Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, S P 1 Capital Litigation      
Maribel Loera - (2)
 
Defendant  F   Alcantar, Herman   Master Calendar  CR2021-001259-001  
Rafael Loera - (3)
 
Defendant  M   Willmott, Jennifer   Master Calendar  CR2021-001259-002  
B Victim - (4)
 
Victim  N/A   Andrews, Nathan      
B Victim - (5)
 
Victim  N/A   Andrews, Nathan      
B Victim - (6)
 
Victim  N/A   Andrews, Nathan      
B Victim - (7)
 
Victim  N/A   Andrews, Nathan      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Maribel Loera  13-1105A2 (F1)  MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME  5/1/2016  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  7/8/2021 
Maribel Loera  13-2926A (F5)  ABAND/CONCEAL DEAD BODY/PARTS  5/1/2016  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  7/8/2021 
Maribel Loera  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  5/1/2016  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  7/8/2021 
Maribel Loera  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  5/1/2016  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  7/8/2021 
Rafael Loera  13-1105A2 (F1)  MURDER 1ST DEG-DURING CRIME  5/1/2016  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  7/8/2021 
Rafael Loera  13-1704A (F2)  ARSON OF OCCUPIED STRUCTURE  1/28/2020  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  7/8/2021 
Rafael Loera  13-2926A (F5)  ABAND/CONCEAL DEAD BODY/PARTS  5/1/2016  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  7/8/2021 
Rafael Loera  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  5/1/2016  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  7/8/2021 
Rafael Loera  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  5/1/2016  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  7/8/2021 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
11/16/2021  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  11/16/2021   
11/2/2021  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  11/4/2021  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL 
7/13/2021  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (002)  7/13/2021   
7/13/2021  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)  7/13/2021   
7/12/2021  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  7/12/2021   
7/12/2021  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  7/12/2021   
7/8/2021  ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)  7/20/2021   
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE 
7/8/2021  ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (002)  7/20/2021   
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE 
7/7/2021  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  7/8/2021   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS AND QUASH WARRANT OR SUMMONS 
7/7/2021  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)  7/8/2021   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS AND QUASH WARRANT OR SUMMONS 
6/25/2021  STA - Statement - Party (002)  6/28/2021   
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT 
6/24/2021  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/25/2021   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES, WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS 
6/21/2021  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  6/30/2021   
6/15/2021  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)  6/15/2021   
6/15/2021  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  6/22/2021   
6/15/2021  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  6/22/2021   
6/15/2021  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  6/23/2021   
6/8/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  6/11/2021   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 06/08/2021 
6/1/2021  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  6/1/2021   
6/1/2021  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)  6/1/2021   
5/28/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  6/3/2021   
5/28/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  6/3/2021   
5/28/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  6/3/2021   
5/28/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  6/3/2021   
5/28/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  6/3/2021   
5/26/2021  RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (002)  5/27/2021   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
5/24/2021  067 - ME: Stipulation And Order - Party (001)  5/24/2021   
5/24/2021  067 - ME: Stipulation And Order - Party (002)  5/24/2021   
5/21/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  5/24/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET MAY 25, 2021 
5/21/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  5/21/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 
5/20/2021  ORD - Order - Party (001)  5/25/2021   
NOTE: TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE 
5/20/2021  ORD - Order - Party (002)  5/25/2021   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE 
5/20/2021  SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)  5/20/2021   
NOTE: SERVED 5/20/2021 
5/20/2021  SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001)  5/21/2021   
NOTE: SERVED 05/20/2021 
5/19/2021  STP - Stipulation - Party (001)  5/19/2021   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE 
5/19/2021  STP - Stipulation - Party (002)  5/19/2021   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE 
5/19/2021  STP - Stipulation - Party (001)  5/20/2021   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE 
5/19/2021  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/27/2021   
5/12/2021  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  5/19/2021   
5/12/2021  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/20/2021   
5/12/2021  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/20/2021   
NOTE: TEMPORARY 
5/12/2021  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  5/24/2021   
5/11/2021  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  5/18/2021   
5/11/2021  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)  5/26/2021   
5/11/2021  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  5/27/2021   
5/5/2021  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  5/6/2021   
5/5/2021  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)  5/6/2021   
4/27/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  4/27/2021   
4/21/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)  4/23/2021   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 04/14/2021 
4/21/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  4/23/2021   
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 04/14/2021 
4/16/2021  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  4/16/2021   
4/16/2021  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)  4/16/2021   
4/15/2021  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  4/16/2021   
NOTE: INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS 
4/15/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  4/16/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO PRESERVE AND PRODUCE 
4/15/2021  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  4/15/2021   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE 
4/15/2021  REQ - Request - Party (002)  4/15/2021   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.1 REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
4/15/2021  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)  4/15/2021   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE 
4/14/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  4/23/2021   
NOTE: ORDER 
4/14/2021  569 - ME: Not Guilty Arraignment/Complex Case Order - Party (001)  4/14/2021   
4/14/2021  569 - ME: Not Guilty Arraignment/Complex Case Order - Party (002)  4/14/2021   
4/14/2021  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)  4/23/2021   
NOTE: ORDER 
4/13/2021  REL - Reply - Party (001)  4/14/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT MARIBEL LOERA’S RESPONSE FOR COURT ORDER COMPELLING DCS TO PROVIDE DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETY INFORMATION AND PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION 
4/8/2021  RES - Response - Party (001)  4/12/2021   
NOTE: DEFENDANT MARIBEL LOERA’S RESPONSE FOR COURT ORDER COMPELLING DCS TO PROVIDE DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETY INFORMATION AND PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION 
4/7/2021  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  4/8/2021   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
4/6/2021  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  4/6/2021   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Victim 
4/6/2021  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)  4/7/2021   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Victim 
4/5/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  4/5/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO FILE PROPOSED ORDER UNDER SEAL 
4/5/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/5/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR COURT ORDER COMPELLING THE DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETY TO PROVIDE DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETY INFORMATION AND PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION 
4/5/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  4/5/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR COURT ORDER COMPELLING THE DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETY TO PROVIDE DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETY INFORMATION AND PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION 
4/5/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/5/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO FILE PROPOSED ORDER UNDER SEAL 
4/5/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/6/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO FILE PROPOSED ORDER UNDER SEAL 
4/2/2021  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  4/5/2021   
NOTE: IA Packet 
4/2/2021  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  4/5/2021   
NOTE: $1,000,000 Cash Only Appearance Bond 
4/2/2021  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)  4/5/2021   
NOTE: IA Packet 
4/2/2021  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)  4/5/2021   
NOTE: $1,000,000 Cash Only Appearance Bond 
4/2/2021  WRS-Warrant Served - Party (002)  4/2/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: 4/1/2021 
4/2/2021  WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)  4/2/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: 4/1/2021 
3/31/2021  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  4/2/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
3/31/2021  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  4/2/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
3/31/2021  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)  4/2/2021   
3/31/2021  ORD - Order - Party (001)  4/2/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: ORDER TO SEAL EXHIBITS 
3/31/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/2/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBITS 
3/31/2021  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (002)  4/2/2021   
3/31/2021  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)  4/2/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
3/31/2021  IND - Indictment - Party (002)  4/2/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
4/2/2021  2:00   Initial Appearance 
4/2/2021  2:00   Initial Appearance 
4/9/2021  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
4/9/2021  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
4/13/2021  8:40   Status Conference 
4/13/2021  8:40   Status Conference 
5/25/2021  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
5/25/2021  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
6/28/2021  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
6/28/2021  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
7/8/2021  8:31   Complex / Capital Case 
7/8/2021  8:31   Complex / Capital Case 
9/8/2021  9:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/8/2021  9:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/18/2021  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
11/18/2021  9:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
12/2/2021  9:00   Trial 
12/2/2021  9:00   Trial