Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, S P 2 Family Violence East      
Brandon M Cooper - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Colson, Sherri   Master Calendar  CR2020-135713-001  
Chaimara Shanae Washington - (3)
 
Defendant  F   Guenther, Jennifer   Master Calendar  CR2020-135713-002  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Brandon M Cooper  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  9/18/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  10/1/2020 
Brandon M Cooper  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  9/18/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  10/1/2020 
Chaimara Shanae Washington  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  9/18/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  10/1/2020 
Chaimara Shanae Washington  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  9/18/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  10/1/2020 
Brandon M Cooper  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  9/16/2020  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  3/2/2022 
Brandon M Cooper  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  9/16/2020  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  3/2/2022 
Brandon M Cooper  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  9/12/2020  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  3/2/2022 
Chaimara Shanae Washington  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  9/16/2020  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  3/2/2022 
Chaimara Shanae Washington  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  9/16/2020  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  3/2/2022 
Chaimara Shanae Washington  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  9/12/2020  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  3/2/2022 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/28/2022  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)  3/30/2022   
3/28/2022  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  3/30/2022   
3/16/2022  OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)  3/18/2022   
3/16/2022  OOR - Order Of Release - Party (002)  3/18/2022   
3/15/2022  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (002)  3/15/2022   
3/15/2022  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)  3/15/2022   
3/2/2022  ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)  3/9/2022   
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE 
3/2/2022  ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (002)  3/9/2022   
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE 
3/1/2022  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  3/7/2022   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS 
3/1/2022  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)  3/4/2022   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS 
2/28/2022  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/7/2022   
2/25/2022  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/7/2022   
2/25/2022  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  3/8/2022   
2/25/2022  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/9/2022   
2/17/2022  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  2/17/2022   
2/17/2022  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)  2/17/2022   
1/10/2022  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)  1/10/2022   
12/23/2021  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  12/23/2021   
12/13/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  12/14/2021   
NOTE: Motion to continue 
11/15/2021  RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)  11/15/2021   
NOTE:  
10/6/2021  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  10/6/2021   
10/6/2021  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)  10/6/2021   
9/24/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  9/28/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL 
7/30/2021  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)  7/30/2021   
7/30/2021  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  7/30/2021   
7/21/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/27/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROPOSED ORDER 
7/21/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  7/27/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROPOSED ORDER 
7/14/2021  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  7/14/2021   
7/14/2021  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)  7/14/2021   
7/9/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  7/12/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL 
7/9/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  7/12/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL 
7/7/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  7/7/2021   
NOTE: Motion to Continue 
6/23/2021  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)  6/24/2021   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
4/20/2021  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  4/20/2021   
4/19/2021  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  4/20/2021   
4/16/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  4/16/2021   
NOTE: SECOND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL 
4/13/2021  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)  4/13/2021   
3/31/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  3/31/2021   
NOTE: Motion to Continue Trial 
3/22/2021  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)  3/22/2021   
3/15/2021  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)  3/15/2021   
3/11/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  3/12/2021   
NOTE: RULE 15.1(g) MOTION FOR COURT ORDERED DISCLOSURE: SCHOOL TABLET RECORDS/RECORDINGS OF ALLEGED VICTIM 
2/24/2021  CER - Certificate - Party (002)  2/24/2021   
NOTE: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 
2/24/2021  CER - Certificate - Party (002)  2/25/2021   
NOTE: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE SERVED 02/19/21 
2/17/2021  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  2/17/2021   
2/17/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  2/18/2021   
NOTE: Motion to Modify Release Conditions 
2/12/2021  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)  2/12/2021   
2/10/2021  ORD - Order - Party (002)  2/12/2021   
NOTE: DISCLOSURE 
1/27/2021  REQ - Request - Party (001)  1/27/2021   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1 (a), (b), (d), (e) 
1/27/2021  REQ - Request - Party (001)  1/27/2021   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR EXPEDITIOUS DISCLOSURE OF 911 TAPES, VIDEOS OR AUDIO SURVEILLANCE TAPES AND/OR RADIO BROADCASTS 
1/27/2021  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  1/28/2021   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE; REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES 
1/27/2021  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/28/2021   
NOTE: Invocation of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights 
1/27/2021  RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)  1/28/2021   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
1/22/2021  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  1/22/2021   
1/20/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  1/21/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL 
1/19/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  1/20/2021   
NOTE: RULE 15.1(g) MOTION FOR COURT ORDERED DISCLOSURE: CELL PHONE RECORDS OF DEFENDANT 
1/12/2021  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  1/14/2021   
1/12/2021  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)  1/12/2021   
1/8/2021  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  1/12/2021   
NOTE: NOTICE OF CORRECTION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL 
1/8/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  1/8/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL 
1/7/2021  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  1/11/2021   
1/7/2021  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)  1/11/2021   
1/7/2021  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  1/12/2021   
12/22/2020  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  12/22/2020   
12/22/2020  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  12/22/2020   
12/16/2020  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)  12/16/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
12/16/2020  STA - Statement - Party (001)  12/16/2020   
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT 
12/16/2020  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  12/16/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
12/16/2020  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (002)  12/17/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704 
12/16/2020  STA - Statement - Party (002)  12/17/2020   
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT 
12/16/2020  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)  12/17/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704 
12/16/2020  STA - Statement - Party (001)  12/18/2020   
11/25/2020  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  11/25/2020   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING: JOINT INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT 
11/25/2020  RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)  11/30/2020   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
11/25/2020  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)  11/25/2020   
11/23/2020  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  11/23/2020   
11/20/2020  ORD - Order - Party (002)  11/24/2020   
NOTE: to Modify Release Conditions 
11/18/2020  STA - Statement - Party (002)  11/19/2020   
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT 
10/28/2020  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)  10/28/2020   
10/28/2020  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  10/28/2020   
NOTE: MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS 
10/27/2020  ORD - Order - Party (002)  10/29/2020   
NOTE: EXTENDING TIME TO CHALLENGE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
10/21/2020  REQ - Request - Party (002)  10/21/2020   
NOTE: Request for Discovery 
10/21/2020  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (002)  10/22/2020   
NOTE: Request to Extend Rule 12.9 Deadline 
10/21/2020  REQ - Request - Party (002)  10/22/2020   
NOTE: Request for Specific Discovery 
10/21/2020  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  10/22/2020   
NOTE: Rule 15.2 Notice of Defenses 
10/15/2020  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  10/16/2020   
10/15/2020  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)  10/16/2020   
10/13/2020  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  10/13/2020   
10/13/2020  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)  10/13/2020   
10/8/2020  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)  10/8/2020   
NOTE: Secured Appearance Bond $ 250,000.00 
10/8/2020  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (002)  10/8/2020   
NOTE: $500,000 Secured Appearance Bond 
10/7/2020  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)  10/7/2020   
10/6/2020  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  10/6/2020   
10/1/2020  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)  10/7/2020   
10/1/2020  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  10/7/2020   
9/30/2020  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)  10/7/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
9/30/2020  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  10/7/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM 
9/30/2020  IND - Indictment - Party (002)  10/7/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
9/30/2020  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)  10/7/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
9/30/2020  NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (002)  10/1/2020   
NOTE: TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING 
9/30/2020  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  10/7/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
9/30/2020  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  10/7/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM 
9/30/2020  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  10/7/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
9/30/2020  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  10/7/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
9/30/2020  584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (002)  9/30/2020   
9/30/2020  NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)  9/30/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING 
9/30/2020  NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (002)  10/1/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING 
9/29/2020  OTC – Order to Continue - Party (002)  10/1/2020   
9/29/2020  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  10/1/2020   
9/28/2020  OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)  9/29/2020   
9/25/2020  NPH - Notice of Affirmation of Preliminary Hearing - Party (002)  9/29/2020   
9/22/2020  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  9/22/2020   
9/22/2020  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)  9/22/2020   
9/22/2020  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  9/22/2020   
9/22/2020  RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)  9/22/2020   
NOTE: FORM IV 
9/22/2020  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/22/2020   
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM 
9/22/2020  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)  9/22/2020   
9/22/2020  RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (002)  9/22/2020   
NOTE: FORM IV 
9/22/2020  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  9/22/2020   
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM 
9/22/2020  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  9/22/2020   
NOTE: IA Packet 
9/22/2020  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  9/22/2020   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
9/20/2020  11:00   Initial Appearance 
9/25/2020  8:30   Status Conference 
9/25/2020  10:30   Status Conference 
9/25/2020  10:30   Status Conference 
9/25/2020  10:30   Status Conference 
9/28/2020  10:30   Status Conference 
9/29/2020  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
9/29/2020  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
9/29/2020  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
9/29/2020  10:30   Preliminary Hearing 
9/30/2020  10:30   Preliminary Hearing 
9/30/2020  10:30   Preliminary Hearing 
9/30/2020  13:30   Preliminary Hearing 
10/8/2020  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
10/8/2020  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
10/8/2020  10:30   Status Conference 
11/19/2020  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
11/25/2020  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
12/16/2020  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
12/16/2020  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
1/21/2021  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/21/2021  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
2/4/2021  11:00   Trial 
2/4/2021  11:00   Trial 
4/5/2021  8:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/7/2021  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/19/2021  9:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/21/2021  11:00   Trial 
4/29/2021  11:00   Trial 
7/12/2021  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/12/2021  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/20/2021  9:00   Trial 
7/20/2021  9:00   Trial 
9/28/2021  8:40   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/28/2021  8:40   Pre-Trial Conference 
10/12/2021  9:00   Trial 
10/12/2021  9:00   Trial 
12/14/2021  10:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
12/14/2021  10:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/4/2022  9:00   Trial 
1/4/2022  9:00   Trial 
2/9/2022  9:20   Pre-Trial Conference 
2/9/2022  9:20   Pre-Trial Conference 
2/24/2022  9:00   Trial 
2/24/2022  9:00   Trial 
3/2/2022  9:10   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/2/2022  9:10   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/17/2022  9:00   Trial 
3/17/2022  9:00   Trial