« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Taylor, Jonathan
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Paul Bailey Nelson - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Shell, Charles
Judge
Adib
Case #
CR2020-142110-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Paul Bailey Nelson 
Crime Date
11/6/2020
Date
3/19/2021
Description
DISORDERLY CONDUCT
ARSCode
13-2904 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2024
Description
OSJ - Order re: Setting Aside Judgment of Guilt - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING
Filing Date
5/31/2024
Description
CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Criminal Financial Information Worksheet
Filing Date
5/29/2024
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR CERTIFICATE OF SECOND CHANCE (WHEN PREVIOUS SET ASIDE HAS BEEN GRANTED)
Filing Date
6/19/2022
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
5/15/2022
Description
PFC - Petition for Earned Time Credit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
4/29/2021
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2021
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
4/21/2021
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
4/21/2021
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
4/21/2021
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sentencing Memorandum
Filing Date
3/25/2021
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2021
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY HEARING WITH PLEA AGREEMENT
Filing Date
3/22/2021
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Information
Filing Date
3/19/2021
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
3/17/2021
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2021
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY HEARING WITH PLEA AGREEMENT
Filing Date
3/15/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
2/16/2021
Description
584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2021
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue
Filing Date
1/20/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2021
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2020
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Modify Release Conditions
Filing Date
11/19/2020
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
11/10/2020
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2020
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2020
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Filing Date
11/10/2020
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
11/10/2020
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/7/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
11/23/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/25/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
1/11/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/14/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
1/19/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/10/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/16/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
3/11/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/15/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
3/19/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/19/2021
Time
13:31
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/23/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/21/2021
Time
9:30
Event
Sentencing