Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Beatty, John | ||
Anthony Wayne Gushee - (2) |
Defendant | M | Felmly, Rebecca | Whitehead | CR2019-152757-001 |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Anthony Wayne Gushee | 13-1204A2 (F3) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 11/8/2019 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 11/25/2019 |
Anthony Wayne Gushee | 13-1204A2 (F3) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 11/8/2019 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 11/25/2019 |
Anthony Wayne Gushee | 13-1204A2 (F3) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 11/8/2019 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 11/25/2019 |
Anthony Wayne Gushee | 13-1204A2 (F3) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 11/8/2019 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 4/10/2023 |
Anthony Wayne Gushee | 13-1204A2 (F3) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 11/8/2019 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 4/10/2023 |
Anthony Wayne Gushee | 13-1204A2 (F3) | AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST | 11/8/2019 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 4/10/2023 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
5/15/2023 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001) | 5/15/2023 | |
4/13/2023 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 4/13/2023 | |
4/10/2023 | RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001) | 4/10/2023 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
4/10/2023 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 4/11/2023 | |
4/6/2023 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001) | 4/6/2023 | |
4/5/2023 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 4/5/2023 | |
3/28/2023 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 3/28/2023 | |
3/16/2023 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001) | 3/16/2023 | |
3/9/2023 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 3/9/2023 | |
2/17/2023 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001) | 2/17/2023 | |
2/14/2023 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 2/15/2023 | |
NOTE: Motion To Continue | |||
2/8/2023 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001) | 2/8/2023 | |
1/11/2023 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 1/11/2023 | |
1/5/2023 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 1/5/2023 | |
12/30/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 1/3/2023 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
10/20/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 10/20/2022 | |
10/12/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 10/13/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
8/25/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 8/25/2022 | |
8/22/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 8/23/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
7/19/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 7/19/2022 | |
7/13/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 7/15/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE 45 DAYS | |||
6/2/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 6/2/2022 | |
5/26/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 5/31/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
3/18/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 3/18/2022 | |
3/17/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 3/22/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE 75 DAYS | |||
1/18/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 1/18/2022 | |
1/13/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 1/14/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE 60 DAYS | |||
12/1/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 12/1/2021 | |
11/22/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 11/24/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE 60 DAYS | |||
8/16/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 8/16/2021 | |
8/12/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 8/17/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE 90 DAYS | |||
5/18/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 5/18/2021 | |
5/12/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 5/13/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE 90 DAYS | |||
2/12/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 2/12/2021 | |
2/10/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 2/10/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE 90 DAYS | |||
12/24/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/7/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 12/8/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE 90 DAYS | |||
10/26/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 10/26/2020 | |
10/14/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 10/15/2020 | |
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
9/23/2020 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001) | 9/23/2020 | |
5/8/2020 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 5/11/2020 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2020-090 | |||
4/20/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 4/21/2020 | |
NOTE: notice of compliance | |||
4/15/2020 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 4/15/2020 | |
4/15/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 4/15/2020 | |
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
4/10/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 4/10/2020 | |
NOTE: notice of defenses | |||
3/10/2020 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001) | 3/10/2020 | |
2/12/2020 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 2/12/2020 | |
1/21/2020 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 1/21/2020 | |
12/31/2019 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 12/31/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/31/2019 | AFL - Allegation of Felony Committed While on Release/ Enhanced Sentencing - Party (001) | 12/31/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF FELONY COMMITTED WHILE ON RELEASE/ ENHANCED SENTENCING PURSUANT TO A.R.S § 13-708(D) | |||
12/31/2019 | ALG - Allegation - Party () | 12/31/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13- 703 or A.R.S. § 13-704 | |||
12/31/2019 | ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001) | 12/31/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIOR CONVICTIONS UPON CONVICTION IN A CURRENTLY PENDING CASE | |||
12/31/2019 | RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001) | 12/31/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING | |||
12/31/2019 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 12/31/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
12/12/2019 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001) | 12/18/2019 | |
12/12/2019 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 12/12/2019 | |
12/11/2019 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 12/13/2019 | |
12/11/2019 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 12/13/2019 | |
12/11/2019 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 12/13/2019 | |
12/11/2019 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 12/16/2019 | |
NOTE: TEMPORARY | |||
12/4/2019 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 12/4/2019 | |
12/4/2019 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 12/4/2019 | |
12/2/2019 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001) | 12/2/2019 | |
12/2/2019 | 098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (001) | 12/2/2019 | |
11/27/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 12/3/2019 | |
NOTE: APPOINTING TO THE OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENSE SERVICES | |||
11/22/2019 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 11/25/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
11/22/2019 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 11/25/2019 | |
11/22/2019 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 11/25/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
11/22/2019 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 11/25/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
11/19/2019 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 11/19/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 11/19/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 11/20/2019 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
11/19/2019 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 11/20/2019 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
11/16/2019 | 2:00 | Initial Appearance |
11/21/2019 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
11/22/2019 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/25/2019 | 8:45 | Preliminary Hearing |
11/27/2019 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
12/3/2019 | 14:45 | Evidentiary Hearing |
1/13/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
2/4/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
2/11/2020 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
3/2/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
4/13/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
5/12/2020 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
10/15/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/19/2020 | 14:40 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/22/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
11/3/2020 | 11:00 | Trial |
12/16/2020 | 9:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
1/5/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
2/17/2021 | 10:10 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/4/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
5/17/2021 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/1/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
8/18/2021 | 9:10 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/2/2021 | 9:00 | Trial |
11/29/2021 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
12/14/2021 | 9:00 | Trial |
1/12/2022 | 9:20 | Pre-Trial Conference |
1/27/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
3/21/2022 | 9:40 | Pre-Trial Conference |
4/7/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
5/31/2022 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/14/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
7/14/2022 | 9:20 | Pre-Trial Conference |
7/18/2022 | 8:50 | Pre-Trial Conference |
7/28/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
8/31/2022 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/15/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
10/17/2022 | 9:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
11/1/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
1/3/2023 | 9:20 | Pre-Trial Conference |
1/10/2023 | 9:00 | Trial |
2/14/2023 | 8:40 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/21/2023 | 9:00 | Trial |
2/22/2023 | 8:40 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/1/2023 | 9:00 | Trial |
3/7/2023 | 9:40 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/14/2023 | 9:00 | Trial |
3/30/2023 | 11:45 | Status Conference |
4/10/2023 | 11:00 | Status Conference |
4/10/2023 | 14:30 | Settlement Conference |
4/11/2023 | 10:30 | Status Conference |
5/11/2023 | 10:00 | Sentencing |
6/16/2023 | 15:30 | Sentencing |