« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Polk, Matt
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Joe Ernest Meza - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Heath, Mark
Judge
Saccone
Case #
CR2019-146076-001
Party Name
B Victim - (3)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
F
Attorney
Simmons, Jefferson
Judge
Case #
CR2019-146076-001
Party Name
B Victim - (4)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
F
Attorney
Simmons, Jefferson
Judge
Case #
CR2019-146076-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Joe Ernest Meza
Crime Date
9/29/2019
Date
10/9/2019
Description
DISORDERLY CONDUCT-FIGHTING
ARSCode
13-2904A1 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Joe Ernest Meza
Crime Date
9/29/2019
Date
10/9/2019
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Joe Ernest Meza
Crime Date
9/29/2019
Date
10/9/2019
Description
THEFT-CONTROL PROPERTY
ARSCode
13-1802A1 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Joe Ernest Meza
Crime Date
9/29/2019
Date
10/9/2019
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Joe Ernest Meza
Crime Date
9/29/2019
Date
9/24/2020
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204A (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Joe Ernest Meza
Crime Date
9/29/2019
Date
9/24/2020
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204A (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Joe Ernest Meza
Crime Date
9/29/2019
Date
9/24/2020
Description
THEFT-CONTROL PROPERTY
ARSCode
13-1802A1 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Joe Ernest Meza
Crime Date
9/29/2019
Date
9/24/2020
Description
DISORDERLY CONDUCT-FIGHTING
ARSCode
13-2904A1 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2023
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RSD start probation and payments
Filing Date
6/2/2022
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2022
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS PETITION FOR
POST-CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
3/10/2022
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2022
Description
PRT – Post Conviction Relief Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
VERBATIM REPORTING & TRANSCRIPTION, September 24, 2020
Filing Date
1/21/2022
Description
PRT – Post Conviction Relief Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
09/15/2020 BY VERBATIM REPORTING & TRANSCRIPTION LLC
Filing Date
1/21/2022
Description
PRT – Post Conviction Relief Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
01/27/2021 BY VERBATIM REPORTING & TRANSCRIPTION LLC
Filing Date
9/7/2021
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Compliance
Filing Date
9/1/2021
Description
595 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2021
Description
597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2021
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2021
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
3/23/2021
Description
SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation
Filing Date
3/23/2021
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2021
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
3/22/2021
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
2/5/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
2/4/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2021
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Release of Deposit DENISE MARIE DE LA RIVA
$10,000.00
Filing Date
1/27/2021
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
1/27/2021
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
1/27/2021
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/27/2021
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
1/27/2021
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
1/27/2021
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
1/27/2021
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
12/9/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
Filing Date
10/28/2020
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING
Filing Date
9/29/2020
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2020
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2020
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/2/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
6/25/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/25/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2020
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2020
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Attorney Change of Address and Contact Information
Filing Date
2/11/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2020
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
12/20/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2019
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRETRIAL REPORT DATED 12/09/19
Filing Date
12/11/2019
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
12/5/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/4/2019
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()
Docket Date
12/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance on Behalf of Victim
Filing Date
11/22/2019
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/22/2019
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY
CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-
703 or
A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
11/22/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST
FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST
FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
11/22/2019
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
11/22/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
11/15/2019
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2019
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2019
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
10/31/2019
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
$10,000
Filing Date
10/31/2019
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO PRESERVE AND DISCLOSE TAPE RECORDINGS OF 911 TAPES, POLICE RADIO BROADCASTS AND PHOTOS/VIDEO FROM POLICE BODY VEST CAMERA
Filing Date
10/22/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS
Filing Date
10/22/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS RULE 15.1 REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/22/2019
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS RULE 15.1 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY
Filing Date
10/22/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
10/22/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/22/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS ARS 13-4433 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DEFENSE INTERVIEW WITH VICTIMS
Filing Date
10/17/2019
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2019
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/8/2019
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2019
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/8/2019
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/7/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
10/4/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
10/4/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
10/3/2019
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/3/2019
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
10/3/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL REJECTED
Filing Date
10/3/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL REJECTED
Filing Date
10/2/2019
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2019
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2019
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/4/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/10/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/15/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
11/26/2019
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
12/11/2019
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
2/5/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/12/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/27/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/28/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/11/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/1/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/8/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/19/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/26/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/15/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
9/17/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/24/2020
Time
9:15
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
10/1/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/28/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
12/14/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/6/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/27/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/27/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing