« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
GODBEHERE-SHORTLY, KRISTEN
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Angel Michael Ventura-Marquez - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Smiley, Matthew
Judge
van Wie
Case #
CR2019-158373-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Angel Michael Ventura-Marquez
Crime Date
12/25/2019
Date
1/14/2021
Description
DANGEROUS DRUG-POSS/USE
ARSCode
13-3407A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Angel Michael Ventura-Marquez
Crime Date
12/25/2019
Date
1/14/2021
Description
DRUG PARAPHERNALIA-POSSESS/USE
ARSCode
13-3415A (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2021
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2021
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY EARING WITH PLEA AGREEMENT-NOT ELIGIBLE FOR SENTENCING UNDER A.R.S.§13-901.01
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
4/15/2021
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2021
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2021
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2021
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2021
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2021
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2021
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2021
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
INFORMATION
Filing Date
1/14/2021
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
1/14/2021
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY HEARING WITH PLEA AGREEMENT-NOT ELIGIBLE FOR SENTENCING UNDER A.R.S.?113-901.01
Filing Date
1/6/2021
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2020
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
12/07/2020
Filing Date
12/14/2020
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2020
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
12/8/2020
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/27/2020
Description
133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2020
Description
IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2020-10-15
Filing Date
10/8/2020
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
9/29/2020
Filing Date
9/30/2020
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
9/30/2020
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
1/16/2020
Description
583 - ME: Preliminary Hearing/Bw Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ADIMISTRATIVE TRANSFER FORM PUBLIC DEFENDER TO OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENSE SERVICES
Filing Date
1/10/2020
Description
IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2020-01-10
Filing Date
12/27/2019
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/2019
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/2019
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
12/27/2019
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/25/2019
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
1/10/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
9/30/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
10/15/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/19/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
12/8/2020
Time
2:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
12/14/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/17/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
12/30/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/5/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
1/14/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/14/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/14/2021
Time
11:1
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/14/2021
Time
11:1
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/29/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Sentencing
Date
2/5/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Sentencing
Date
2/23/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Sentencing
Date
3/10/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Sentencing
Date
3/24/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Sentencing
Date
4/7/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Sentencing
Date
4/16/2021
Time
8:15
Event
Sentencing