« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Attorney, County
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Thomas Christopher Retzlaff - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Public Defense Services-Ccc, Office Of
Judge
Simon
Case #
CR2020-136827-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Thomas Christopher Retzlaff
Crime Date
9/18/2015
Date
5/18/2021
Description
TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER
ARSCode
13-2008A (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Thomas Christopher Retzlaff
Crime Date
5/20/2018
Date
5/18/2021
Description
FORGERY-W/WRITTEN INSTRUMENT
ARSCode
13-2002A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Thomas Christopher Retzlaff
Crime Date
3/8/2018
Date
5/18/2021
Description
TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER
ARSCode
13-2008A (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Thomas Christopher Retzlaff
Crime Date
5/1/2018
Date
5/18/2021
Description
COMPUTER TAMP-USE TO THREATEN
ARSCode
13-2316A5 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2021
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2021
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/18/2021
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing ID 12905680 - STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO
DISMISS AND QUASH WARRANT OR
SUMMONS
Filing Date
5/6/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2021
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2021
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2021
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Defendants Letter to Comm Clarke in Opposition to States Motion
Filing Date
4/22/2021
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Defendants 2nd letter to Comm Clarke
Filing Date
4/19/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO MODIFY
RELEASE CONDITIONS AND
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF VIOLATION
OF COURT ORDER
Filing Date
4/14/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STRIKING DEFENDANTS MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO THE STATES SEVERAL MOTIOS TO SEAL AND SEALING DEFENDANTS MOTION IN OPPOSITION
Filing Date
4/7/2021
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO STRIKE
DEFENDANT’S OPPOSTION TO THE
STATE’S SEVERAL MOTIONS TO
SEAL AND TO SEAL DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO IN OPPOSITION TO THE
STATE’S SEVERAL MOTION TO SEAL
Filing Date
4/5/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Defendants Opposition to States motions to seal court records
Filing Date
3/31/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2021
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Letter to Comm Clarke
Filing Date
3/23/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING THE DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR WITNESS SUBPOENA
Filing Date
3/23/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SEALED, EX PARTE REQUEST FOR WITNESS SUBPOENA
Filing Date
3/22/2021
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Defendants Supplement to the Amended First Request for Witness Subpoena
Filing Date
3/22/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO SEAL
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR
WITNESS SUBPOENA (RE: ALLISTER
ADEL)
Filing Date
3/19/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2021
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S AMENDED NOTICE
REGARDING LOSS OF DEFENSE
COUNSEL AND REQUEST FOR
APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL
PROSECUTOR / SPECIAL
INVESTIGATOR
Filing Date
3/18/2021
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE REGARDING LOSS OF DEFENSE COUNSEL AND REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL PROSECUTOR / SPECIAL INVESTIGATOR
Filing Date
3/12/2021
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S AMENDED SECOND REQUEST FOR WITNESS SUBPOENA
Filing Date
3/12/2021
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S THIRD REQUEST FOR WITNESS SUBPOENA
Filing Date
3/12/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S AMENDED MOTION TO SEAL
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR
WITNESS SUBPOENA
Filing Date
3/11/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SECOND REQUEST FOR WITNESS SUBPOENA
Filing Date
3/11/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Defendants Amended Request for Witness Subpoena
Filing Date
3/10/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO SEAL
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR
WITNESS SUBPOENA
Filing Date
3/9/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Defendants Request for A Witness Subpoena
Filing Date
2/26/2021
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
2/24/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
Notice of Defendants Amended List of Defenses Witnesses
Filing Date
2/12/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR NUN PRO TUNC
Filing Date
2/5/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER TO CORRECT STATUS CONFERENCE MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
2/5/2021
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF
DEFENSES AND WITNESSES
Filing Date
2/4/2021
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT
Filing Date
1/28/2021
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/28/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2021
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2021
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record
Filing Date
12/8/2020
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
12/4/2020
Description
179 - ME: Initial Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2020
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
11/17/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defendants List of Defenses and Witnesses
Filing Date
11/17/2020
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion for Discovery
Filing Date
11/3/2020
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/29/2020
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL APPEARANCE
Filing Date
10/27/2020
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL APPEARANCE
Filing Date
10/26/2020
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
10/26/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion to Continue Initial Appearance
Filing Date
9/30/2020
Description
SUM - Summons - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2020
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2020
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2020
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM IV
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/27/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
12/2/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
2/2/2021
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/1/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/5/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
5/18/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/18/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/20/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
5/20/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing