« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Serassio, Serena
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Barringtina T Mathis - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Garcia, Herbert
Judge
Green
Case #
CR2021-000840-002
Party Name
Adrian Manuel Favela - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Atkins, W
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2021-000840-001
Party Name
B Witness - (4)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2021-000840-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Barringtina T Mathis 
Crime Date
4/8/2018
Date
4/19/2021
Description
FORGERY-W/WRITTEN INSTRUMENT
ARSCode
13-2002A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Barringtina T Mathis 
Crime Date
4/8/2018
Date
4/19/2021
Description
TAMP W/PHY EVID-MAKE FALSE
ARSCode
13-2809A2 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Adrian Manuel Favela 
Crime Date
4/8/2018
Date
4/19/2021
Description
FAIL TO STAY/WITH DEATH/INJURY
ARSCode
28-661B (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Adrian Manuel Favela 
Crime Date
4/8/2018
Date
12/2/2021
Description
FAIL TO STAY/WITH DEATH/INJURY
ARSCode
28-661B (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Barringtina T Mathis 
Crime Date
4/8/2018
Date
4/8/2022
Description
TAMP W/PHY EVID-MAKE FALSE
ARSCode
13-2809A2 (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Barringtina T Mathis 
Crime Date
4/8/2018
Date
4/8/2022
Description
FORGERY-W/WRITTEN INSTRUMENT
ARSCode
13-2002A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2024
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2024
Description
ODM - Order of Discharge from Probation - Misdemeanor Designation - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/19/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
11/17/2023
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S RESTITUTION HEARING SUPPLEMENTAL MEMEORANDUM
Filing Date
9/19/2023
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
State’s Restitution Hearing Supplemental Memorandum
Filing Date
9/7/2023
Description
601 - ME: Restitution Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2023
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL / HEARING
Filing Date
8/8/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2023
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ALLOW DEFENDANT TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY
Filing Date
7/26/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Contested Restitution Hearing with Witnesses and Permission for Victims to Appear Virtually
Filing Date
6/15/2023
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2023
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: RESTITUTION DEADLINE EXTENSION
Filing Date
3/20/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF VICTIMS’ RESTITUTION CLAIM, RELEVANT LAW REGARDING LEAVING SCENE RESTITUTION & MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF RESTITUTION DEADLINE
Filing Date
3/20/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF VICTIMS’ RESTITUTION CLAIM, RELEVANT LAW REGARDING LEAVING SCENE RESTITUTION & MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF RESTITUTION DEADLINE
Filing Date
10/21/2022
Description
118 - ME: Modifica/Terms Probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2022
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MODIFY TERMS OR REGULATIONS OF PROBATION
Filing Date
9/22/2022
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Intraoffice Change of Counsel
Filing Date
5/31/2022
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement Jail
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR IN SENTENCING.
Filing Date
5/18/2022
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/17/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Correct Clerical Error in Sentence
Filing Date
5/11/2022
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
LET - Letter - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement Jail
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/6/2022
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
5/5/2022
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
4/13/2022
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2022
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2022
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2022
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLEA AGREEMENT
Filing Date
4/8/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Objection to Non-Victim Participation in Settlement Conference
Filing Date
4/4/2022
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Release of Deposit/$7200 PAID TO BIANCA CRAWFORD
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
1/27/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2022
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL
Filing Date
1/21/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
12/21/2021
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2021
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2021
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLEA AGREEMENT
Filing Date
12/6/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
12/1/2021
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION IN LIMINE
Filing Date
11/9/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
023 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
11/9/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
023 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
11/8/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION IN LIMINE
Filing Date
10/29/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
10/29/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
10/27/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL
Filing Date
10/26/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Final Trial Management Conference and Trial
Filing Date
10/14/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION
Filing Date
10/11/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Exceed Page Limit
Filing Date
10/11/2021
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION IN LIMINE
Filing Date
10/5/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Exceed Page Limit
Filing Date
10/5/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Sever Trial From Codefendant
Filing Date
8/26/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONSENT TO PARTICIPATE BY CERTIFIED LIMITED PRACTICE STUDENT
Filing Date
8/3/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINDER OF CODEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
7/29/2021
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL
Filing Date
7/28/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL
Filing Date
7/26/2021
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Second Request for Extension of Time to Challenge the Grand Jury Proceedings
Filing Date
7/16/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2021
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2021
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
7/7/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
7/6/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
7/2/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
7/1/2021
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/30/2021
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
6/30/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT INTERPRETER
Filing Date
6/30/2021
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/30/2021
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 or A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
6/30/2021
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
6/17/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Consent to Appearance by Certified Limited Practice Student
Filing Date
6/16/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2021
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2021
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/11/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2021
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
6/9/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
6/8/2021
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Of Defense Witnesses And Exhibits And Request For Rebuttal Witnesses
Filing Date
6/8/2021
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(a) ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(c)
Filing Date
6/2/2021
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses
Filing Date
6/2/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
5/24/2021
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
$7,200
Filing Date
5/18/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2021
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
$7,200 Secured Appearance Bond
Filing Date
5/13/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2021
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2021
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(a) and (b) AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1 (c) and (d)
Filing Date
4/28/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
4/27/2021
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2021
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/27/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/26/2021
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2021
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/28/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2021
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
4/23/2021
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
$500,000 Secured Appearance Bond
Filing Date
4/21/2021
Description
098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion For Modification Of Release Conditions
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2021
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2021
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/8/2021
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
4/8/2021
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
4/13/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/15/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/22/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/22/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/23/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/23/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/23/2021
Time
9:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/26/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/26/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
5/3/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/6/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
5/17/2021
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/9/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
6/9/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
7/8/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
7/8/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
8/5/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/2/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/2/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/16/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/16/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/2/2021
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/2/2021
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/16/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/16/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/30/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
11/30/2021
Time
16:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
12/2/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
12/2/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
12/13/2021
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/6/2022
Time
9:50
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/18/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/25/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/1/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
2/10/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/25/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
4/8/2022
Time
14:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
4/8/2022
Time
16:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
4/26/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/9/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
5/10/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/18/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/12/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Restitution Hearing
Date
8/15/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Restitution Hearing
Date
9/1/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Restitution Hearing