Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   St John, Lindsay      
Bradley Heinrichs - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Chapman, Anne   Gates  CR2020-002312-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Bradley Heinrichs  13-2312 (F3)  ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE  1/1/2005  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  10/4/2022 
Bradley Heinrichs  13-2310 (F3)  FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES  6/6/2014  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  10/4/2022 
Bradley Heinrichs  13-2310 (F2)  FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES  6/26/2014  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  10/4/2022 
Bradley Heinrichs  13-2310 (F2)  FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES  6/30/2014  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  10/4/2022 
Bradley Heinrichs  13-2310 (F3)  FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES  7/23/2014  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  10/4/2022 
Bradley Heinrichs  13-1802 (F2)  THEFT  6/1/2014  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  10/4/2022 
Bradley Heinrichs  13-1003 (F2)  CONSPIRACY  1/1/2005  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  10/4/2022 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
11/20/2023  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)  11/21/2023   
NOTE: Payment Start  
10/30/2023  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/1/2023   
NOTE: Submittal of Monthly Employment Verification 
9/26/2023  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/28/2023   
NOTE: SUBMITTAL OF MONTHLY EMPLOYMENT VERIFICATION 
9/13/2023  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  9/13/2023   
9/11/2023  ORD - Order - Party (001)  9/20/2023   
NOTE: GRANTING THE MOTION AND PERMITTING MR. HEINRICHS TO TRAVEL TO HIS WORK SITES AS FOLLOWS: 
8/30/2023  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/1/2023   
NOTE: Unopposed Motion to Approve Site Visit Dates 
8/28/2023  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/30/2023   
NOTE: SUBMITTAL OF MONTHLY EMPLOYMENT VERIFICATION 
8/1/2023  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/3/2023   
NOTE: Submittal of Monthly Employment Verification 
6/27/2023  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/29/2023   
NOTE: SUBMITTAL OF MONTHLY EMPLOYMENT VERIFICATION 
5/30/2023  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/5/2023   
NOTE: SUBMITTAL OF MONTHLY EMPLOYMENT VERIFICATION 
5/10/2023  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  5/10/2023   
5/8/2023  ORD - Order - Party (001)  5/22/2023   
NOTE: GRANTING THE MOTION AND PERMITTING MR. HEINRICHS TO TRAVEL TO HIS WORK SITES. 
5/3/2023  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/11/2023   
NOTE: Submittal of Monthly Employment Verification 
3/30/2023  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/4/2023   
NOTE: Submittal of Monthly Employment Verification 
3/2/2023  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/3/2023   
NOTE: Submittal of Monthly Employment Verification 
1/30/2023  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  1/30/2023   
1/30/2023  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  1/30/2023   
1/27/2023  ORD - Order - Party (001)  2/3/2023   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO TRAVEL TO WORK SITES 
1/25/2023  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/26/2023   
NOTE: Submittal of Monthly Employment Verification 
1/25/2023  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/26/2023   
NOTE: UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPROVE SITE VISIT DATES 
1/17/2023  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  1/17/2023   
1/17/2023  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  1/17/2023   
12/20/2022  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  12/20/2022   
12/15/2022  REP - Report - Party (001)  12/16/2022   
NOTE: STATUS REPORT AND UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPROVE WORK LOCATIONS FOR WORK RELEASE 
12/13/2022  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  12/19/2022   
11/18/2022  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  11/18/2022   
11/18/2022  SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)  11/18/2022   
NOTE: SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation 
11/16/2022  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  11/29/2022   
11/16/2022  PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)  11/16/2022   
NOTE: PSR Supporting Documents 
11/16/2022  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  11/16/2022   
NOTE: Terms and Conditions of Probation 
11/16/2022  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  11/16/2022   
NOTE: Presentence Report 
11/16/2022  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  11/16/2022   
NOTE:  
11/16/2022  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  11/16/2022   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
11/15/2022  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  11/16/2022   
NOTE: Defendants Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum 
11/14/2022  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  11/14/2022   
11/3/2022  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  11/4/2022   
NOTE: Defendants Sentencing Memorandum 
10/24/2022  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  10/24/2022   
NOTE: PLEA AGREEMENT  
10/6/2022  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  10/6/2022   
10/6/2022  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  10/6/2022   
NOTE: ASSIGNMENT OF DISTRIBUTIONS AND PROCEEDS 
10/6/2022  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  10/6/2022   
NOTE: RELEASE BY PARTICIPANT IN DISTRIBUTION PLAN #1 
10/6/2022  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  10/6/2022   
NOTE: RELEASE BY PARTICIPANT IN DISTRIBUTION PLAN #2 
9/16/2022  ORD - Order - Party (001)  9/28/2022   
NOTE: Setting Change of Plea Hearing 
9/15/2022  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/15/2022   
9/12/2022  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  9/12/2022   
9/8/2022  SFC - Stipulation For Continuance - Party (001)  9/13/2022   
NOTE: Stipulation to Continue Change of Plea Hearing 
9/8/2022  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  9/13/2022   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
9/8/2022  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  9/14/2022   
NOTE: FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
8/24/2022  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  8/24/2022   
7/29/2022  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  7/29/2022   
7/28/2022  ORD - Order - Party (001)  8/3/2022   
NOTE: FOR Limited Contact With Victim Family Members 
7/27/2022  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  7/27/2022   
7/26/2022  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/27/2022   
NOTE: Stipulated Motion For Limited Contact With Victim Family Members 
7/21/2022  SFC - Stipulation For Continuance - Party (001)  7/22/2022   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFRENCE AND TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION 
6/21/2022  172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)  6/21/2022   
6/17/2022  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  6/17/2022   
6/13/2022  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  6/14/2022   
NOTE: NINTH EXPEDITED STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION 
6/6/2022  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  6/6/2022   
5/31/2022  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  5/31/2022   
5/26/2022  SFC - Stipulation For Continuance - Party (001)  5/27/2022   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFRENCE 
5/24/2022  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/24/2022   
4/20/2022  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/21/2022   
NOTE: UNOPPOSED MOTION TO ALLOW DEFENDANT TO TRAVEL OUT OF STATE 
3/16/2022  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  3/16/2022   
3/10/2022  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  3/14/2022   
NOTE: EIGHTH UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION AND TO EXTEND FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL ASSIGNMENT DATES 
2/23/2022  331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)  2/23/2022   
2/11/2022  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/15/2022   
NOTE: NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
1/28/2022  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  1/28/2022   
1/19/2022  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  1/20/2022   
NOTE: Seventh Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Rule 12.9 Motion and to Extend Final Trial Management Conference and Trial Assignment Dates 
1/11/2022  070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001)  1/11/2022   
12/8/2021  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  12/8/2021   
11/30/2021  ORD - Order - Party (001)  12/9/2021   
NOTE: EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION AND TRIAL ASSIGNMENT DATE 
11/19/2021  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  11/19/2021   
NOTE: SIXTH UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION AND TO EXTEND TRIAL ASSIGNMENT DATE 
10/15/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  10/15/2021   
10/8/2021  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  10/8/2021   
10/6/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/8/2021   
NOTE: Unopposed Motion to Allow Defendant to Travel Out of State 
9/28/2021  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  9/30/2021   
NOTE: FIFTH UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION AND TO EXTEND TRIAL ASSIGNMENT DATE 
8/23/2021  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  8/23/2021   
8/20/2021  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/20/2021   
8/9/2021  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  8/11/2021   
NOTE: FOURTH UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION AND TO EXTEND TRIAL ASSIGNMENT DATE 
8/5/2021  REP - Report - Party (001)  8/10/2021   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT 
6/30/2021  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  6/30/2021   
6/29/2021  ORD - Order - Party (001)  7/1/2021   
NOTE: THE ATTORNEY GENERALS OFFICE WILL PROVIDE UNREDACTED DISCLOSURE TO DEFENSE COUNSEL 
6/29/2021  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  6/29/2021   
6/22/2021  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  6/23/2021   
NOTE: THIRD UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION AND TO EXTEND TRIAL ASSIGNMENT DATE 
6/18/2021  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)  6/18/2021   
6/17/2021  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  6/17/2021   
6/7/2021  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/8/2021   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
6/7/2021  REQ - Request - Party (001)  6/8/2021   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 
6/3/2021  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  6/3/2021   
5/5/2021  ORD - Order - Party (001)  5/11/2021   
NOTE: EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION 
5/5/2021  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  5/5/2021   
5/4/2021  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  5/4/2021   
5/4/2021  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  5/4/2021   
5/3/2021  ORD - Order - Party (001)  5/5/2021   
NOTE: THAT THE 5/6/2021 COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS VACATED AND RESET 
4/29/2021  SFC - Stipulation For Continuance - Party (001)  4/29/2021   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 
4/29/2021  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  4/30/2021   
NOTE: Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Rule 12 9 Motion 
4/20/2021  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  4/20/2021   
4/15/2021  ORD - Order - Party (001)  4/22/2021   
NOTE: TO DESIGNATE THE CASE COMPLEX 
4/13/2021  ORD - Order - Party (001)  4/13/2021   
NOTE: GRANTED/EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION 
4/7/2021  STA - Statement - Party (001)  4/7/2021   
NOTE: Initial Pretrial Conference Statement 
3/29/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/30/2021   
NOTE: UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RULE 12.9 MOTION 
3/17/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/17/2021   
NOTE: UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DESIGNATE CASE AS COMPLEX 
2/25/2021  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  3/1/2021   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
2/25/2021  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/1/2021   
2/25/2021  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/1/2021   
2/25/2021  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/1/2021   
2/24/2021  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  2/24/2021   
2/23/2021  ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (001)  2/23/2021   
NOTE: Release Order 
1/27/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/26/2021   
1/26/2021  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  1/26/2021   
1/21/2021  STP - Stipulation - Party (001)  1/28/2021   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO SET ARRAIGNMENT DATE 
1/21/2021  ORD - Order - Party (001)  1/28/2021   
NOTE: SETTING ARRAIGNMENT DATE 
1/5/2021  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  1/8/2021   
12/14/2020  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  1/26/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
12/14/2020  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  1/26/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
12/14/2020  600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)  1/26/2021   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
2/23/2021  9:00   Original Arraignment Hearing 
4/6/2021  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
5/3/2021  10:15   Complex / Capital Case 
5/6/2021  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/6/2021  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
6/9/2021  8:45   Complex / Capital Case 
7/8/2021  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/12/2021  8:40   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/22/2021  11:00   Trial 
8/9/2021  8:40   Complex / Capital Case 
9/8/2021  9:50   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/21/2021  9:00   Trial 
10/20/2021  9:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
11/4/2021  9:00   Trial 
11/29/2021  10:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
12/16/2021  9:00   Trial 
1/31/2022  9:20   Pre-Trial Conference 
2/11/2022  13:30   Settlement Conference 
2/15/2022  9:00   Trial 
3/30/2022  10:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/14/2022  9:00   Trial 
5/31/2022  9:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
6/16/2022  9:00   Trial 
7/26/2022  8:50   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/1/2022  9:40   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/16/2022  9:00   Trial 
9/28/2022  13:30   Change Of Plea 
10/4/2022  13:30   Change Of Plea 
11/1/2022  9:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
11/7/2022  13:30   Sentencing 
11/15/2022  9:00   Trial 
11/16/2022  15:00   Sentencing 
12/16/2022  15:00   Status Conference 
1/25/2023  11:30   Status Conference