Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Bigler, Tristan      
Amanda Jean Schlief - (2)
 
Defendant  F   Kessler, Mike   Master Calendar  CR2020-002227-001  
B Victim - (3)
 
Victim  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Amanda Jean Schlief  13-1102A (F4)  NEGLIGENT HOMICIDE  8/24/2019  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  6/9/2023 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
9/14/2023  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  9/18/2023   
9/7/2023  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  9/7/2023   
9/5/2023  SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)  9/12/2023   
NOTE: SENTENCING MEMORANDUM 
9/5/2023  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  9/6/2023   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM 
9/5/2023  SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)  9/5/2023   
NOTE: SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration 
9/1/2023  OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)  9/1/2023   
NOTE: Monetary Orders 
9/1/2023  ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)  9/1/2023   
NOTE: Bond Exoneration 
9/1/2023  PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)  9/1/2023   
NOTE: PSR Supporting Documents 
9/1/2023  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  9/1/2023   
NOTE: Order of Confinement 
9/1/2023  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  9/1/2023   
NOTE:  
9/1/2023  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  9/1/2023   
NOTE: Presentence Report 
8/31/2023  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  9/5/2023   
NOTE: STATE’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM WITH VICTIM IMPACT STATEMENTS 
8/31/2023  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  9/5/2023   
NOTE: STATE’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM WITH VICTIM IMPACT STATEMENTS 
8/30/2023  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/5/2023   
NOTE: MOTION TO FILE SENTENCING MEMORANDUM AND ATTACHMENT UNDER SEAL 
7/14/2023  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  7/14/2023   
6/23/2023  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  6/23/2023   
6/16/2023  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  6/21/2023   
6/9/2023  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  7/10/2023   
NOTE: COPY 
6/7/2023  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  6/22/2023   
NOTE: SERVED 06/06/2023 
6/1/2023  REL - Reply - Party (001)  6/5/2023   
NOTE: REPLY RE: MOTION TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS ELICITED IN VIOLATION OF MIRANDA 
5/26/2023  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  5/26/2023   
5/26/2023  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  6/1/2023   
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO THE DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SUPPRESS - MIRANDA 
5/26/2023  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  6/1/2023   
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SUPPRESS: FRANKS V. DELAWARE 
5/24/2023  ORD - Order - Party (001)  6/6/2023   
NOTE: MOTION FOR TAKING OF DEPOSITION 
5/24/2023  ORD - Order - Party (001)  6/6/2023   
NOTE: MOTION FOR THE TAKING OF DEPOSITION 
5/16/2023  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/19/2023   
NOTE: MOTION FOR TAKING DEPOSITION AND ORDER 
5/12/2023  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/16/2023   
NOTE: MOTION TO SUPPRESS 
5/12/2023  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/17/2023   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS ELICITED IN VIOLATION OF MIRANDA 
4/10/2023  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  4/10/2023   
2/7/2023  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  2/7/2023   
11/2/2022  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  11/2/2022   
10/17/2022  331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)  10/17/2022   
9/26/2022  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  9/26/2022   
9/16/2022  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  9/16/2022   
9/14/2022  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)  9/23/2022   
9/1/2022  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  9/7/2022   
NOTE: VICTIM COUNSEL’S MOTION TO WITHDRAW 
8/12/2022  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  8/12/2022   
7/14/2022  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  7/14/2022   
5/26/2022  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  5/26/2022   
5/26/2022  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  5/26/2022   
5/16/2022  ORD - Order - Party (001)  6/1/2022   
NOTE: THAT BANNER THUNDERBIRD MEDICAL CENTER RELEASE TO MARICOPA COUNTY 
5/16/2022  OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)  6/2/2022   
5/13/2022  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  5/13/2022   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINE FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL 
5/3/2022  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/4/2022   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR RELEASE OF VICTIM’S MEDICAL RECORDS 
4/5/2022  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  4/5/2022   
4/5/2022  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)  4/11/2022   
NOTE: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITHIN PUBLIC DEFENDER’S OFFICE 
3/18/2022  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  3/18/2022   
3/15/2022  OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)  3/25/2022   
3/11/2022  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  3/17/2022   
NOTE: Motion to Continue 
3/9/2022  REL - Reply - Party (001)  3/14/2022   
NOTE: Defenses Reply to States Response to Defenses to Compel Disclosure of Victims Medical Records 
3/9/2022  331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)  3/9/2022   
3/3/2022  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  3/9/2022   
NOTE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM 
3/3/2022  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/9/2022   
NOTE: INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS 
3/3/2022  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/8/2022   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE 
2/28/2022  RES - Response - Party (001)  3/2/2022   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL 
2/24/2022  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/28/2022   
NOTE: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE OF VICTIM’S MEDICAL RECORDS 
2/17/2022  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/18/2022   
NOTE: NOTICE OF STIPULATION 
2/1/2022  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  2/1/2022   
1/21/2022  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  1/24/2022   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
1/21/2022  REP - Report - Party (001)  1/25/2022   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
1/6/2022  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  1/6/2022   
12/13/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  12/13/2021   
12/10/2021  MFH - Motion For Hearing - Party (001)  12/14/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO ACCELLERATE COMPLEX CASE HEARING 
12/8/2021  REP - Report - Party (001)  12/9/2021   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
12/6/2021  ORD - Order - Party (001)  12/6/2021   
NOTE: that Defense Counsel restrict dissemination of the protected information contained within photographs. The Court further orders that Defense Counsel inform any person that is given access to photographs of the restriction pursuant to this order. Under no circumstances is the Defendant to be given access to any of the personal information of the victim contained within photographs. 
11/23/2021  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  11/23/2021   
11/17/2021  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  11/18/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
11/16/2021  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  11/16/2021   
11/15/2021  ORD - Order - Party (001)  11/15/2021   
NOTE: THAT BANNER THUNDERBIRD MEDICAL CENTER RELEASE TO MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE OR REPRESENTATIVE THEREOF THE FOLLOWING PORTIONS OF MEDICAL RECORDS FOR CLAYTON 
11/9/2021  MOT - Motion - Party ()  11/12/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROPOSED ORDER 
11/8/2021  ORD - Order - Party (001)  11/17/2021   
NOTE: SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATED 
10/13/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/14/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15 
10/11/2021  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  10/11/2021   
10/11/2021  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  10/11/2021   
9/28/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/30/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR RELEASE OF VICTIM’S MEDICAL RECORDS 
9/27/2021  REP - Report - Party (001)  9/28/2021   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
9/21/2021  OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)  10/4/2021   
9/20/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  9/23/2021   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE 
7/30/2021  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  7/30/2021   
7/14/2021  REP - Report - Party (001)  7/15/2021   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT MANGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 
7/7/2021  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  7/7/2021   
6/17/2021  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  6/17/2021   
6/16/2021  ORD - Order - Party (001)  6/23/2021   
NOTE: TO DESIGNATE CASE COMPLEX 
6/15/2021  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)  6/15/2021   
6/8/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/9/2021   
NOTE: STIPULATED MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION 
6/8/2021  AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (001)  6/9/2021   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13- 708(A) 
6/8/2021  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)  6/9/2021   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS 
6/8/2021  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  6/9/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
6/8/2021  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  6/9/2021   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
6/8/2021  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  6/9/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13- 703 or A.R.S. § 13-704 
6/8/2021  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  6/9/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING 
6/4/2021  STA - Statement - Party (001)  6/8/2021   
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT 
5/17/2021  BON - Bond - Party (001)  5/18/2021   
NOTE: SURETY/UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE/$5000 
5/14/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/14/2021   
5/12/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/12/2021   
5/7/2021  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  5/10/2021   
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REDETERMINE CONDITIONS OF RELEASE 
5/6/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/6/2021   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS 
5/4/2021  RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)  5/5/2021   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
4/29/2021  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  4/29/2021   
4/26/2021  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/30/2021   
4/26/2021  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  4/26/2021   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF VICTIM COUNSEL PURSUANT TO A.R.S. SECTION 13-4437(A) AND RULE 39(C)(4) OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 
4/23/2021  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  4/27/2021   
4/23/2021  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/27/2021   
4/23/2021  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/27/2021   
4/20/2021  WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)  4/20/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: SERVED ON 4/19/2021 
4/19/2021  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  4/21/2021   
NOTE: $50,000 Secured Appearance Bond 
4/19/2021  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  4/21/2021   
NOTE: IA Packet 
4/5/2021  612 - ME: Gj Quash Summons/Issue Warrant - Party (001)  4/20/2021   
2/1/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  4/20/2021   
12/17/2020  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  12/22/2020   
11/13/2020  600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)  4/20/2021   
11/13/2020  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  4/20/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
11/13/2020  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  4/20/2021  Plaintiff (1)  
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
4/19/2021  23:00   Initial Appearance 
4/27/2021  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
6/8/2021  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
6/9/2021  8:30   Oral Argument 
7/8/2021  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
7/26/2021  9:20   Complex / Capital Case 
7/27/2021  11:20   Complex / Capital Case 
8/10/2021  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/24/2021  9:00   Trial 
9/28/2021  9:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/29/2021  9:30   Complex / Capital Case 
12/14/2021  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/27/2022  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/1/2022  9:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/4/2022  11:00   Settlement Conference 
3/15/2022  11:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/22/2022  9:00   Trial 
4/21/2022  9:00   Trial 
5/17/2022  10:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
5/24/2022  9:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
6/14/2022  9:00   Trial 
7/11/2022  8:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/26/2022  9:00   Trial 
9/12/2022  8:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/14/2022  9:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/27/2022  9:00   Trial 
10/14/2022  13:30   Settlement Conference 
10/31/2022  8:40   Change Of Plea 
11/28/2022  8:40   Pre-Trial Conference 
12/5/2022  9:00   Trial 
2/6/2023  8:50   Pre-Trial Conference 
2/13/2023  9:00   Trial 
4/6/2023  8:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/13/2023  9:00   Trial 
5/24/2023  9:40   Pre-Trial Conference 
6/1/2023  9:00   Trial 
6/9/2023  15:00   Status Conference 
6/9/2023  15:30   Status Conference 
6/9/2023  15:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
7/10/2023  9:00   Sentencing 
7/12/2023  9:40   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/19/2023  9:00   Trial 
9/1/2023  10:00   Sentencing 
9/1/2023  10:00   Status Conference