Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Sornsin, Jessica      
John Conrad Merrell - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Ewing, Kyle   Master Calendar  CR2019-150783-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
John Conrad Merrell  13-1303 (F6)  UNLAWFUL IMPRISONMENT  11/1/2019  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  11/12/2019 
John Conrad Merrell  13-2904 (M1)  DISORDERLY CONDUCT  11/1/2019  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  11/12/2019 
John Conrad Merrell  13-1902 (F4)  ROBBERY  11/1/2019  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  11/12/2019 
John Conrad Merrell  13-2904 (M1)  DISORDERLY CONDUCT  11/1/2019  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  11/12/2019 
John Conrad Merrell  13-1814 (F3)  THEFT-MEANS OF TRANSPORTATION  11/1/2019  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  11/12/2019 
John Conrad Merrell  13-2904 (M1)  DISORDERLY CONDUCT  11/1/2019  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  11/12/2019 
John Conrad Merrell  13-1303 (F6)  UNLAWFUL IMPRISONMENT  11/1/2019  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  11/12/2019 
John Conrad Merrell  13-1802A (F6)  THEFT  11/1/2019  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  2/3/2020 
John Conrad Merrell  13-1902A (F4)  ROBBERY  11/1/2019  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  2/3/2020 
John Conrad Merrell  13-1303A (F6)  UNLAWFUL IMPRISONMENT  11/1/2019  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  2/3/2020 
John Conrad Merrell  13-1303A (F6)  UNLAWFUL IMPRISONMENT  11/1/2019  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  2/3/2020 
John Conrad Merrell  13-2904A1 (M1)  DISORDERLY CONDUCT-FIGHTING  11/1/2019  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  2/3/2020 
John Conrad Merrell  13-2904A1 (M1)  DISORDERLY CONDUCT-FIGHTING  11/1/2019  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  2/3/2020 
John Conrad Merrell  13-2904A1 (M1)  DISORDERLY CONDUCT-FIGHTING  11/1/2019  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  2/3/2020 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/11/2020  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  3/12/2020   
3/11/2020  ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)  3/12/2020   
3/5/2020  SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)  3/5/2020   
NOTE: SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation 
3/4/2020  REP - Report - Party (001)  3/5/2020   
NOTE: PRETRIAL 
3/4/2020  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  3/4/2020   
NOTE: Terms and Conditions of Probation 
3/4/2020  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  3/4/2020   
NOTE:  
3/4/2020  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  3/4/2020   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
3/4/2020  ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)  3/4/2020   
NOTE: Bond Exoneration 
3/4/2020  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  3/4/2020   
NOTE: Presentence Report 
2/12/2020  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  2/12/2020   
2/12/2020  ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (001)  2/18/2020   
2/10/2020  ROR - Release Order - Party (001)  2/11/2020   
2/5/2020  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  2/5/2020   
2/3/2020  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  2/4/2020   
1/27/2020  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/28/2020   
NOTE: NOTICE OF INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS 
1/27/2020  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  1/28/2020   
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES 
1/27/2020  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/28/2020   
NOTE: MOTION TO PRESERVE DISCLOSE POLICE GENERATED REPORTS AND RECORDINGS 
1/27/2020  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  1/28/2020   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE 
1/27/2020  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/29/2020   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS RULE 15.1 MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE 
1/27/2020  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/29/2020   
NOTE: NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DEFENSE INTERVIEWS 
1/14/2020  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  1/15/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
1/14/2020  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  1/15/2020   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
1/13/2020  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  1/13/2020   
12/18/2019  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  12/20/2019   
NOTE: RETURN RECEIPT FOR THE TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES, TRANSCRIPTS OR EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY, LOCAL RULE 2.8(E) 
12/17/2019  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  12/19/2019   
12/17/2019  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  12/19/2019   
12/17/2019  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  12/20/2019   
NOTE: TEMPORARY 
12/13/2019  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  12/13/2019   
11/22/2019  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  11/26/2019   
11/21/2019  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  11/21/2019   
11/20/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  11/20/2019   
11/19/2019  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  11/25/2019   
NOTE: CONTINUITY OF CARE PLAN 
11/15/2019  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)  11/18/2019   
NOTE: Release Order $25,000.00, 
11/8/2019  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  11/12/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
11/8/2019  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  11/12/2019   
11/8/2019  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  11/12/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
11/8/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/12/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM 
11/8/2019  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  11/12/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
11/6/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/6/2019   
NOTE: MOTION TO FILE VICTIM INDENTIFER UNDER SEAL  
11/6/2019  ORD - Order - Party (001)  11/6/2019   
NOTE: DENIED, ORDER RE: STATE'S MOTION TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL VICTIM INDENTIFER UNDER SEAL 
11/5/2019  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  11/5/2019   
11/5/2019  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  11/5/2019   
11/5/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/5/2019   
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM INDENTIFER INFORMATION FORM 
11/5/2019  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  11/6/2019   
NOTE: IA Packet 
11/5/2019  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  11/6/2019   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
11/1/2019  23:00   Initial Appearance 
11/7/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
11/12/2019  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
11/15/2019  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
1/2/2020  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
1/9/2020  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
2/3/2020  8:30   Change Of Plea 
2/5/2020  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
2/10/2020  8:15   Oral Argument 
3/4/2020  8:30   Sentencing 
3/10/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/24/2020  8:00   Trial