Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Green, Ryan | ||
Jacquelyn Alexiz Alcaraz - (2) |
Defendant | F | Dupont, Christopher | Master Calendar | CR2020-139581-014 |
Britney Erica Austin - (3) |
Defendant | F | Gattone, Paul | Master Calendar | CR2020-139581-009 |
Kalixta Noemi Villasaez - (4) |
Defendant | F | Gattone, Paul | Master Calendar | CR2020-139581-008 |
A.R.S. 13-4051 Sealed - (5) |
Defendant | M | Gipson-Mc Lean, Katie | Master Calendar | CR2020-139581-005 |
Suvarna Ratnam - (6) |
Defendant | F | Countryman, Kenneth | Master Calendar | CR2020-139581-002 |
Riley Morgan Behrens - (7) |
Defendant | M | Lorenz, Vernon | Master Calendar | CR2020-139581-006 |
Brenda Guadalupe Diaz - (8) |
Defendant | F | Burow, Matthew | Master Calendar | CR2020-139581-003 |
Jessica Gibson - (9) |
Defendant | F | Marrufo, Candy | Master Calendar | CR2020-139581-010 |
Nathan Jon Aderholdt - (10) |
Defendant | M | Kielsky, Michael | Master Calendar | CR2020-139581-004 |
Nathaniel Benjamin Llanes - (11) |
Defendant | M | Peters, Shannon | Master Calendar | CR2020-139581-001 |
Dominic Berlage Bonelli - (12) |
Defendant | M | Crowley, Kevin | Master Calendar | CR2020-139581-012 |
Kaleb Isaiah Martin - (13) |
Defendant | N/A | Brody, Kathleen | Master Calendar | CR2020-139581-013 |
Marysa E Leyva - (14) |
Defendant | F | Blackwell, Jocquese | Master Calendar | CR2020-139581-011 |
Christopher Charles Roberson - (15) |
Defendant | M | Gattone, Paul | Master Calendar | CR2020-139581-007 |
Amy Beth Kaper - (16) |
Defendant | F | Peters, Shannon | Master Calendar | CR2020-139581-015 |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Jacquelyn Alexiz Alcaraz | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 10/28/2020 |
Britney Erica Austin | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 10/28/2020 |
Kalixta Noemi Villasaez | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 10/28/2020 |
A.R.S. 13-4051 Sealed | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 10/20/2020 |
Suvarna Ratnam | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 10/28/2020 |
Riley Morgan Behrens | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 10/28/2020 |
Brenda Guadalupe Diaz | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 10/28/2020 |
Jessica Gibson | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 10/28/2020 |
Nathan Jon Aderholdt | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 10/28/2020 |
Nathaniel Benjamin Llanes | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 10/28/2020 |
Dominic Berlage Bonelli | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 10/28/2020 |
Kaleb Isaiah Martin | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 10/28/2020 |
Marysa E Leyva | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 10/28/2020 |
Christopher Charles Roberson | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 10/28/2020 |
Nathaniel Benjamin Llanes | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Nathaniel Benjamin Llanes | 13-2906A1 (F3) | OBST HWY/PUB LIC THOROUGHFARE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Nathaniel Benjamin Llanes | 13-2902A2 (M1) | UNLAW ASSEMBLY-REFUSE DISPERSE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Nathaniel Benjamin Llanes | 13-1204A2 (F2) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Nathaniel Benjamin Llanes | 13-2321B (F3) | STREET GANG-ASSIST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Suvarna Ratnam | 13-2903A (F4) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Suvarna Ratnam | 13-2906A1 (M1) | OBST HWY/PUB LIC THOROUGHFARE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Suvarna Ratnam | 13-2902A2 (M1) | UNLAW ASSEMBLY-REFUSE DISPERSE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Suvarna Ratnam | 13-1204A2 (F2) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Suvarna Ratnam | 13-2321B (F3) | STREET GANG-ASSIST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Brenda Guadalupe Diaz | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Brenda Guadalupe Diaz | 13-2906A1 (M1) | OBST HWY/PUB LIC THOROUGHFARE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Brenda Guadalupe Diaz | 13-2902A2 (M1) | UNLAW ASSEMBLY-REFUSE DISPERSE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Brenda Guadalupe Diaz | 13-1204A2 (F2) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Brenda Guadalupe Diaz | 13-2321B (F3) | STREET GANG-ASSIST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Nathan Jon Aderholdt | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Nathan Jon Aderholdt | 13-2906A1 (M1) | OBST HWY/PUB LIC THOROUGHFARE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Nathan Jon Aderholdt | 13-2902A2 (M1) | UNLAW ASSEMBLY-REFUSE DISPERSE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Nathan Jon Aderholdt | 13-1204A2 (F2) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Nathan Jon Aderholdt | 13-2321B (F3) | STREET GANG-ASSIST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Nathan Jon Aderholdt | 13-2508A1 (F6) | RESIST ARREST-PHYSICAL FORCE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
A.R.S. 13-4051 Sealed | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
A.R.S. 13-4051 Sealed | 13-2906A1 (M1) | OBST HWY/PUB LIC THOROUGHFARE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
A.R.S. 13-4051 Sealed | 13-2902A2 (M1) | UNLAW ASSEMBLY-REFUSE DISPERSE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
A.R.S. 13-4051 Sealed | 13-1204A2 (F2) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
A.R.S. 13-4051 Sealed | 13-2321B (F3) | STREET GANG-ASSIST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Riley Morgan Behrens | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Riley Morgan Behrens | 13-2906A1 (M1) | OBST HWY/PUB LIC THOROUGHFARE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Riley Morgan Behrens | 13-2902A2 (M1) | UNLAW ASSEMBLY-REFUSE DISPERSE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Riley Morgan Behrens | 13-1204A2 (F2) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Riley Morgan Behrens | 13-2321B (F3) | STREET GANG-ASSIST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Christopher Charles Roberson | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Christopher Charles Roberson | 13-2906A1 (M1) | OBST HWY/PUB LIC THOROUGHFARE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Christopher Charles Roberson | 13-2902A2 (M1) | UNLAW ASSEMBLY-REFUSE DISPERSE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Christopher Charles Roberson | 13-1204A2 (F2) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Christopher Charles Roberson | 13-2321B (F3) | STREET GANG-ASSIST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Kalixta Noemi Villasaez | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Kalixta Noemi Villasaez | 13-2906A1 (M1) | OBST HWY/PUB LIC THOROUGHFARE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Kalixta Noemi Villasaez | 13-2902A2 (M1) | UNLAW ASSEMBLY-REFUSE DISPERSE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Kalixta Noemi Villasaez | 13-1204A2 (F2) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Kalixta Noemi Villasaez | 13-2321B (F3) | STREET GANG-ASSIST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Britney Erica Austin | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Britney Erica Austin | 13-2906A1 (M1) | OBST HWY/PUB LIC THOROUGHFARE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Britney Erica Austin | 13-1204A2 (F2) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Britney Erica Austin | 13-2321B (F3) | STREET GANG-ASSIST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Britney Erica Austin | 13-2902A2 (M1) | UNLAW ASSEMBLY-REFUSE DISPERSE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Jessica Gibson | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Jessica Gibson | 13-2906A1 (M1) | OBST HWY/PUB LIC THOROUGHFARE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Jessica Gibson | 13-2902A2 (M1) | UNLAW ASSEMBLY-REFUSE DISPERSE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Jessica Gibson | 13-1204A2 (F2) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Jessica Gibson | 13-2321B (F3) | STREET GANG-ASSIST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Marysa E Leyva | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Marysa E Leyva | 13-2906A1 (M1) | OBST HWY/PUB LIC THOROUGHFARE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Marysa E Leyva | 13-2902A2 (M1) | UNLAW ASSEMBLY-REFUSE DISPERSE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Marysa E Leyva | 13-1204A2 (F2) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Marysa E Leyva | 13-2321B (F3) | STREET GANG-ASSIST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Dominic Berlage Bonelli | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 6/11/2021 |
Dominic Berlage Bonelli | 13-2906A1 (M1) | OBST HWY/PUB LIC THOROUGHFARE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 6/11/2021 |
Dominic Berlage Bonelli | 13-2902A2 (M1) | UNLAW ASSEMBLY-REFUSE DISPERSE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 6/11/2021 |
Dominic Berlage Bonelli | 13-1204A2 (F2) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 6/11/2021 |
Dominic Berlage Bonelli | 13-2321B (F3) | STREET GANG-ASSIST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 6/11/2021 |
Kaleb Isaiah Martin | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Kaleb Isaiah Martin | 13-2906A1 (M1) | OBST HWY/PUB LIC THOROUGHFARE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Kaleb Isaiah Martin | 13-2902A2 (M1) | UNLAW ASSEMBLY-REFUSE DISPERSE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Kaleb Isaiah Martin | 13-1204A2 (F2) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Kaleb Isaiah Martin | 13-2321B (F3) | STREET GANG-ASSIST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Jacquelyn Alexiz Alcaraz | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Jacquelyn Alexiz Alcaraz | 13-2906A1 (M1) | OBST HWY/PUB LIC THOROUGHFARE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Jacquelyn Alexiz Alcaraz | 13-2902A2 (M1) | UNLAW ASSEMBLY-REFUSE DISPERSE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Jacquelyn Alexiz Alcaraz | 13-1204A2 (F2) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Jacquelyn Alexiz Alcaraz | 13-2321B (F3) | STREET GANG-ASSIST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Amy Beth Kaper | 13-2903A (F5) | RIOT | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Amy Beth Kaper | 13-2906A1 (M1) | OBST HWY/PUB LIC THOROUGHFARE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Amy Beth Kaper | 13-2902A2 (M1) | UNLAW ASSEMBLY-REFUSE DISPERSE | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Amy Beth Kaper | 13-1204A2 (F2) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Amy Beth Kaper | 13-2321B (F3) | STREET GANG-ASSIST | 10/17/2020 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/18/2021 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
11/15/2022 | DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet - Party (002) | 11/18/2022 | |
10/18/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005) | 10/18/2022 | |
10/17/2022 | ORD - Order - Party (005) | 10/26/2022 | |
NOTE: RE Motion to Unseal for Limited Purpose | |||
10/6/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (005) | 10/10/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Unseal for Limited Purpose | |||
11/17/2021 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005) | 11/22/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO UNSEAL FOR LIMITED PURPOSES | |||
11/17/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005) | 11/22/2021 | |
11/17/2021 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (005) | 11/22/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO UNSEAL FOR LIMITED PURPOSE- ORDER | |||
7/2/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003) | 7/2/2021 | |
7/1/2021 | LET - Letter - Party (003) | 7/6/2021 | |
NOTE: LETTER FROM THE STATE BAR OF ARIZONA DATED 04/16/2021 | |||
7/1/2021 | LET - Letter - Party (003) | 7/6/2021 | |
NOTE: LETTER FROM KATIE GIPSON MCLEAN DATED 03/31/2021 | |||
6/30/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (003) | 7/6/2021 | |
NOTE: AMENDED / TO UNSEAL CASE AND REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
6/28/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (003) | 6/30/2021 | |
NOTE: TO UNSEAL CASE AND PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
6/14/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (006) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (009) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (004) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (008) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (010) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (011) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (012) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (013) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (014) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (015) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (010) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (006) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (009) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (012) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (011) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (014) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (013) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (015) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (002) | 6/15/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (003) | 6/15/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (004) | 6/15/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (006) | 6/15/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (007) | 6/15/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (008) | 6/15/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (009) | 6/15/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (010) | 6/15/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (011) | 6/15/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (012) | 6/15/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (013) | 6/15/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (014) | 6/15/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (015) | 6/15/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001) | 6/18/2021 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/11/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (002) | 6/18/2021 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/11/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (003) | 6/18/2021 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/11/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (004) | 6/18/2021 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/11/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (006) | 6/18/2021 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/11/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (007) | 6/18/2021 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/11/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (008) | 6/18/2021 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/11/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (009) | 6/18/2021 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/11/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (010) | 6/18/2021 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/11/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (011) | 6/18/2021 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/11/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (012) | 6/18/2021 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/11/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (013) | 6/18/2021 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/11/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (014) | 6/18/2021 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/11/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (015) | 6/18/2021 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/11/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (009) | 6/11/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007) | 6/11/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008) | 6/11/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 6/11/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 6/11/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003) | 6/11/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (009) | 6/11/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (007) | 6/11/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (008) | 6/11/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (006) | 6/11/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004) | 6/11/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005) | 6/11/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (010) | 6/11/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (011) | 6/11/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (012) | 6/11/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (013) | 6/11/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (014) | 6/11/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (015) | 6/11/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001) | 6/14/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
6/11/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (010) | 6/14/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
6/11/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (004) | 6/14/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
6/11/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (009) | 6/14/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
6/11/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (003) | 6/14/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
6/11/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party () | 6/14/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
6/11/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (012) | 6/14/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
6/11/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (013) | 6/14/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
6/11/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (007) | 6/14/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
6/11/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002) | 6/14/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
6/11/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (011) | 6/14/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
6/11/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (006) | 6/14/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
6/11/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (004) | 6/14/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
6/11/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (015) | 6/14/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
6/10/2021 | REL - Reply - Party (003) | 6/11/2021 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE (DEFENDANT DIAZ) | |||
6/9/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (013) | 6/10/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO DISQUALIFY THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY’S OFFICE | |||
6/8/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (004) | 6/9/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Disqualify Maricopa County Attorneys Office | |||
6/8/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (014) | 6/9/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Disqualify Maricopa Attorneys Office | |||
6/7/2021 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (009) | 6/8/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO RECONSIDER/MOTION TO JOIN MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/6/2021 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (008) | 6/8/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO RECONSIDER/ MOTION TO JOIN MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/6/2021 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (007) | 6/8/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO RECONSIDER/MOTION TO JOIN MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/4/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 6/4/2021 | |
6/4/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004) | 6/4/2021 | |
6/4/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (006) | 6/4/2021 | |
6/4/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003) | 6/4/2021 | |
6/4/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (012) | 6/4/2021 | |
6/4/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (010) | 6/4/2021 | |
6/4/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (013) | 6/4/2021 | |
6/4/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (014) | 6/4/2021 | |
6/4/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (015) | 6/4/2021 | |
6/1/2021 | 906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (003) | 6/1/2021 | |
6/1/2021 | RES - Response - Party (003) | 6/3/2021 | |
NOTE: Defendant’s Response to State’s Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice | |||
5/18/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002) | 5/18/2021 | |
5/18/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003) | 5/18/2021 | |
5/18/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (004) | 5/18/2021 | |
5/18/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (006) | 5/18/2021 | |
5/18/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (010) | 5/18/2021 | |
5/18/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (011) | 5/18/2021 | |
5/18/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (012) | 5/18/2021 | |
5/18/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (013) | 5/18/2021 | |
5/18/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (014) | 5/18/2021 | |
5/18/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 5/18/2021 | |
5/18/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (005) | 5/18/2021 | |
5/18/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (015) | 5/18/2021 | |
5/13/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 5/18/2021 | |
NOTE: DOCUMENTS BATES STAMPED RB 001 THROUGH 1284 DISCLOSED TO DEFENSE COUNSEL UNDER THIS CAUSE NUMBER SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATED TO ANYONE OTHER THAN THE ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANTS AND MEMBERS OF THEIR DEFENSE TEAMS | |||
5/13/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (015) | 5/18/2021 | |
NOTE: DOCUMENTS BATES STAMPED RB 001 THROUGH 1284 DISCLOSED TO DEFENSE COUNSEL UNDER THIS CAUSE NUMBER SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATED TO ANYONE OTHER THAN THE ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANTS AND MEMBERS OF THEIR DEFENSE TEAMS | |||
5/13/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (014) | 5/18/2021 | |
NOTE: DOCUMENTS BATES STAMPED RB 001 THROUGH 1284 DISCLOSED TO DEFENSE COUNSEL UNDER THIS CAUSE NUMBER SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATED TO ANYONE OTHER THAN THE ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANTS AND MEMBERS OF THEIR DEFENSE TEAMS | |||
5/13/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (013) | 5/18/2021 | |
NOTE: DOCUMENTS BATES STAMPED RB 001 THROUGH 1284 DISCLOSED TO DEFENSE COUNSEL UNDER THIS CAUSE NUMBER SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATED TO ANYONE OTHER THAN THE ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANTS AND MEMBERS OF THEIR DEFENSE TEAMS | |||
5/13/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (012) | 5/18/2021 | |
5/13/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (011) | 5/18/2021 | |
NOTE: DOCUMENTS BATES STAMPED RB 001 THROUGH 1284 DISCLOSED TO DEFENSE COUNSEL UNDER THIS CAUSE NUMBER SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATED TO ANYONE OTHER THAN THE ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANTS AND MEMBERS OF THEIR DEFENSE TEAMS | |||
5/13/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (010) | 5/18/2021 | |
NOTE: DOCUMENTS BATES STAMPED RB 001 THROUGH 1284 DISCLOSED TO DEFENSE COUNSEL UNDER THIS CAUSE NUMBER SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATED TO ANYONE OTHER THAN THE ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANTS AND MEMBERS OF THEIR DEFENSE TEAMS | |||
5/13/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (004) | 5/18/2021 | |
NOTE: DOCUMENTS BATES STAMPED RB 001 THROUGH 1284 DISCLOSED TO DEFENSE COUNSEL UNDER THIS CAUSE NUMBER SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATED TO ANYONE OTHER THAN THE ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANTS AND MEMBERS OF THEIR DEFENSE TEAMS | |||
5/13/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (006) | 5/18/2021 | |
NOTE: DOCUMENTS BATES STAMPED RB 001 THROUGH 1284 DISCLOSED TO DEFENSE COUNSEL UNDER THIS CAUSE NUMBER SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATED TO ANYONE OTHER THAN THE ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANTS AND MEMBERS OF THEIR DEFENSE TEAMS | |||
5/13/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (003) | 5/18/2021 | |
NOTE: DOCUMENTS BATES STAMPED RB 001 THROUGH 1284 DISCLOSED TO DEFENSE COUNSEL UNDER THIS CAUSE NUMBER SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATED TO ANYONE OTHER THAN THE ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANTS AND MEMBERS OF THEIR DEFENSE TEAMS | |||
5/13/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (002) | 5/18/2021 | |
NOTE: DOCUMENTS BATES STAMPED RB 001 THROUGH 1284 DISCLOSED TO DEFENSE COUNSEL UNDER THIS CAUSE NUMBER SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATED TO ANYONE OTHER THAN THE ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANTS AND MEMBERS OF THEIR DEFENSE TEAMS | |||
5/13/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (005) | 5/18/2021 | |
NOTE: DOCUMENTS BATES RB 001 THROUGH 1284 DISCLOSED TO DEFENSE COUNSEL UNDER THIS CAUSE NUMBER SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATED TO ANYONE OTHER THAN THE ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANTS AND MEMBERS OF THEIR DEFENSE TEAMS | |||
5/10/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (010) | 5/10/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF CODEFENDANT MATERIALS | |||
5/10/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (015) | 5/10/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF CODEFENDANT MATERIALS | |||
5/10/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (003) | 5/10/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF CODEFENDANT MATERIALS | |||
5/10/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (004) | 5/10/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF CODEFENDANT MATERIALS | |||
5/10/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (013) | 5/10/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF CODEFENDANT MATERIALS | |||
5/10/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 5/10/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF CODEFENDANT MATERIALS | |||
5/10/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (002) | 5/10/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF CODEFENDANT MATERIALS | |||
5/10/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (006) | 5/11/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF CODEFENDANT MATERIALS | |||
5/10/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (011) | 5/11/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF CODEFENDANT MATERIALS | |||
5/10/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (012) | 5/11/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF CODEFENDANT MATERIALS | |||
5/10/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (005) | 5/11/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF CODEFENDANT MATERIALS | |||
5/10/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (014) | 5/11/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF CODEFENDANT MATERIALS | |||
5/6/2021 | 959 - ME: Clearance of Record - 13-4051 - Party (005) | 5/6/2021 | |
5/5/2021 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 5/6/2021 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE (DEFENDANTS KAPER AND LLANES) | |||
5/5/2021 | REL - Reply - Party (015) | 5/6/2021 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE (DEFENDANTS KAPER AND LLANES) | |||
4/30/2021 | RES - Response - Party (015) | 4/30/2021 | |
NOTE: Defendants Response to States Motion to Dismiss | |||
4/30/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001) | 5/3/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO STATE'S MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
4/19/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (006) | 4/19/2021 | |
4/19/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (014) | 4/19/2021 | |
4/19/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (013) | 4/19/2021 | |
4/19/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (012) | 4/19/2021 | |
4/19/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (004) | 4/19/2021 | |
4/15/2021 | REL - Reply - Party (004) | 4/16/2021 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
4/15/2021 | REL - Reply - Party (012) | 4/16/2021 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
4/15/2021 | REL - Reply - Party (013) | 4/16/2021 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
4/15/2021 | REL - Reply - Party (006) | 4/16/2021 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
4/15/2021 | REL - Reply - Party (014) | 4/16/2021 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
4/6/2021 | 099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (006) | 4/6/2021 | |
4/6/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001) | 4/6/2021 | |
4/6/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (015) | 4/6/2021 | |
4/2/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (005) | 4/2/2021 | |
4/2/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003) | 4/2/2021 | |
4/2/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002) | 4/2/2021 | |
4/2/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 4/2/2021 | |
4/2/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (006) | 4/2/2021 | |
4/2/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (004) | 4/2/2021 | |
4/2/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (010) | 4/2/2021 | |
4/2/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (007) | 4/2/2021 | |
4/2/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (009) | 4/2/2021 | |
4/2/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (008) | 4/2/2021 | |
4/2/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (012) | 4/2/2021 | |
4/2/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (011) | 4/2/2021 | |
4/2/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (013) | 4/2/2021 | |
4/2/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (015) | 4/2/2021 | |
4/2/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (014) | 4/2/2021 | |
4/2/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (013) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY | |||
4/2/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (014) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY | |||
4/2/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (006) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY | |||
4/2/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (004) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY | |||
4/2/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (012) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY | |||
4/1/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (005) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: PREMITTING THE STATE TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
4/1/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: PERMITTING THE STATE TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
4/1/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (002) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: PERMITTING THE STATE TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
4/1/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (006) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: PERMITTING THE STATE TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
4/1/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (007) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: PERMITTING THE STATE TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
4/1/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (011) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: PERMITTING THE STATE TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
4/1/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (012) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: PERMITTING THE STATE TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
4/1/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (004) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: THAT THE STATE BE PREMITTED TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
4/1/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (008) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: THAT HTE STATE BE PREMITTED TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
4/1/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (009) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: THAT THE STATE BE PREMITTED TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
4/1/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (010) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: THAT THE STATE BE PREMITTED TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
4/1/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (013) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: THAT THE STATE BE PREMITED TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
4/1/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (014) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: THAT THE STATE BE PREMITED TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
4/1/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (015) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: THAT THE STATE BE PREMITED TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
4/1/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (003) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: THAT THE STATE BE PREMITED TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
3/31/2021 | RES - Response - Party (013) | 3/31/2021 | |
NOTE: Response to States Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice and Request for Evidentiary Hearing | |||
3/31/2021 | RES - Response - Party (004) | 3/31/2021 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO STATES MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING | |||
3/31/2021 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (014) | 3/31/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance Co-Counsel | |||
3/31/2021 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (006) | 4/1/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion To Withdraw As Counsel Of Record, Appoint Public Defender and Continue Deadline To Respond to States Motion to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Join In Response To States Motion To Dismiss Without Prejudice | |||
3/31/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (014) | 4/1/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice | |||
3/31/2021 | RES - Response - Party (012) | 4/1/2021 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO STATES MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING | |||
3/31/2021 | PTT - Petition - Party (005) | 4/1/2021 | |
NOTE: PETITION FOR ENTRY ON ALL RECORDS RELATING TO ARREST AND INDICTMENT | |||
3/30/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (010) | 3/30/2021 | |
3/29/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (015) | 3/30/2021 | |
NOTE: UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE STATE’S MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
3/29/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 3/30/2021 | |
NOTE: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to States Motion to Dismiss | |||
3/22/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (003) | 3/23/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO STATES MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
3/16/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (010) | 3/16/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REQUEST TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANT’S JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO STATE’S MOTIONS TO DISMISS | |||
3/12/2021 | NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (002) | 3/15/2021 | |
NOTE: LAURA DENT $5,000.00 | |||
3/10/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001) | 3/10/2021 | |
3/10/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (015) | 3/10/2021 | |
3/10/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (004) | 3/10/2021 | |
3/10/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (014) | 3/10/2021 | |
3/10/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (011) | 3/10/2021 | |
3/10/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003) | 3/10/2021 | |
3/10/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (007) | 3/10/2021 | |
3/10/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (008) | 3/10/2021 | |
3/10/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (009) | 3/10/2021 | |
3/10/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (006) | 3/10/2021 | |
3/10/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (012) | 3/10/2021 | |
3/10/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (013) | 3/10/2021 | |
3/8/2021 | ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (002) | 3/9/2021 | |
3/2/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (015) | 3/3/2021 | |
3/2/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (003) | 3/4/2021 | |
3/2/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (014) | 3/4/2021 | |
3/2/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (010) | 3/4/2021 | |
3/2/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (013) | 3/4/2021 | |
3/2/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (012) | 3/4/2021 | |
3/2/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (011) | 3/4/2021 | |
3/2/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (007) | 3/4/2021 | |
3/2/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (009) | 3/4/2021 | |
3/2/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002) | 3/4/2021 | |
3/2/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (005) | 3/4/2021 | |
3/2/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (004) | 3/4/2021 | |
3/2/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (006) | 3/4/2021 | |
3/2/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (008) | 3/4/2021 | |
3/2/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 3/4/2021 | |
2/26/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
2/26/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (014) | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
2/26/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (008) | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
2/26/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (004) | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
2/26/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (015) | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
2/26/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (011) | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
2/26/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (009) | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
2/26/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (003) | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
2/26/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (012) | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
2/26/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (010) | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
2/26/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (013) | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
2/26/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (002) | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
2/26/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (005) | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
2/26/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (006) | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
2/26/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (015) | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
2/26/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (007) | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST TO PROVIDE THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT WITH A COPY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
2/25/2021 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (005) | 2/25/2021 | |
2/25/2021 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (015) | 2/25/2021 | |
2/24/2021 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (004) | 2/24/2021 | |
2/24/2021 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (003) | 2/24/2021 | |
2/24/2021 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (006) | 2/24/2021 | |
2/24/2021 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (005) | 2/24/2021 | |
2/24/2021 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (007) | 2/24/2021 | |
2/24/2021 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (008) | 2/24/2021 | |
2/24/2021 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (009) | 2/24/2021 | |
2/24/2021 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (010) | 2/24/2021 | |
2/24/2021 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (011) | 2/24/2021 | |
2/24/2021 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (012) | 2/24/2021 | |
2/24/2021 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (013) | 2/24/2021 | |
2/24/2021 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001) | 2/24/2021 | |
2/24/2021 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (014) | 2/24/2021 | |
2/24/2021 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (002) | 2/24/2021 | |
2/24/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (005) | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
2/24/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (015) | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
2/23/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (012) | 2/25/2021 | |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUCIE | |||
2/23/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (013) | 2/25/2021 | |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
2/23/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (014) | 2/25/2021 | |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
2/23/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (002) | 2/25/2021 | |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
2/23/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (007) | 2/25/2021 | |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
2/23/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (013) | 2/24/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO STATE’S MOTIONS TO DISMISS | |||
2/23/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001) | 2/25/2021 | |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
2/23/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (003) | 2/25/2021 | |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
2/23/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (004) | 2/25/2021 | |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
2/23/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (005) | 2/25/2021 | |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
2/23/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (006) | 2/25/2021 | |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
2/23/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (008) | 2/25/2021 | |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
2/23/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (009) | 2/25/2021 | |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
2/23/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (010) | 2/25/2021 | |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
2/19/2021 | 172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (007) | 2/19/2021 | |
2/19/2021 | 172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (008) | 2/19/2021 | |
2/19/2021 | 172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (009) | 2/19/2021 | |
2/19/2021 | 172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (015) | 2/19/2021 | |
2/19/2021 | 172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001) | 2/19/2021 | |
2/19/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (005) | 2/22/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE | |||
2/12/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (011) | 2/25/2021 | |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
2/12/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (013) | 2/12/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss Indictment and Remand to Grand Jury | |||
2/12/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (013) | 2/12/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS | |||
2/12/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (004) | 2/16/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
2/12/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (005) | 2/16/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
2/12/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (008) | 2/16/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
2/12/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (013) | 2/16/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
2/12/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001) | 2/16/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
2/12/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (003) | 2/16/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
2/12/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (007) | 2/16/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
2/12/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (006) | 2/16/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
2/12/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (014) | 2/16/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
2/12/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (009) | 2/16/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
2/12/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (012) | 2/16/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
2/12/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (010) | 2/16/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
2/12/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002) | 2/16/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
2/12/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (011) | 2/16/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
2/12/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (015) | 2/16/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS | |||
2/12/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (014) | 2/16/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Remand for a New Finding of Probable Cause REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING | |||
2/12/2021 | 906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (006) | 2/12/2021 | |
2/12/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005) | 2/12/2021 | |
2/11/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (006) | 2/16/2021 | |
2/10/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (015) | 2/10/2021 | |
2/9/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (015) | 2/11/2021 | |
NOTE: TO TRAVEL OUT OF STATE | |||
2/8/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (003) | 2/8/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE | |||
2/8/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (005) | 2/9/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO REMAND | |||
2/2/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (005) | 2/2/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO REQUEST TRAVEL | |||
2/1/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (015) | 2/1/2021 | |
NOTE: UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRAVEL | |||
2/1/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (006) | 2/1/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO REMAND | |||
2/1/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (006) | 2/1/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO REMAND | |||
2/1/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (006) | 2/2/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S MOTIONS TO SEVER AND MOTION TO DISMSS | |||
2/1/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (006) | 2/2/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S MOTIONS TO SEVER AND MOTION TO DISMSS | |||
1/29/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (005) | 1/29/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO REMAND FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE AND REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT | |||
1/29/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (005) | 2/1/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO REMAND FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE AND REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT | |||
1/29/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (005) | 2/1/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO REMOVE ORIGINALLY FILED MOTION TO REMAND | |||
1/28/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (014) | 1/28/2021 | |
1/28/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (006) | 1/28/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (012) | 1/26/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (009) | 1/26/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (004) | 1/26/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (004) | 1/26/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (013) | 1/26/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (011) | 1/26/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (005) | 1/26/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (014) | 1/26/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (005) | 1/26/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (014) | 1/26/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001) | 1/26/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (003) | 1/26/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (002) | 1/26/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (006) | 1/26/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (010) | 1/26/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (007) | 1/26/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (008) | 1/26/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (015) | 1/26/2021 | |
1/22/2021 | RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (005) | 1/25/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENSE REQUEST FOR VIRTUAL APPEARANCE STATUS CONFERENCE | |||
1/21/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (013) | 1/21/2021 | |
1/19/2021 | STA - Statement - Party (004) | 1/20/2021 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
1/19/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (015) | 1/19/2021 | |
1/19/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001) | 1/19/2021 | |
1/19/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003) | 1/19/2021 | |
1/19/2021 | REQ - Request - Party () | 1/20/2021 | |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR RULINGS | |||
1/19/2021 | STA - Statement - Party (014) | 1/20/2021 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
1/19/2021 | STA - Statement - Party (012) | 1/20/2021 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
1/19/2021 | STA - Statement - Party (010) | 1/20/2021 | |
NOTE: Comprehensive Pretrial Conference Statement | |||
1/19/2021 | STA - Statement - Party (005) | 1/20/2021 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
1/19/2021 | STA - Statement - Party (003) | 1/20/2021 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
1/19/2021 | STA - Statement - Party (007) | 1/20/2021 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
1/19/2021 | STA - Statement - Party (002) | 1/20/2021 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
1/19/2021 | STA - Statement - Party (008) | 1/20/2021 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
1/19/2021 | STA - Statement - Party (015) | 1/20/2021 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
1/19/2021 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 1/20/2021 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
1/18/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (006) | 1/19/2021 | |
NOTE: SECOND MOTION TO EXTEND RULE 12.9 TIME FOR FILING MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND MOTION TO REMAND | |||
1/18/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (006) | 1/20/2021 | |
NOTE: RULE 12.9 MOTION FOR NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE | |||
1/14/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (003) | 1/14/2021 | |
NOTE: REQUEST TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE | |||
1/13/2021 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (012) | 1/13/2021 | |
1/13/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (004) | 1/13/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9 | |||
1/12/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (014) | 1/13/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION | |||
1/12/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (005) | 1/13/2021 | |
NOTE: REQUEST TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE | |||
1/12/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (014) | 1/13/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Compel Disclosure REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT | |||
1/8/2021 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (013) | 1/8/2021 | |
1/8/2021 | RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001) | 1/11/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR EXTNSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS | |||
1/8/2021 | RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (003) | 1/11/2021 | |
NOTE: Defendants Request for Extension of Time to Challenge the Grand Jury Proceedings | |||
1/8/2021 | RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (015) | 1/11/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR EXTNSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS | |||
1/7/2021 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (013) | 1/8/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION | |||
1/4/2021 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 1/7/2021 | |
12/31/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (013) | 1/5/2021 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
12/28/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (013) | 12/29/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 | |||
12/28/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (005) | 12/29/2020 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 15.1 MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF SPECIFIC EVIDENCE | |||
12/24/2020 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 12/30/2020 | |
12/24/2020 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 12/30/2020 | |
12/24/2020 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 12/30/2020 | |
12/24/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (008) | 12/29/2020 | |
NOTE: Rule 15 Statement | |||
12/24/2020 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (009) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/24/2020 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (015) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/24/2020 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (004) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/24/2020 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (008) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/24/2020 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (014) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/24/2020 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (006) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/24/2020 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (012) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/24/2020 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (010) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/24/2020 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (003) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/24/2020 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (005) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/24/2020 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (011) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/24/2020 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/24/2020 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/24/2020 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (007) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/24/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (009) | 12/24/2020 | |
NOTE: RULE 15.1 (b) (c) STATEMENT | |||
12/24/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (007) | 12/28/2020 | |
NOTE: Rule 15 Statement | |||
12/22/2020 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (006) | 12/22/2020 | |
12/21/2020 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (010) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/21/2020 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (010) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/21/2020 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (010) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/21/2020 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/21/2020 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (010) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/18/2020 | ORD - Order - Party (006) | 12/21/2020 | |
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO ALLOW TRAVEL | |||
12/18/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (011) | 12/18/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT MARYSA LEYVA’S MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION | |||
12/18/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (005) | 12/21/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DESIGNATE COMPLEX | |||
12/18/2020 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (012) | 12/21/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO CHALLENGE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS | |||
12/17/2020 | RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (002) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING | |||
12/17/2020 | ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (002) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS | |||
12/17/2020 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (003) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/17/2020 | ALG - Allegation - Party (002) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
12/17/2020 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/17/2020 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (004) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/17/2020 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (011) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/17/2020 | ALG - Allegation - Party (004) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
12/17/2020 | ALG - Allegation - Party (003) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
12/17/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (008) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
12/17/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (003) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
12/17/2020 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (003) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses | |||
12/17/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (007) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
12/17/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (009) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
12/17/2020 | AFL - Allegation of Felony Committed While on Release/ Enhanced Sentencing - Party (002) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: PURSUANT TO A.R.S § 13-708(D) | |||
12/17/2020 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (010) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/17/2020 | ALG - Allegation - Party (011) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
12/17/2020 | ALG - Allegation - Party (013) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
12/17/2020 | ALG - Allegation - Party (010) | 12/18/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
12/17/2020 | ALG - Allegation - Party (002) | 12/18/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13- 703 or A.R.S. § 13-704 | |||
12/17/2020 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (013) | 12/18/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/17/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (011) | 12/18/2020 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
12/17/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (004) | 12/18/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS SEPARATE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
12/17/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (011) | 12/18/2020 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
12/16/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (014) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Join - Motion for Complex Case Designation | |||
12/16/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (014) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
12/16/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (002) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
12/16/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (010) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
12/16/2020 | REQ - Request - Party (006) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1 | |||
12/16/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (009) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: Initial Pretrial Conference Conference Statement | |||
12/16/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (008) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
12/16/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (006) | 12/18/2020 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
12/16/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (007) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: Initial Pretrial Conference Statement | |||
12/16/2020 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (012) | 12/22/2020 | |
12/16/2020 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (012) | 12/22/2020 | |
12/16/2020 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (012) | 12/22/2020 | |
12/16/2020 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (012) | 12/22/2020 | |
12/16/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (006) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Join- Defendant Aderholt 004 Motion for Complex Case Designation | |||
12/16/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (002) | 12/17/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSE AND LIST OF WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS | |||
12/15/2020 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (006) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/15/2020 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (015) | 12/18/2020 | |
12/15/2020 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 12/18/2020 | |
12/15/2020 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006) | 12/18/2020 | |
12/15/2020 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (015) | 12/18/2020 | |
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS | |||
12/15/2020 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 12/18/2020 | |
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS | |||
12/15/2020 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (006) | 12/18/2020 | |
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS | |||
12/15/2020 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (006) | 12/18/2020 | |
NOTE: TEMPORARY | |||
12/15/2020 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (015) | 12/18/2020 | |
NOTE: TEMPORARY | |||
12/15/2020 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (015) | 12/18/2020 | |
12/15/2020 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 12/18/2020 | |
NOTE: TEMPORARY | |||
12/15/2020 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 12/18/2020 | |
12/15/2020 | ALG - Allegation - Party (006) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
12/15/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (012) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
12/15/2020 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (015) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/15/2020 | ALG - Allegation - Party (005) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
12/15/2020 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (007) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/15/2020 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (014) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/15/2020 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (008) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/15/2020 | ALG - Allegation - Party (009) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
12/15/2020 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (012) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/15/2020 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (008) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/15/2020 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (009) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/15/2020 | ALG - Allegation - Party (008) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
12/15/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 12/15/2020 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
12/15/2020 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 12/15/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
12/15/2020 | ALG - Allegation - Party (015) | 12/15/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
12/15/2020 | ALG - Allegation - Party (012) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
12/15/2020 | ALG - Allegation - Party (014) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
12/15/2020 | ALG - Allegation - Party (007) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
12/15/2020 | ALG - Allegation - Party (007) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
12/15/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (005) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
12/15/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (014) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Defenses | |||
12/15/2020 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/15/2020 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (005) | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/14/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (006) | 12/14/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS TO ALLOW TRAVEL TO CALIFORNIA | |||
12/14/2020 | REQ - Request - Party (010) | 12/14/2020 | |
NOTE: Request for Discovery | |||
12/14/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (015) | 12/14/2020 | |
12/14/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (012) | 12/14/2020 | |
12/14/2020 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (010) | 12/15/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES, TRANSCRIPTS OR EXHIBTS | |||
12/11/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (015) | 12/14/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES | |||
12/11/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (004) | 12/14/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS LIST OF SPECIFIC ITEMS OF DISCOVERY REQUIRED UNDER RULE 15.1 (B), BUT WHICH WERE NOT DISCLOSED | |||
12/11/2020 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (005) | 12/11/2020 | |
12/10/2020 | NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (015) | 12/10/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Substitution of Counsel | |||
12/10/2020 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (011) | 12/14/2020 | |
12/10/2020 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (011) | 12/14/2020 | |
12/10/2020 | ORD - Order - Party (005) | 12/11/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |||
12/10/2020 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (011) | 12/15/2020 | |
12/10/2020 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (011) | 12/14/2020 | |
12/9/2020 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (014) | 12/14/2020 | |
12/9/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 12/10/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Defenses | |||
12/9/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (015) | 12/10/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
12/8/2020 | RNM - Returned Mail - Party (013) | 12/8/2020 | |
NOTE: | |||
12/4/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (015) | 12/4/2020 | |
12/3/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (014) | 12/3/2020 | |
12/3/2020 | RNM - Returned Mail - Party (004) | 12/3/2020 | |
NOTE: | |||
12/3/2020 | RNM - Returned Mail - Party (015) | 12/3/2020 | |
NOTE: | |||
12/3/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (004) | 12/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants Motion for Complex Case Designation | |||
12/2/2020 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002) | 12/2/2020 | |
12/1/2020 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (005) | 12/2/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION TO REMAND TO GRAND JURY | |||
12/1/2020 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (014) | 12/3/2020 | |
12/1/2020 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (014) | 12/3/2020 | |
12/1/2020 | RNM - Returned Mail - Party (010) | 12/1/2020 | |
NOTE: | |||
12/1/2020 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (014) | 12/3/2020 | |
11/30/2020 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 12/2/2020 | |
11/30/2020 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002) | 12/2/2020 | |
11/30/2020 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (003) | 12/2/2020 | |
11/30/2020 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (004) | 12/2/2020 | |
11/30/2020 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (005) | 12/2/2020 | |
11/30/2020 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (006) | 12/2/2020 | |
11/30/2020 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (007) | 12/2/2020 | |
11/30/2020 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (008) | 12/2/2020 | |
11/30/2020 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (009) | 12/2/2020 | |
11/30/2020 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (010) | 12/2/2020 | |
11/30/2020 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (011) | 12/2/2020 | |
11/30/2020 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (012) | 12/2/2020 | |
11/30/2020 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (013) | 12/2/2020 | |
11/30/2020 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (014) | 12/2/2020 | |
11/30/2020 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (015) | 12/2/2020 | |
11/23/2020 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (013) | 11/23/2020 | |
11/23/2020 | RNM - Returned Mail - Party (011) | 11/23/2020 | |
NOTE: | |||
11/20/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (012) | 11/23/2020 | |
NOTE: RULE 15.2 | |||
11/20/2020 | REQ - Request - Party (005) | 11/23/2020 | |
NOTE: REQUEST TO JOIN IN CO-DEFENDANT’S MOTION | |||
11/20/2020 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (006) | 11/20/2020 | |
11/20/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (014) | 11/20/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
11/19/2020 | REQ - Request - Party (014) | 11/20/2020 | |
NOTE: Ex Parte Application for Declaration of Indigence and Eligibility for Court Appointed Experts | |||
11/19/2020 | REL - Reply - Party (015) | 11/19/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO THE STATE’S RESPONSE RE: DISQUALIFICATION OF ASSIGNED ATTORNEY FOR THE STATE | |||
11/17/2020 | ORD - Order - Party (006) | 11/20/2020 | |
NOTE: Granting the Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Challenge the Grand Jury Proceedings | |||
11/17/2020 | ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (013) | 11/17/2020 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
11/17/2020 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (015) | 11/18/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING OF AFFIDAVIT OF AMY B. KAPER AS EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF ASSIGNED ATTORNEY FOR STATE | |||
11/17/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (008) | 11/18/2020 | |
11/17/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (007) | 11/18/2020 | |
11/17/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (009) | 11/18/2020 | |
11/16/2020 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (015) | 11/18/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF ASSIGNED ATTORNEY FOR STATE | |||
11/16/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (014) | 11/18/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
11/15/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (007) | 11/17/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
11/15/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (008) | 11/16/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
11/15/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (009) | 11/16/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
11/13/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (012) | 11/16/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO ALLOW OUT-OF-STATE TRAVEL | |||
11/13/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (006) | 11/13/2020 | |
11/13/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (007) | 11/13/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
11/12/2020 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (006) | 11/13/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Extend Rule 12.9 Time for Filing Motion | |||
11/12/2020 | RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (003) | 11/13/2020 | |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(a) and (b) AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1 (c) and (d) | |||
11/12/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (003) | 11/13/2020 | |
NOTE: INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS | |||
11/12/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (008) | 11/12/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
11/12/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (006) | 11/12/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
11/12/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (003) | 11/12/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
11/12/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (005) | 11/12/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
11/12/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 11/12/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
11/10/2020 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (015) | 11/12/2020 | |
NOTE: Temporary Removal of GJ Transcript | |||
11/10/2020 | REP - Report - Party (004) | 11/12/2020 | |
NOTE: PRETRIAL | |||
11/9/2020 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (015) | 11/9/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING OF REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 15.1 DISCLOSURE | |||
11/9/2020 | LET - Letter - Party (002) | 11/10/2020 | |
11/9/2020 | LET - Letter - Party (002) | 11/10/2020 | |
11/9/2020 | LET - Letter - Party (002) | 11/10/2020 | |
11/9/2020 | LET - Letter - Party (002) | 11/10/2020 | |
11/9/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (005) | 11/9/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DEFENSE INTERVIEWS | |||
11/9/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (005) | 11/9/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.1 MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DISCLOSURE | |||
11/9/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (005) | 11/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Invocation of 5th and 6th Amendment Rights | |||
11/9/2020 | REQ - Request - Party () | 11/9/2020 | |
11/9/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party () | 11/9/2020 | |
11/9/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party () | 11/9/2020 | |
11/9/2020 | REQ - Request - Party (014) | 11/10/2020 | |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY | |||
11/9/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (005) | 11/10/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO PRESERVE AND DISCLOSE POLICE GENERATED REPORTS AND RECORDINGS | |||
11/9/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (005) | 11/10/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.1 MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
11/9/2020 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 11/10/2020 | |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES, TRANSCRIPTS, OR EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO MARICOPA LOCAL RULE 8.2(e) | |||
11/9/2020 | REQ - Request - Party (005) | 5/6/2021 | |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES, TRANSCRIPTS, OR EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO MARICOPA LOCAL RULE 8.2(e) | |||
11/9/2020 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (002) | 11/12/2020 | |
11/7/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (015) | 11/9/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS ‘OF DEFENDANT’S RELEASE RE: CHRISTMAS TRAVEL | |||
11/6/2020 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (013) | 11/6/2020 | |
11/6/2020 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (003) | 11/6/2020 | |
11/6/2020 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002) | 11/6/2020 | |
11/6/2020 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 11/6/2020 | |
11/6/2020 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (004) | 11/6/2020 | |
11/6/2020 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (015) | 11/6/2020 | |
11/6/2020 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (010) | 11/6/2020 | |
11/6/2020 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (011) | 11/6/2020 | |
11/6/2020 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (012) | 11/6/2020 | |
11/6/2020 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (014) | 11/6/2020 | |
11/6/2020 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (005) | 11/6/2020 | |
11/6/2020 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (007) | 11/6/2020 | |
11/6/2020 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (006) | 11/6/2020 | |
11/6/2020 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (009) | 11/6/2020 | |
11/6/2020 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (008) | 11/6/2020 | |
11/5/2020 | NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (002) | 11/6/2020 | |
NOTE: $5000 | |||
11/5/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (005) | 11/5/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
11/5/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (012) | 11/5/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 11/4/2020 | |||
11/5/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (006) | 11/5/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Modify Conditions of Release Conditions to Allow Travel to California | |||
11/3/2020 | ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (006) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
11/3/2020 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002) | 11/3/2020 | |
11/3/2020 | ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (001) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
11/3/2020 | ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (003) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
11/3/2020 | ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (015) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
11/3/2020 | NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (011) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |||
11/3/2020 | ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (009) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
11/3/2020 | FIN - Financial Information - Party (007) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: IA SUMMONS FINANCIAL INFORMATION | |||
11/3/2020 | ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (007) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
11/3/2020 | ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (008) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
11/3/2020 | ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (005) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
11/3/2020 | ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (012) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
11/3/2020 | FIN - Financial Information - Party (008) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Financial | |||
11/3/2020 | FIN - Financial Information - Party (005) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Financial | |||
11/3/2020 | ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (010) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
11/3/2020 | ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (011) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
11/3/2020 | ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (011) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
11/2/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (015) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF ASSIGNED ATTORNEY FOR STATE | |||
11/2/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (011) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
11/2/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (015) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF ASSIGNED ATTORNEY FOR STATE | |||
11/2/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (015) | 11/2/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY DEFENSES INCLUDING SELECTIVE AND VINDICTIVE PROSECUTION AND UNCONSTITUTIONALITY OF A.R.S § 13 2321(B) VOID FOR VAGUENESS | |||
11/2/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (013) | 11/2/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance of Counsel | |||
10/30/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (004) | 10/30/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
10/30/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (004) | 10/30/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY, PRELIMINARY NOTICE OF DEFENSES, AND PRELIMINARY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT | |||
10/30/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (004) | 10/30/2020 | |
NOTE: EMERGENCY MOTION TO PERMIT COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY OR BY VIRTUAL MEANS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
10/30/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002) | 10/30/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
10/30/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (004) | 11/2/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXPEDITIOUS PRESERVATION OF 911 TAPES ANDOR RADIO BROADCASTS AND/OR ELECTRONIC RECORDINGS AND LOGS | |||
10/30/2020 | ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (002) | 11/2/2020 | |
NOTE: $5,000 Secured Appearance Bond | |||
10/29/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (015) | 10/29/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
10/29/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (010) | 10/29/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
10/28/2020 | 004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (002) | 10/28/2020 | |
10/27/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 11/2/2020 | |
10/27/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | IND - Indictment - Party (002) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002) | 11/2/2020 | |
10/27/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (003) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | IND - Indictment - Party (003) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (003) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (003) | 11/2/2020 | |
10/27/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (004) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | IND - Indictment - Party (004) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (004) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (004) | 11/2/2020 | |
10/27/2020 | IND - Indictment - Party (005) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (005) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (005) | 11/2/2020 | |
10/27/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (005) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (006) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | IND - Indictment - Party (006) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (006) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (006) | 11/2/2020 | |
10/27/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (007) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | IND - Indictment - Party (007) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (007) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (007) | 11/2/2020 | |
10/27/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (008) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | IND - Indictment - Party (008) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (008) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (008) | 11/2/2020 | |
10/27/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (009) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | IND - Indictment - Party (009) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (009) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (009) | 11/2/2020 | |
10/27/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (010) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | IND - Indictment - Party (010) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (010) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (010) | 11/2/2020 | |
10/27/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (011) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | IND - Indictment - Party (011) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (011) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (011) | 11/2/2020 | |
10/27/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (012) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | IND - Indictment - Party (012) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (012) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (012) | 11/2/2020 | |
10/27/2020 | IND - Indictment - Party (013) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (013) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (013) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (013) | 11/2/2020 | |
10/27/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (014) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | IND - Indictment - Party (014) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (014) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (014) | 11/2/2020 | |
10/27/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (015) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | IND - Indictment - Party (015) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (015) | 11/2/2020 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/27/2020 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (015) | 11/2/2020 | |
10/26/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (012) | 10/26/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
10/23/2020 | OTC – Order to Continue - Party (002) | 10/28/2020 | |
10/23/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (006) | 10/26/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice Of Appearance | |||
10/22/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 10/22/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
10/20/2020 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (014) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (009) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (008) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (005) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (006) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (003) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (010) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (004) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (012) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (013) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (011) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (007) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
10/20/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (002) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
10/20/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (003) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
10/20/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (003) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (004) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
10/20/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (004) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (005) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
10/20/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (005) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (006) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
10/20/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (006) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (007) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
10/20/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (007) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (008) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
10/20/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (008) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (009) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
10/20/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (009) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (010) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
10/20/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (010) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (011) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
10/20/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (011) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (012) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
10/20/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (012) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (013) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
10/20/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (013) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (014) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
10/20/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (014) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (015) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (015) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
10/20/2020 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (015) | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (009) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/20/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (014) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/20/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/20/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (013) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/20/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (012) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/20/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (004) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
10/20/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (012) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
10/20/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (014) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
10/20/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (008) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/20/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (009) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
10/20/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
10/20/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (005) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
10/20/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (008) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
10/20/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (005) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/20/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (006) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/20/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (010) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/20/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (006) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
10/20/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (003) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/20/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (006) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Amended Release Order | |||
10/20/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (003) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
10/20/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (013) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
10/20/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (011) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/20/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
10/20/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/20/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (004) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/20/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (010) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
10/20/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (012) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Amended Release Order | |||
10/20/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (011) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
10/20/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (007) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/20/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (007) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
10/18/2020 | 8:00 | Initial Appearance |
10/18/2020 | 8:00 | Initial Appearance |
10/18/2020 | 8:00 | Initial Appearance |
10/18/2020 | 8:00 | Initial Appearance |
10/18/2020 | 8:00 | Initial Appearance |
10/18/2020 | 11:00 | Initial Appearance |
10/18/2020 | 11:00 | Initial Appearance |
10/18/2020 | 11:00 | Initial Appearance |
10/18/2020 | 11:00 | Initial Appearance |
10/18/2020 | 11:00 | Initial Appearance |
10/18/2020 | 11:00 | Initial Appearance |
10/18/2020 | 11:00 | Initial Appearance |
10/18/2020 | 11:00 | Initial Appearance |
10/18/2020 | 11:00 | Initial Appearance |
10/23/2020 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
10/23/2020 | 10:30 | Status Conference |
10/26/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
10/27/2020 | 8:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
10/27/2020 | 10:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
10/30/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
10/30/2020 | 14:45 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/2/2020 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
11/2/2020 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
11/2/2020 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
11/2/2020 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
11/2/2020 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
11/2/2020 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
11/2/2020 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
11/2/2020 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
11/2/2020 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
11/2/2020 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
11/2/2020 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
11/2/2020 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
11/2/2020 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
11/3/2020 | 9:00 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
11/3/2020 | 9:00 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
11/3/2020 | 9:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
11/3/2020 | 9:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
11/3/2020 | 10:00 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
11/3/2020 | 10:00 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
11/3/2020 | 10:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
11/3/2020 | 10:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
11/3/2020 | 10:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
11/3/2020 | 10:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
11/3/2020 | 10:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
11/3/2020 | 11:00 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
11/3/2020 | 11:00 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
11/3/2020 | 11:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
11/3/2020 | 11:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
11/5/2020 | 13:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
11/5/2020 | 13:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
11/5/2020 | 13:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
11/5/2020 | 13:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
11/5/2020 | 13:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
11/5/2020 | 13:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
11/5/2020 | 13:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
11/5/2020 | 13:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
11/5/2020 | 13:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
11/5/2020 | 13:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
11/5/2020 | 13:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
11/5/2020 | 13:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
11/5/2020 | 13:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
11/6/2020 | 10:30 | Status Conference |
11/12/2020 | 10:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
11/17/2020 | 10:30 | Arraignment Hearing |
11/30/2020 | 17:00 | Status Conference |
12/18/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
12/18/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
12/18/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
12/18/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
12/18/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
12/18/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
12/18/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
12/18/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
12/18/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
12/18/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
12/18/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
12/18/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
12/18/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
12/18/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
12/18/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
12/18/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
1/5/2021 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
1/20/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
1/20/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
1/20/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
1/20/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
1/20/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
1/20/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
1/20/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
1/20/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
1/20/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
1/20/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
1/20/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
1/20/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
1/20/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
1/20/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
1/20/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
1/20/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
2/4/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
2/16/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/19/2021 | 11:00 | Status Conference |
2/19/2021 | 11:00 | Status Conference |
2/19/2021 | 11:00 | Status Conference |
2/19/2021 | 11:00 | Status Conference |
2/19/2021 | 11:00 | Status Conference |
3/1/2021 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/1/2021 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/1/2021 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/1/2021 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/1/2021 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/1/2021 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/1/2021 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/1/2021 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/1/2021 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/1/2021 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/1/2021 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/1/2021 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/1/2021 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/1/2021 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/1/2021 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/2/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
3/18/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/18/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/18/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/18/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/18/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/18/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/18/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/18/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/18/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/18/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/18/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/18/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/18/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/18/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/18/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
4/1/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
4/1/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
4/1/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
4/1/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
4/1/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
4/1/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
4/1/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
4/1/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
4/1/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
4/1/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
4/1/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
4/1/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
4/1/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
4/1/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
4/1/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
4/1/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
4/15/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/11/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/11/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/11/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/11/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/11/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/11/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/11/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/11/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/11/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/11/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/11/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/11/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/11/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/11/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/11/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/14/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/14/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/14/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/14/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/14/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/14/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/14/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/14/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/14/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/14/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/14/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/14/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/14/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/14/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/14/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/29/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/29/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/29/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/29/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/29/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/29/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/29/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/29/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/29/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/29/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/29/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/29/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/29/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/29/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/29/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |