« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Eliason, Jon
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Adrian Arthur Espinosa - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Kinkead, Kyle
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2020-004007-001
Party Name
Jose Antonio Beltran - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Ferragut, Ulises
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2020-004007-002
Party Name
B Witness - (4)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2020-004007-002
Party Name
B Witness - (5)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2020-004007-002
Party Name
B Victim - (7)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2020-004007-002
Party Name
B Victim - (8)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2020-004007-002
Party Name
B Witness - (9)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Allen, Shannon
Judge
Case #
CR2020-004007-002
Party Name
Witness Witness - (11)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2020-004007-002
Disposition Information
Party Name
Adrian Arthur Espinosa 
Crime Date
12/8/2020
Date
12/30/2020
Description
MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Adrian Arthur Espinosa 
Crime Date
12/8/2020
Date
12/30/2020
Description
BURGLARY 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1508 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Adrian Arthur Espinosa 
Crime Date
12/8/2020
Date
3/9/2023
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Adrian Arthur Espinosa 
Crime Date
12/8/2020
Date
3/9/2023
Description
BURGLARY 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1508A (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Adrian Arthur Espinosa 
Crime Date
12/8/2020
Date
3/9/2023
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Adrian Arthur Espinosa 
Crime Date
12/8/2020
Date
3/9/2023
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Adrian Arthur Espinosa 
Crime Date
12/8/2020
Date
3/9/2023
Description
KIDNAP-DEATH/INJ/SEX/AID FEL
ARSCode
13-1304A3 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Adrian Arthur Espinosa 
Crime Date
12/8/2020
Date
3/6/2023
Description
KIDNAP-DEATH/INJ/SEX/AID FEL
ARSCode
13-1304A3 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Jose Antonio Beltran 
Crime Date
12/8/2020
Date
9/21/2023
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Jose Antonio Beltran 
Crime Date
12/8/2020
Date
9/21/2023
Description
BURGLARY 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1508A (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Jose Antonio Beltran 
Crime Date
12/8/2020
Date
9/21/2023
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Jose Antonio Beltran 
Crime Date
12/8/2020
Date
9/21/2023
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Jose Antonio Beltran 
Crime Date
12/8/2020
Date
9/21/2023
Description
KIDNAP-DEATH/INJ/SEX/AID FEL
ARSCode
13-1304A3 (F2)
Disposition Code
Not Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Not Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Jose Antonio Beltran 
Crime Date
12/8/2020
Date
9/21/2023
Description
KIDNAP-DEATH/INJ/SEX/AID FEL
ARSCode
13-1304A3 (F2)
Disposition Code
Not Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Not Guilty By Jury
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
3/8/2024
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUBLIC DEFENDER
Filing Date
3/4/2024
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2024
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2024
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/4/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
DOR - Designation Of Record On Appeal - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/6/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Designation of Record for Appeal
Filing Date
2/2/2024
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2024
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2024
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2024
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/21/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2024
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2024
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE (31.2 (g))
Filing Date
1/19/2024
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/25/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTIFICATION NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
1/9/2024
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/9/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEAL AND REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
11/21/2023
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2023
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
10/2/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALED JURY QUESTIONNAIRES
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
#5
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2023
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
9/20/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
#5
Filing Date
9/18/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
023 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
9/14/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
#3
Filing Date
9/12/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
#1
Filing Date
9/12/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/29/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO STRIKE JUROR #37 FOR CAUSE
Filing Date
9/7/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
9/5/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 8/15/2023
Filing Date
8/30/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED FOR FOUNDATION FOR ADMISSIBILITY #4
Filing Date
8/30/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation For Foundation For Admissibility #2
Filing Date
8/30/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation For Foundation For Admissibility #3
Filing Date
8/30/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation For Foundation For Admissibility
Filing Date
8/30/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation For Foundation For Admissibility
Filing Date
8/23/2023
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUESTED VOIR DIRE
Filing Date
8/16/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND PENDING FORFEITURE PROEEDING
Filing Date
8/15/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION IN LIMINE
Filing Date
8/11/2023
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION IN LIMINE
Filing Date
8/2/2023
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2023
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRANSFER ORDER
Filing Date
8/1/2023
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
8/1/2023
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
8/1/2023
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE ATTENDANE OF OUT-OF-STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
7/6/2023
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2023
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO: ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
6/15/2023
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2023
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2023
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD
Filing Date
6/13/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
5/10/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Appellate Clerk Notice
Filing Date
5/9/2023
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notification of Notice of Appeal Filed
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appeal From Superior Court and Designation of Record for Appeal
Filing Date
4/26/2023
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2023
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
4/17/2023
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
4/17/2023
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
4/14/2023
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
4/14/2023
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
4/14/2023
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/14/2023
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
4/14/2023
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
4/10/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/10/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2023
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
4/5/2023
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSE COUNSEL RESTRICT DISSEMINATION OF THE PROTECTED INFORMATION CONTAINED WITHIN IPAD CELLEBRITE EXTRACTION BELONGING TO BARBARA MILLANES (PROPERTY #1351425), MACBOOK PRO LAPTOP AXIOM EXTRACTION BELONGING TO JULIETA GOMEZ (PROPERTY #1351426), AND IPHONE 11 CELLEBRITE EXTRACTION (PROPERTY #1351930)
Filing Date
3/23/2023
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Filing Date
3/21/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/21/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/20/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Filing Date
3/13/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2023
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALED JURY QUESTIONNAIRES
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AGGRAVATION PHASE
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AGGRAVATION PHASE
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2023
Description
JNO - Jury Note - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/8/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
3/7/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2023
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
3/3/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO FOUNDATION FOR ADMISSIBILITY
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
#34
Filing Date
2/27/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Request For Discovery
Filing Date
2/27/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NON-SERVICE
Filing Date
2/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2023
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTION ON PRODUCTION OF WITNESSES/EVIDENCE
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02/6/2023
Filing Date
2/17/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/17/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02/14/2023
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02/08/2023
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02/08/2023
Filing Date
2/15/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION FOR FOUNDATION FOR ADMISSIBILITY
Filing Date
2/14/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2023
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO AMEND THE INDICTMENT
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/24/2023
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/27/2023
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/25/2023
Filing Date
2/10/2023
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUESTED VOIR DIRE
Filing Date
2/8/2023
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/30/2023
Filing Date
2/8/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
2/3/2023
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
2/3/2023
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
certificate to secure attendance of out of state witness
Filing Date
2/3/2023
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2023
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ADMISSION OF DEFENDANT’S INADMISSIBLE HEARSAY STATEMENTS
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURED ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECURE THE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
1/20/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2023
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/19/2023
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/17/2023
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION FOR FOUNDATION FOR ADMISSIBILITY
Filing Date
1/13/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL
Filing Date
12/7/2022
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2022
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Management Report
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF POSSESSION AND COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 15.1
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Possession and Compliance with Rule 15.1
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
11/18/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Notice Of Witnesses
Filing Date
11/17/2022
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION
Filing Date
11/4/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION
Filing Date
10/26/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Request For Mini Opening
Filing Date
10/26/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion For Clarification RE: Denial Of Appointment Of Counsel For Victims
Filing Date
10/20/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/18/2022
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10/18/2022
Filing Date
10/18/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Notice Of Witnesses
Filing Date
10/13/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion To Appoint Counsel To Tiffany Rodriguez
Filing Date
10/13/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/11/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/11/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/6/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2022
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2022
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTIONS TO SEVER
Filing Date
9/26/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
9/21/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANTS AND DENIAL OF TWO JURIES
Filing Date
9/20/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Supplemental Notice of Defenses
Filing Date
9/20/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO IMPANEL TWO JURIES
Filing Date
9/20/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RENEWED MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
9/19/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
9/16/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
9/16/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO IMPANEL TWO JURIES
Filing Date
9/16/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO IMPANEL TWO JURIES
Filing Date
9/16/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
9/16/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
9/14/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
9/12/2022
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
9/6/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT INTERPRETER
Filing Date
8/30/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2022
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/31/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2022
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
8/22/2022
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13- 703 or A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
8/22/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT INTERPRETER
Filing Date
8/22/2022
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
8/12/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2022
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2022
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2022
Description
017 - ME: Counsel Appointed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL
Filing Date
7/29/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL
Filing Date
7/11/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant's Motion to Appoint Counsel to Julietta Gomez and Rosario Millanes Espinoza
Filing Date
7/8/2022
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2022
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
6/30/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
5/6/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
4/28/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
331 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/27/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/18/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2022
Description
095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
2/25/2022
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
2/24/2022
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SEVER
Filing Date
2/11/2022
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Sever Defendants
Filing Date
1/27/2022
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL
Filing Date
11/10/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER SEALING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
11/10/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/28/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
10/27/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
9/2/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRAL
Filing Date
8/2/2021
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/2/2021
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/12/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
6/14/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Joint Case Management Plan
Filing Date
5/13/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT / TO SEAL PLEADING
Filing Date
5/11/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT / TO SEAL PLEADING
Filing Date
5/11/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOITION TO CHALLENGE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
5/11/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS' JOINT PROPOSED ORDER TO SEAL PLEADING
Filing Date
5/11/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO CHALLENGE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
5/11/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS' JOINT PROPOSED ORDER TO SEAL PLEADING
Filing Date
5/3/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Reply to States Response to Motion to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings
Filing Date
5/3/2021
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ JOINT REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO CHALLENGE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
4/30/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO REMAND TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
4/15/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Joint Management Plan
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
4/6/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE
Filing Date
4/6/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPLUATION TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE
Filing Date
4/6/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE
Filing Date
3/26/2021
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/26/2021
Filing Date
3/26/2021
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED 03/26/21
Filing Date
3/16/2021
Description
SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02/23/2021
Filing Date
3/4/2021
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2021
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Initial Pretrial Conference Statement
Filing Date
2/26/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
2/26/2021
Description
STA - Statement - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Filing Date
2/25/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/25/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/25/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2021
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
2/25/2021
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/25/2021
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
2/25/2021
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/23/2021
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defenses
Filing Date
2/23/2021
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S INITIAL REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1
Filing Date
2/18/2021
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings
Filing Date
2/18/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE
Filing Date
2/18/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE
Filing Date
2/17/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE
Filing Date
2/9/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2021
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2021
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO UNSEAL FORM IV AND ADDENDUM
Filing Date
1/25/2021
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2021
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2021
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2021
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2021
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
1/15/2021
Description
569 - ME: Not Guilty Arraignment/Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2021
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED ON 1/13/2021
Filing Date
1/14/2021
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(a) and (b) AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1 (c) and (d)
Filing Date
1/14/2021
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses
Filing Date
1/14/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES MOTION TO UNSEAL FORM IV AND ADDENDUM
Filing Date
1/13/2021
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
1/13/2021
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
1/12/2021
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
1/6/2021
Description
173 - ME: Arraignment Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/31/2020
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/22/20
Filing Date
12/31/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
12/31/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: STATES MOTION TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL VICITM IENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
12/31/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM (RDOC)
Filing Date
12/29/2020
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2020
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2020
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2020
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2020
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/29/2020
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/29/2020
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/29/2020
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2021
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/28/2020
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
12/28/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS
Filing Date
12/23/2020
Description
NPH - Notice of Affirmation of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2020
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
12/22/2020
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
12/14/2020
Description
WFS - Warrant Fact Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2020
Description
IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2020
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO SEAL FORM IV AND ORDER
Filing Date
12/14/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO SEAL FORM IV AND ADDENDUM
Filing Date
12/14/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNREDACTED FORM IV
Filing Date
12/12/2020
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2020
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/22/2020
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
12/29/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/31/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
1/5/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/12/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/12/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/20/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/18/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
3/2/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
3/2/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
3/31/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/16/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/16/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/18/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/18/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/13/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/13/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/19/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/1/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/1/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/2/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/2/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/2/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/16/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/16/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/2/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/2/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/10/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
1/24/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
3/1/2022
Time
9:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/1/2022
Time
9:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/1/2022
Time
9:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/1/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/1/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/1/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/1/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/28/2022
Time
14:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
4/28/2022
Time
14:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/2/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/2/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/2/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/6/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/6/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/4/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/8/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/8/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/23/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/23/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/9/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/19/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/19/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/4/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/4/2022
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/7/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/7/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/25/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/25/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/10/2022
Time
15:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
12/2/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/2/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/10/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/13/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/13/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/17/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/20/2023
Time
14:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
1/27/2023
Time
14:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/30/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/9/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/10/2023
Time
15:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/13/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/13/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/14/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/15/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/16/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/21/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/22/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/23/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/28/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/1/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/2/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/6/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/7/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/8/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/9/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/10/2023
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/13/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/27/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/3/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/14/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
4/14/2023
Time
13:32
Event
Sentencing
Date
4/18/2023
Time
9:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/26/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/14/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/18/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/18/2023
Time
11:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/21/2023
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/28/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/30/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/6/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/7/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/11/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/12/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/13/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/14/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/18/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/19/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/20/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/21/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/25/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/26/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/27/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/28/2023
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/16/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/8/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing