« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Hardt, Samantha
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Jacob James Nix - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Carey, Flynn
Judge
Griblin
Case #
CR2019-146992-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Jacob James Nix 
Crime Date
10/6/2019
Date
12/11/2019
Description
CRIM TRESP 1ST DEG-RES STRUCT
ARSCode
13-1504A1 (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TERMINATING PROBATION
Filing Date
7/30/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF UNSUPERVISED PROBATION
Filing Date
2/4/2020
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2020
Description
SOU - Sentencing Order Unsupervised - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOU - Sentencing Order Unsupervised
Filing Date
1/29/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RESTITUTION
Filing Date
1/27/2020
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
1/27/2020
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/27/2020
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
1/27/2020
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
1/27/2020
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/28/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
12/13/2019
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2019
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
INFORMATION
Filing Date
12/11/2019
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2019
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2019
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Counsel
Filing Date
10/8/2019
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2019
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2019
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/8/2019
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/6/2019
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
10/14/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/16/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
11/12/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/15/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
12/11/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/11/2019
Time
8:31
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/16/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
1/27/2020
Time
8:15
Event
Acceptance Of Plea/Snt