Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Shaker, Nicole      
Charles Rodrick - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Apfel, Seth   Master Calendar  CR2021-001246-001  
Brent Oesterblad - (3)
 
Defendant  M   Brown, Carlos   Master Calendar  CR2021-001246-002  
Sarah Shea - (4)
 
Defendant  F   Rothman, Michael   Master Calendar  CR2021-001246-003  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Charles Rodrick  13-2310A (F2)  FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES  8/11/2011       
Charles Rodrick  13-2312 (F3)  ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE  8/11/2011       
Charles Rodrick  13-2316A1 (F3)  COMPUTER TAMP-ACCESS FOR FRAUD  8/11/2011       
Charles Rodrick  13-2921A1 (M1)  HARASS BY COMMUNICATION  11/10/2012       
Charles Rodrick  13-2921A1 (M1)  HARASS BY COMMUNICATION  6/17/2015       
Brent Oesterblad  13-2310A (F2)  FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES  8/11/2011       
Brent Oesterblad  13-2312 (F3)  ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE  8/11/2011       
Brent Oesterblad  13-2921A1 (M1)  HARASS BY COMMUNICATION  11/10/2012       
Brent Oesterblad  13-2921A1 (M1)  HARASS BY COMMUNICATION  6/17/2015       
Sarah Shea  13-2310A (F2)  FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES  8/11/2011       
Sarah Shea  13-2312 (F3)  ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE  8/11/2011       
Sarah Shea  13-2921A1 (M1)  HARASS BY COMMUNICATION  11/10/2012       
Sarah Shea  13-2921A1 (M1)  HARASS BY COMMUNICATION  6/17/2015       
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/14/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  10/14/2021   
10/14/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)  10/14/2021   
10/14/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  10/14/2021   
10/12/2021  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)  10/12/2021   
10/8/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  10/12/2021   
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 
10/8/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  10/12/2021   
NOTE: STATE'S NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR REMAND AND JOINT STIPULATION TO EXCEED TIME  
10/8/2021  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  10/11/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR REMAND AND JOINT STIPULATION TO EXCEED TIME RESTRICTIONS FOR REMAND 
10/8/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  10/11/2021   
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE  
10/8/2021  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (003)  10/11/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR REMAND AND JOINT STIPULATION TO EXCEED TIME RESTRICTIONS FOR REMAND 
10/8/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)  10/11/2021   
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE  
10/1/2021  REQ - Request - Party (003)  10/6/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS 
9/30/2021  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  9/30/2021   
9/30/2021  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)  9/30/2021   
9/30/2021  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)  9/30/2021   
9/23/2021  REQ - Request - Party (001)  9/24/2021   
NOTE: (001) STATES REQUEST TO JOIN DATES FOR RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS RULE 12_9 MOTIONS TO REMAND 
9/23/2021  REQ - Request - Party (002)  9/27/2021   
NOTE: (002) STATES REQUEST TO JOIN DATES FOR RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS RULE 12_9 MOTIONS TO REMAND 
9/23/2021  REQ - Request - Party (003)  9/27/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST TO JOIN DATES FOR RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ RULE 12.9 MOTIONS TO REMAND 
9/22/2021  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)  9/23/2021   
NOTE: Motion to Join Motion to Dismiss 
9/21/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (003)  9/23/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO JOIN AND SUPPLEMENT MEMORANDUM 
9/20/2021  WAV - Waiver - Party (001)  9/22/2021   
NOTE: OF EXTRADITION 
9/20/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/20/2021   
9/16/2021  REL - Reply - Party (001)  9/21/2021   
NOTE: Reply to State Response to Request for Travel 
9/16/2021  RES - Response - Party (001)  9/21/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S REQUEST TO TRAVEL 
9/9/2021  REQ - Request - Party (001)  9/14/2021   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR TRAVEL 
8/31/2021  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)  8/31/2021   
8/31/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  8/31/2021   
8/31/2021  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (003)  8/31/2021   
8/31/2021  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  8/31/2021   
8/31/2021  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/31/2021   
8/30/2021  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)  8/31/2021   
NOTE: AAMENDED $30,000 Secured Appearance Bond 
8/30/2021  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)  8/30/2021   
8/30/2021  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  8/30/2021   
8/24/2021  REL - Reply - Party (001)  8/26/2021   
NOTE: REPLY TO STATE RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF RELEASE CONDITIONS 
8/24/2021  REQ - Request - Party (002)  8/26/2021   
NOTE: STATE'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S RULE 12.9 MOTION TO REMAND 
8/24/2021  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/26/2021   
NOTE: Joint Complex Case Management Plan 
8/24/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  8/24/2021   
8/23/2021  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (003)  8/25/2021   
NOTE: STATE'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S RULE 12.9 MOTION TO REMAND 
8/23/2021  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  8/26/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS 
8/23/2021  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)  8/26/2021   
NOTE: STATE'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 
8/17/2021  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  8/19/2021   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss 
8/17/2021  REQ - Request - Party (001)  8/18/2021   
NOTE: Request to exceed page length 
8/17/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  8/18/2021   
NOTE: Motion to Join and Supplement Memorandum 
8/17/2021  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  8/18/2021   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss 
8/16/2021  MEM - Memorandum - Party (003)  8/18/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO JOIN AND SUPPLEMENT MEMORANDUM 
8/13/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  8/13/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO JOIN AND SUPPLEMENT MEMORANDUM 
8/12/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/16/2021   
NOTE: MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF RELEASE CONDITIONS 
8/12/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/16/2021   
NOTE: CORRECTED MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF RELEASE CONDITIONS 
8/12/2021  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  8/12/2021   
8/9/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  8/9/2021   
8/9/2021  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  8/10/2021   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
8/6/2021  RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)  8/10/2021   
NOTE: States Request for Additional Time to Respond to Defendants Rule 12.9 Motion to Remand 
8/4/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/6/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO REMAND FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE 
8/3/2021  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  8/5/2021   
NOTE: Motion and Order to Withdraw as Attorney of Record  
8/3/2021  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)  8/6/2021   
NOTE: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL 
8/2/2021  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  8/5/2021   
NOTE: Notice of filing Exhibits 14-16, in support of Motion To Remand For Redetermination Of Probable Cause. 
8/2/2021  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  8/5/2021   
NOTE: Notice of filing Exhibits 17-26, in support of Motion To Remand For Redetermination Of Probable Cause. 
8/2/2021  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  8/5/2021   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING 
7/30/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/2/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO REMAND FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE 
7/7/2021  172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)  7/7/2021   
7/7/2021  172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (002)  7/7/2021   
7/7/2021  172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (003)  7/7/2021   
6/30/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  6/30/2021   
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 
6/30/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)  7/1/2021   
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE  
6/30/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  7/1/2021   
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 
6/29/2021  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  6/29/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
6/29/2021  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (003)  6/30/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
6/29/2021  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)  6/30/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
6/22/2021  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (003)  6/22/2021   
6/21/2021  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (003)  6/22/2021   
NOTE: Motion to withdraw as counsel of record 
6/11/2021  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (003)  6/11/2021   
6/11/2021  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  6/11/2021   
6/11/2021  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  6/11/2021   
6/8/2021  STA - Statement - Party (002)  6/9/2021   
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT 
6/8/2021  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)  6/8/2021   
6/8/2021  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)  6/8/2021   
6/8/2021  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  6/8/2021   
6/7/2021  NOT - Notice - Party (003)  6/8/2021   
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES 
6/7/2021  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (003)  6/7/2021   
6/4/2021  STA - Statement - Party (001)  6/7/2021   
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT  
6/3/2021  ORD - Order - Party (003)  6/14/2021   
NOTE: GRANTING THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
6/3/2021  ORD - Order - Party (002)  6/14/2021   
NOTE: GRANTING THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXENSOIN OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
6/3/2021  ORD - Order - Party (001)  6/14/2021   
NOTE: GRANTING THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
6/3/2021  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  6/3/2021   
NOTE: Notice of Defenses 
6/2/2021  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (003)  6/3/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND HAVE ALTERNATE COUNSEL APPOINTED 
5/26/2021  RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)  5/26/2021   
NOTE: REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO CHALLENGE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS  
5/25/2021  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003)  5/26/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO CHALLENGE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
5/25/2021  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)  5/26/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND RULE 12.9 DEADLINE 
5/25/2021  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  6/9/2021   
5/20/2021  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (003)  5/20/2021   
5/20/2021  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)  5/20/2021   
5/20/2021  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (002)  5/20/2021   
5/19/2021  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (002)  5/20/2021   
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw 
5/19/2021  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/25/2021   
5/19/2021  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  5/25/2021   
5/19/2021  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/25/2021   
5/19/2021  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)  5/25/2021   
5/18/2021  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)  5/21/2021   
5/18/2021  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)  5/21/2021   
5/18/2021  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  5/21/2021   
5/18/2021  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)  5/24/2021   
5/18/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/19/2021   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO DESIGNATE CASE AS A COMPLEX CASE 
5/18/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (003)  5/19/2021   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO DESIGNATE CASE AS A COMPLEX CASE 
5/18/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  5/19/2021   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO DESIGNATE CASE AS A COMPLEX CASE 
5/13/2021  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)  5/19/2021   
5/13/2021  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  5/20/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
5/13/2021  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  5/20/2021   
NOTE: TEMPORARY 
5/10/2021  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES 
5/10/2021  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS 
5/10/2021  REQ - Request - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1 (a), (b), (d), (e) 
5/3/2021  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  5/5/2021   
5/3/2021  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)  5/5/2021   
5/3/2021  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (003)  5/5/2021   
4/29/2021  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (003)  4/29/2021   
4/29/2021  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)  4/29/2021   
4/27/2021  ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (002)  4/27/2021   
NOTE: Release Order 
4/27/2021  ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (003)  4/27/2021   
NOTE: Release Order 
4/27/2021  FIN - Financial Information - Party (003)  4/27/2021   
NOTE: IA SUMMONS FINANCIAL INFORMATION 
4/27/2021  FIN - Financial Information - Party (002)  4/27/2021   
NOTE: IA SUMMONS FINANCIAL INFORMATION 
4/15/2021  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  4/15/2021   
4/12/2021  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  4/13/2021   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
4/12/2021  BON - Bond - Party (001)  4/14/2021   
NOTE: SURETY $30,000 UNIVERSAL FIRE & CASUALTY 
4/9/2021  WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)  4/9/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: 4/6/2021 
4/9/2021  SUM - Summons - Party (002)  4/9/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: 4/6/2021 
4/9/2021  SUM - Summons - Party (003)  4/9/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: 4/6/2021 
4/9/2021  IND - Indictment - Party (002)  4/22/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
4/7/2021  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  4/12/2021   
NOTE: $30,000 Secured Appearance Bond 
4/7/2021  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  4/12/2021   
NOTE: IA Packet 
4/7/2021  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  4/12/2021   
NOTE: $30,000 Secured Appearance Bond 
3/29/2021  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  4/9/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
3/29/2021  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)  4/9/2021   
3/29/2021  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)  4/9/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
3/29/2021  600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (002)  4/9/2021   
3/29/2021  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (003)  4/9/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
3/29/2021  600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (003)  4/9/2021   
3/29/2021  IND - Indictment - Party (003)  4/9/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
3/29/2021  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  4/9/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
4/7/2021  2:00   Initial Appearance 
4/14/2021  9:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
4/27/2021  9:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
4/27/2021  9:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
6/8/2021  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
6/8/2021  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
6/8/2021  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
7/8/2021  8:00   Complex / Capital Case 
7/8/2021  8:00   Complex / Capital Case 
7/8/2021  8:00   Complex / Capital Case 
8/26/2021  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/30/2021  8:00   Complex / Capital Case 
8/30/2021  8:00   Complex / Capital Case 
8/30/2021  8:00   Complex / Capital Case 
9/9/2021  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/9/2021  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/9/2021  9:00   Trial 
9/23/2021  9:00   Trial 
9/23/2021  9:00   Trial 
10/13/2021  8:00   Complex / Capital Case 
10/13/2021  8:00   Complex / Capital Case 
10/13/2021  8:00   Complex / Capital Case 
11/16/2021  8:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
11/16/2021  8:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
11/16/2021  8:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
11/30/2021  9:00   Trial 
11/30/2021  9:00   Trial 
11/30/2021  9:00   Trial 
12/14/2021  8:00   Complex / Capital Case 
12/14/2021  8:00   Complex / Capital Case 
12/14/2021  8:00   Complex / Capital Case