Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Caplinger, Samantha      
Sean Pena - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Lorona, Jess   Master Calendar  CR2020-001770-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Sean Pena  13-1406A (F2)  SEXUAL ASSAULT  8/26/2018  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  9/1/2020 
Sean Pena  13-1412A (F5)  UNLAW SEX CNDCT PEACE OFFICER  8/26/2018  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  9/1/2020 
Sean Pena  13-1412A (F5)  UNLAW SEX CNDCT PEACE OFFICER  6/1/2019  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  9/1/2020 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
9/11/2020  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  9/15/2020   
9/3/2020  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)  9/3/2020   
9/2/2020  ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)  9/3/2020   
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE 
8/28/2020  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  8/31/2020   
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE 
7/23/2020  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  7/23/2020   
7/17/2020  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  7/22/2020   
7/17/2020  ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)  7/17/2020   
NOTE: Release Order 
7/15/2020  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  7/21/2020   
7/15/2020  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  7/21/2020   
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
7/15/2020  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  7/21/2020   
NOTE: TEMPORARY 
6/30/2020  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  6/30/2020   
6/24/2020  SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  6/24/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: 06/23/2020 
6/23/2020  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  6/24/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
6/19/2020  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  6/24/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
6/19/2020  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  6/24/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
6/19/2020  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/24/2020  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM 
6/19/2020  600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)  6/24/2020   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
7/17/2020  9:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
9/1/2020  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
10/1/2020  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
12/3/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
12/10/2020  8:00   Trial