Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Graham, Zachary      
Ryan Johnson Davis - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Bjorklund, Carly   Saccone  CR2020-115796-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Ryan Johnson Davis  13-1504A1 (F6)  CRIM TRESP 1ST DEG-RES STRUCT  4/16/2020  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  4/24/2020 
Ryan Johnson Davis  13-1602A1 (M2)  CRIMINAL DAMAGE-DEFACE  4/16/2020  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/24/2020 
Ryan Johnson Davis  13-1507A (F3)  BURGLARY 2ND DEGREE  4/16/2020  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/24/2020 
Ryan Johnson Davis  13-1802A (F6)  THEFT  4/16/2020  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  4/24/2020 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
4/21/2021  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)  4/22/2021   
NOTE: Request to Establish Start Date 
3/3/2021  PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)  3/3/2021   
NOTE: COUNT 1  
6/2/2020  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  6/3/2020   
6/2/2020  ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)  6/3/2020   
5/26/2020  SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)  5/26/2020   
NOTE: SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation 
5/22/2020  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/27/2020   
NOTE: SENTENCING MEMORANDUM 
5/22/2020  ORD - Order - Party (001)  5/27/2020   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 
5/22/2020  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/27/2020   
NOTE: TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL 
5/22/2020  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  5/22/2020   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
5/22/2020  OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)  5/22/2020   
NOTE: Order of Confinement Jail 
5/22/2020  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  5/22/2020   
NOTE:  
5/22/2020  PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)  5/22/2020   
NOTE: PSR Supporting Documents 
5/22/2020  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  5/22/2020   
NOTE: Presentence Report 
5/22/2020  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  5/22/2020   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
5/18/2020  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)  5/18/2020   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING OF LETTERS 
5/6/2020  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  5/6/2020   
5/1/2020  ORD - Order - Party (001)  5/6/2020   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE ORAL ARGUMENT 
4/30/2020  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/1/2020   
NOTE: MOTION TO VACATE ORAL ARGUMENT 
4/28/2020  102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)  4/28/2020   
4/27/2020  STA - Statement - Party (001)  4/28/2020   
NOTE: VICTIM IIMPACT 
4/24/2020  INF - Information - Party (001)  4/27/2020   
NOTE: INFORMATION 
4/24/2020  WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)  4/27/2020   
4/20/2020  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  4/20/2020   
4/20/2020  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  4/20/2020   
4/20/2020  RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (001)  4/20/2020   
NOTE: FORM IV 
4/20/2020  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  4/20/2020   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
4/20/2020  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  4/20/2020   
NOTE: IA Packet 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
4/17/2020  14:00   Initial Appearance 
4/24/2020  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
4/24/2020  8:46   Original Arraignment Hearing 
5/1/2020  8:13   Oral Argument 
5/22/2020  8:15   Sentencing