Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, S P 2 Family Violence East      
Donald Roy Ferguson - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Thredgold, Brian   Master Calendar  CR2020-101042-001  
Emmaline Amelia Ramirez - (3)
 
Defendant  F   Walton, Michael   Master Calendar  CR2020-101042-002  
B Victim - (4)
 
Victim  F   To Be Determined      
B Victim - (5)
 
Victim  M   To Be Determined      
B Victim - (6)
 
Victim  F   To Be Determined      
B Victim - (8)
 
Victim  M   To Be Determined      
B Victim - (9)
 
Victim  M   Charbel, Susie      
B Victim - (10)
 
Victim  N/A   To Be Determined      
B Victim - (11)
 
Victim  N/A   To Be Determined      
B Victim - (12)
 
Victim  N/A   To Be Determined      
B Victim - (13)
 
Victim  N/A   To Be Determined      
B Victim - (14)
 
Victim  N/A   To Be Determined      
B Victim - (15)
 
Victim  N/A   To Be Determined      
B Victim - (16)
 
Victim  N/A   To Be Determined      
B Victim - (17)
 
Victim  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Donald Roy Ferguson  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/6/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/15/2020 
Donald Roy Ferguson  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/6/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/15/2020 
Donald Roy Ferguson  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/6/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/15/2020 
Donald Roy Ferguson  13-2508A1 (F6)  RESIST ARREST-PHYSICAL FORCE  1/7/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/15/2020 
Donald Roy Ferguson  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/6/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/15/2020 
Donald Roy Ferguson  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/6/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/15/2020 
Donald Roy Ferguson  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/6/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/15/2020 
Donald Roy Ferguson  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/6/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/15/2020 
Emmaline Amelia Ramirez  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/6/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/15/2020 
Emmaline Amelia Ramirez  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/6/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/15/2020 
Emmaline Amelia Ramirez  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/6/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/15/2020 
Emmaline Amelia Ramirez  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/6/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/15/2020 
Emmaline Amelia Ramirez  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/6/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/15/2020 
Emmaline Amelia Ramirez  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/6/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/15/2020 
Emmaline Amelia Ramirez  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/6/2020  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/15/2020 
Donald Roy Ferguson  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/4/2020  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  3/12/2021 
Donald Roy Ferguson  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/4/2020  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  3/12/2021 
Donald Roy Ferguson  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  12/5/2019  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  3/12/2021 
Donald Roy Ferguson  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/2/2020  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  3/12/2021 
Donald Roy Ferguson  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/2/2020  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  3/12/2021 
Donald Roy Ferguson  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/2/2020  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  3/12/2021 
Donald Roy Ferguson  13-2508A1 (F6)  RESIST ARREST-PHYSICAL FORCE  1/7/2020  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  3/12/2021 
Emmaline Amelia Ramirez  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/4/2020  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  1/25/2021 
Emmaline Amelia Ramirez  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/4/2020  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/25/2021 
Emmaline Amelia Ramirez  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  12/5/2019  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  1/25/2021 
Emmaline Amelia Ramirez  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/2/2020  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/25/2021 
Emmaline Amelia Ramirez  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/2/2020  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/25/2021 
Emmaline Amelia Ramirez  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/2/2020  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/25/2021 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
7/29/2021  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  7/29/2021   
7/29/2021  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (002)  7/29/2021   
7/2/2021  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (002)  7/6/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY ON RECORD FOR MINOR CRIME VICTIMS 
7/2/2021  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  7/6/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY ON RECORD FOR MINOR CRIME VICTIMS 
4/21/2021  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  4/23/2021   
4/15/2021  SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)  4/15/2021   
NOTE: SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation 
4/13/2021  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  4/13/2021   
NOTE: Presentence Report 
4/13/2021  OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)  4/13/2021   
NOTE: Order of Release 
4/13/2021  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  4/13/2021   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
4/13/2021  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  4/13/2021   
NOTE:  
4/13/2021  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  4/13/2021   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
4/9/2021  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  4/12/2021   
NOTE: SENTENCING MEMORANDUM 
3/16/2021  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  3/16/2021   
3/12/2021  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  3/12/2021   
NOTE: PLEA AGREEMENT 
3/9/2021  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  3/9/2021   
3/9/2021  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)  3/11/2021   
3/1/2021  SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (002)  3/1/2021   
NOTE: SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation 
2/26/2021  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)  2/26/2021   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
2/26/2021  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)  2/26/2021   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
2/26/2021  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)  2/26/2021   
NOTE: Presentence Report 
2/26/2021  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)  2/26/2021   
NOTE:  
2/26/2021  OOR - Order Of Release - Party (002)  2/26/2021   
NOTE: Order of Release 
2/17/2021  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party ()  2/22/2021   
NOTE: SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR MINOR CRIME VICTIMS; AND ASSERTION OF MINOR CRIME VICTIMS CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS 
2/17/2021  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party ()  2/22/2021   
NOTE: SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR MINOR CRIME VICTIMS; AND ASSERTION OF MINOR CRIME VICTIMS CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS 
1/29/2021  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)  1/29/2021   
1/26/2021  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)  1/26/2021   
NOTE: PLEA AGREEMENT 
1/21/2021  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  1/21/2021   
1/21/2021  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  1/21/2021   
1/8/2021  REP - Report - Party (001)  1/11/2021   
NOTE: Complex Case Joint Case Management Report Pursuant to A.O. N.O. 2010-090 
11/18/2020  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  11/18/2020   
11/18/2020  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  11/18/2020   
11/6/2020  STA - Statement - Party (001)  11/6/2020   
NOTE: Defenses Complex Case Management Statement 
11/6/2020  REP - Report - Party (002)  11/6/2020   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
9/23/2020  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (002)  9/23/2020   
9/23/2020  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)  9/23/2020   
9/22/2020  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)  9/22/2020   
9/15/2020  REP - Report - Party (001)  9/15/2020   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
9/15/2020  REP - Report - Party (002)  9/16/2020   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
9/15/2020  REQ - Request - Party (001)  9/16/2020   
NOTE: Request to Join Co-Defendants Motion to Continue 
9/8/2020  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  9/9/2020   
NOTE: Motion to continue 
7/22/2020  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  7/22/2020   
7/22/2020  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  7/22/2020   
7/16/2020  REP - Report - Party (001)  7/20/2020   
NOTE: JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT 
7/16/2020  REP - Report - Party (002)  7/20/2020   
NOTE: JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT 
7/13/2020  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)  7/13/2020   
7/10/2020  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  7/10/2020   
6/16/2020  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  6/16/2020   
6/15/2020  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)  6/15/2020   
6/8/2020  REP - Report - Party (002)  6/9/2020   
NOTE: JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT 
5/8/2020  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)  5/8/2020   
5/6/2020  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)  5/7/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE 
5/5/2020  RES - Response - Party (002)  5/6/2020   
NOTE: CRIME VICTIMS’ RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE 
4/30/2020  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  5/1/2020   
NOTE: Motion to modify conditions of release 
4/15/2020  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  4/15/2020   
4/15/2020  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)  4/15/2020   
3/13/2020  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  3/18/2020   
3/13/2020  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)  3/13/2020   
3/13/2020  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  3/13/2020   
3/9/2020  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/9/2020   
3/6/2020  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/11/2020   
3/6/2020  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  3/11/2020   
3/6/2020  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  3/11/2020   
3/6/2020  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)  3/12/2020   
3/5/2020  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/12/2020   
3/5/2020  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  3/12/2020   
3/5/2020  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/11/2020   
3/5/2020  599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  3/5/2020   
3/5/2020  599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  3/5/2020   
3/3/2020  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  3/3/2020   
3/3/2020  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/4/2020   
NOTE: NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE 
3/3/2020  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (002)  3/4/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704 
3/3/2020  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)  3/4/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
3/3/2020  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)  3/4/2020   
NOTE: PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704 
3/3/2020  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  3/4/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
3/3/2020  ALG - Allegation - Party (002)  3/4/2020   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
3/3/2020  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  3/4/2020   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
3/3/2020  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  3/4/2020   
NOTE: NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE 
3/2/2020  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (002)  3/3/2020   
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES 
3/2/2020  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  3/3/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance  
3/2/2020  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)  3/3/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance  
2/28/2020  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  3/3/2020   
2/26/2020  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  2/28/2020   
NOTE: TEMPORARY 
2/26/2020  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)  2/28/2020   
2/26/2020  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  2/28/2020   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
2/18/2020  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  2/18/2020   
NOTE: Motion to Extend Time for Filing Rule 12.9 Motion to Remand 
2/13/2020  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/14/2020   
NOTE: Motion to Extend time for Filing Rule 12.9 Motion to Remand 
2/13/2020  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/14/2020   
NOTE: Supplemental Rule 15.1 Motion for Disclosure of Specific Evidence 
2/11/2020  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  2/13/2020   
2/10/2020  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  2/12/2020   
2/10/2020  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  2/12/2020   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
2/10/2020  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  2/12/2020   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
2/6/2020  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/6/2020   
NOTE: Rule 15.1 Motion for Disclosure of Specific Evidence  
2/6/2020  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/6/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Request for Defense Interviews 
2/6/2020  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  2/6/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
2/6/2020  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  2/6/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses 
2/6/2020  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/6/2020   
NOTE: Motion to Preserve and Disclose Police Generated Reports and Recordings 
2/6/2020  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/6/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Invocation of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights 
2/6/2020  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  2/7/2020   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.1 MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE 
2/6/2020  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/7/2020   
NOTE: Motion for Complex Case Designation 
1/31/2020  ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  2/3/2020   
1/30/2020  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)  1/31/2020   
NOTE: $75,000.00 
1/30/2020  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)  1/30/2020   
1/30/2020  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  1/30/2020   
1/29/2020  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  1/29/2020   
1/29/2020  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)  1/29/2020   
1/21/2020  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)  1/30/2020   
NOTE: $75,000 
1/21/2020  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (002)  1/21/2020   
NOTE: Secured Appearance Bond $ 2500 
1/14/2020  NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)  1/15/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING 
1/14/2020  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  1/15/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
1/14/2020  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  1/15/2020   
1/14/2020  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  1/15/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
1/14/2020  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  1/15/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
1/14/2020  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)  1/15/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
1/14/2020  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)  1/15/2020   
1/14/2020  IND - Indictment - Party (002)  1/15/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
1/14/2020  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)  1/15/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
1/14/2020  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  1/15/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM 
1/14/2020  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/15/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM 
1/9/2020  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  1/9/2020   
1/9/2020  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  1/9/2020   
1/9/2020  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)  1/9/2020   
1/9/2020  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)  1/9/2020   
1/9/2020  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  1/9/2020   
NOTE: IA Packet 
1/9/2020  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  1/9/2020   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
1/7/2020  23:00   Initial Appearance 
1/14/2020  8:30   Status Conference 
1/14/2020  8:30   Status Conference 
1/16/2020  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
1/16/2020  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
1/21/2020  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
1/21/2020  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
3/3/2020  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
3/3/2020  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
4/2/2020  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
4/2/2020  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
4/16/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/16/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/27/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/27/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/10/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/11/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/17/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/17/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/22/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/22/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/9/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/9/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/14/2020  10:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/16/2020  8:00   Trial 
9/16/2020  8:00   Trial 
9/16/2020  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/16/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/16/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/23/2020  8:00   Trial 
9/23/2020  11:00   Trial 
11/9/2020  8:30   Status Conference 
11/9/2020  8:30   Status Conference 
1/12/2021  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/12/2021  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/25/2021  11:30   Change Of Plea 
2/26/2021  9:30   Sentencing 
3/1/2021  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/12/2021  10:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/13/2021  10:00   Sentencing