEMENT
Filing Date
8/17/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2021
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASE UNREDACTED COPY OF INCIDENT REPORT
Filing Date
8/10/2021
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
8/10/2021
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/10/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
8/9/2021
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
8/9/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
8/4/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR RELEASE OF FIRE
DEPT CITY?? FIRE DEPARTMENT RECORDS
Filing Date
7/26/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR VICTIM AND ASSERTION OF VICTIMS' CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS
Filing Date
7/2/2021
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2021
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
6/18/2021
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
06/10/2021
Filing Date
6/2/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2021
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/7/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RE: STATE'S MOTION TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
4/7/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
4/7/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/7/2021
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/7/2021
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/1/2021
Time
9:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
8/13/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
9/14/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
11/4/2021
Time
8:55
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/18/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/6/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/20/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/21/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
1/25/2022
Time
9:20
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/8/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/18/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
3/3/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/17/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/31/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/11/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/19/2022
Time
9:5
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/26/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
4/26/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/3/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/10/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/21/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing