Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Quigley, Maura | ||
Edward Clarence Elder - (2) |
Defendant | M | Denea, Michael | Master Calendar | CR2019-133745-001 |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | New Charging Document | New Charging Document | 7/30/2019 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | New Charging Document | New Charging Document | 7/30/2019 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | New Charging Document | New Charging Document | 7/30/2019 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | New Charging Document | New Charging Document | 7/30/2019 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | New Charging Document | New Charging Document | 7/30/2019 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | New Charging Document | New Charging Document | 7/30/2019 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | New Charging Document | New Charging Document | 7/30/2019 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | New Charging Document | New Charging Document | 7/30/2019 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | New Charging Document | New Charging Document | 7/30/2019 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | New Charging Document | New Charging Document | 7/30/2019 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 5/10/2021 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 5/10/2021 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 5/10/2021 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 5/10/2021 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 5/10/2021 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 5/10/2021 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 5/10/2021 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 5/10/2021 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 5/10/2021 |
Edward Clarence Elder | 13-3553 (F2) | SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OF MINOR | 7/19/2019 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 5/10/2021 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
5/24/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 5/25/2021 | |
5/17/2021 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001) | 5/17/2021 | |
5/10/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001) | 5/11/2021 | |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
5/5/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001) | 5/5/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
4/19/2021 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001) | 4/19/2021 | |
4/8/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 4/9/2021 | |
NOTE: UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE 4/27/2021 TRIAL DATE | |||
3/30/2021 | 331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001) | 3/30/2021 | |
3/29/2021 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/30/2021 | |
NOTE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |||
3/12/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 3/12/2021 | |
3/11/2021 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001) | 3/11/2021 | |
3/3/2021 | MEM - Memorandum - Party (001) | 3/3/2021 | |
NOTE: States Settlement Conference Memorandum | |||
3/3/2021 | MEM - Memorandum - Party (001) | 3/4/2021 | |
NOTE: Settlement Conference Memorandum | |||
2/12/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 2/12/2021 | |
2/1/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 2/2/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue Trial | |||
12/15/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 12/15/2020 | |
12/4/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 12/7/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
10/19/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 10/19/2020 | |
10/6/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 10/6/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
8/10/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 8/10/2020 | |
7/31/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 8/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue Trial | |||
6/2/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 6/2/2020 | |
5/29/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 5/29/2020 | |
5/22/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 5/26/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue Trial | |||
5/4/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 5/4/2020 | |
4/30/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 5/1/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue Trial | |||
3/27/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 3/27/2020 | |
3/23/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 3/24/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue Trial | |||
2/28/2020 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 2/28/2020 | |
2/26/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 2/27/2020 | |
NOTE: Case Management Plan | |||
1/14/2020 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 1/14/2020 | |
1/9/2020 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 1/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants Complex Case Management Report | |||
1/7/2020 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 1/7/2020 | |
NOTE: STATES FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE NOTICE | |||
12/19/2019 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 12/20/2019 | |
NOTE: First Supplemental Rule 15.1 Demand for Disclosure | |||
11/20/2019 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 11/20/2019 | |
11/15/2019 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 11/18/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Complex Case Management Report | |||
10/23/2019 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 10/23/2019 | |
10/11/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 10/14/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion to Affirm Defendants Indigent Status | |||
10/1/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 10/2/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Defenses | |||
10/1/2019 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 10/2/2019 | |
NOTE: Request for Disclosure | |||
9/30/2019 | 599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 9/30/2019 | |
9/25/2019 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 9/27/2019 | |
NOTE: PRETRIAL | |||
9/18/2019 | ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001) | 9/19/2019 | |
NOTE: STATES ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS | |||
9/18/2019 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 9/19/2019 | |
NOTE: STATES NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
9/18/2019 | AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (001) | 9/19/2019 | |
NOTE: STATES ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE ON RELEASE FROM CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S 13-708(C) | |||
9/13/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 9/13/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion to Modify Release Conditions | |||
9/10/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 9/11/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO APPOINT COMPUTER FORENSICS EXPERT | |||
9/10/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 9/11/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion to Designate Case Complex | |||
8/22/2019 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/28/2019 | |
8/19/2019 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 8/22/2019 | |
8/19/2019 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/22/2019 | |
NOTE: TEMPORARY | |||
8/19/2019 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/22/2019 | |
8/15/2019 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 8/16/2019 | |
8/8/2019 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 8/8/2019 | |
8/7/2019 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 8/8/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion for Temporary Removal of Official Court Files, Transcripts or Exhibits Pursuant to Maricopa County Local Rule 2.8(e) | |||
8/7/2019 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001) | 8/7/2019 | |
8/6/2019 | ROR - Release Order - Party (001) | 8/6/2019 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
8/2/2019 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 8/5/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
8/1/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 8/6/2019 | |
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE | |||
7/29/2019 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 7/30/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
7/29/2019 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 7/30/2019 | |
7/29/2019 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 7/30/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
7/29/2019 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 7/30/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
7/23/2019 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
7/23/2019 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 7/24/2019 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
7/23/2019 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 7/24/2019 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
7/23/2019 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 7/24/2019 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
7/25/2019 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
7/29/2019 | 8:45 | Preliminary Hearing |
8/6/2019 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
9/25/2019 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
9/25/2019 | 8:15 | Oral Argument |
10/28/2019 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
11/19/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
1/13/2020 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
2/27/2020 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/26/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
4/2/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
5/4/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/11/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
6/3/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/11/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
8/4/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/10/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
8/11/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
10/7/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/22/2020 | 11:00 | Trial |
12/7/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
12/17/2020 | 11:00 | Trial |
2/2/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/16/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
2/26/2021 | 10:00 | Settlement Conference |
3/5/2021 | 10:30 | Settlement Conference |
3/8/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/23/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
3/26/2021 | 13:30 | Settlement Conference |
4/12/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
4/27/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
5/11/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/25/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |